EP1771989 - SELECTING AND TRANSMITTING FILES TO TERMINAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.04.2018 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 17.01.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.04.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.05.2018 [2018/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nokia Technologies Oy Karaportti 3 02610 Espoo / FI | [2015/32] |
Former [2014/24] | For all designated states Nokia Corporation Karakaari 7 02610 Espoo / FI | ||
Former [2007/15] | For all designated states Nokia Corporation Keilalahdentie 4 02150 Espoo / FI | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SIMELIUS, Kim Maisterinkatu 1 FI-33720 Tampere / FI | [2007/15] | Representative(s) | Kolster Oy Ab (Salmisaarenaukio 1) P.O. Box 204 00181 Helsinki / FI | [N/P] |
Former [2013/43] | Kolster Oy Ab Iso Roobertinkatu 23 PO Box 148 00121 Helsinki / FI | ||
Former [2011/44] | Kantanen, Jukka, et al Kolster Oy Ab Iso Roobertinkatu 23 PO Box 148 00121 Helsinki / FI | ||
Former [2011/33] | Kaukonen, Juha Veikko, et al Kolster Oy Ab Iso Roobertinkatu 23 P.O. Box 148 00121 Helsinki / FI | ||
Former [2007/15] | Smolander, Jouni Juhani Kolster Oy Ab Iso Roobertinkatu 23 PO Box 148 FIN-00121 Helsinki / FI | Application number, filing date | 05739663.2 | 11.05.2005 | [2007/15] | WO2005FI50151 | Priority number, date | FI20040005174 | 12.05.2004 Original published format: FI 20045174 | [2007/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005109820 | Date: | 17.11.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1771989 | Date: | 11.04.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.11.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | FI | 17.11.2005 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.11.2012 | Classification | IPC: | G06F17/30, H04N21/27, H04L29/08 | [2012/48] | CPC: |
H04L67/06 (EP,KR);
H04L51/07 (KR);
H04N21/2743 (EP,KR)
|
Former IPC [2007/15] | H04L29/06, G06F17/30 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/15] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | AUSWAHL UND SENDEN VON DATEIEN ZU EINEM TERMINAL | [2007/15] | English: | SELECTING AND TRANSMITTING FILES TO TERMINAL | [2007/15] | French: | SELECTION ET TRANSMISSION DE FICHIERS A UN TERMINAL | [2007/15] | Entry into regional phase | 30.11.2006 | National basic fee paid | 30.11.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.11.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.11.2006 | Examination requested [2007/15] | 28.01.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.07.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.12.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/19] | 04.01.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2018/19] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 28.01.2013 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 10.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 31.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 12.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 10.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2017 | 13   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]EP1133104 (HEWLETT PACKARD CO [US]) [I] 1-28 * abstract * * paragraph [0022] - paragraph [0061] *; | [XI]US2002126135 (BALL KEITH [US], et al) [X] 1-3,11,13,14,19,23,25-27 * paragraph [0254] - paragraph [0274] * [I] 4-10,12,15-18,20-22,24,28; | [A]US2003011683 (YAMASAKI FUMITOMO [JP], et al) [A] 1-28* paragraph [0159] - paragraph [0177] * | International search | [A]US5923846 (GAGE BRUCE [US], et al); | [X]US2001034843 (HESS DANIEL [US]); | [A]US6489980 (SCOTT EDWARD D [US], et al); | [YD]WO02097672 (POLAROID CORP [US]); | [X]US2002198944 (MOSS PAMELA M [US]); | [A]WO03005276 (LIGHTSURF TECHNOLOGIES INC [US]); | [A]EP1429535 (OPENWAVE SYS INC [US]); | [XP]US2004230663 (ACKERMAN JERRY [US]); | [X] - "YAHOO INC: "Yahoo Photos Photos Help" YAHOO PHOTOS HELP.", URL: web://web.archive.org/web/20010412164702/http://help.yahoo.com/help/photos/, XP008136029 |