EP1758545 - 4,5,6-SUBSTITUTED M-PHENYLENE DIAMINE COUPLING COMPONENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.04.2008 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.04.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.05.2008 [2008/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Henkel Kommanditgesellschaft auf Aktien Henkelstrasse 67 40589 Düsseldorf / DE | [2007/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KNÜBEL, Georg Erftstr. 26a 40219 Düsseldorf / DE | 02 /
HÖFFKES, Horst Carlo-Schmid-Str. 113 40595 Düsseldorf / DE | 03 /
NEMITZ, Ralph Höningstr. 8 41363 Jüchen / DE | [2007/10] | Application number, filing date | 05740291.9 | 03.05.2005 | [2007/10] | WO2005EP04770 | Priority number, date | DE20041026719 | 28.05.2004 Original published format: DE102004026719 | [2007/10] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005117818 | Date: | 15.12.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/50] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1758545 | Date: | 07.03.2007 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.12.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.12.2005 | Classification | IPC: | A61K8/41, A61Q5/10, C07C217/84 | [2007/18] | CPC: |
A61K8/415 (EP);
A61Q5/10 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2007/10] | A61K8/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/10] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | 4,5,6-SUBSTITUIERTE M-PHENYLENDIAMIN-KUPPLERKOMPONENTEN | [2007/10] | English: | 4,5,6-SUBSTITUTED M-PHENYLENE DIAMINE COUPLING COMPONENTS | [2007/10] | French: | COMPOSES DE COUPLAGE M-PHENYLENE DIAMINE 4,5,6-SUBSTITUEE | [2007/10] | Entry into regional phase | 06.09.2006 | National basic fee paid | 06.09.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.09.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.09.2006 | Examination requested [2007/10] | 13.07.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.11.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/22] | 09.01.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2008/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | JP2003292476 [ ] (NISSAN CHEMICAL INDUSTRIES, LTD., JAPAN) [ ] * paragraphs [0108] , [0119] * | [A] - SUZUKI, HIDEO, "Manufacture of diaminoresorcinols", CA, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, (20031015), Database accession no. 2003:805773, URL: STN, XP002339336 [A] 1-17 * abstract * |