EP1754313 - A TRANSMITTER AND RECEIVER FOR ULTRA-WIDEBAND OFDM SIGNALS EMPLOYING A LOW-COMPLEXITY CDMA LAYER FOR BANDWIDTH EXPANSION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.09.2012 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NXP B.V. High Tech Campus 60 5656 AG Eindhoven / NL | [2007/31] |
Former [2007/08] | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RAZZELL, Charles Groenewoudseweg 1 NL-5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | [2007/08] | Representative(s) | Williamson, Paul Lewis, et al NXP BV Intellectual Property Department Betchworth House 57-65 Station Road, Redhill Surrey RH1 1DL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2011/07] | Williamson, Paul Lewis, et al NXP BV Intellectual Property Department Betchworth House 57-65 Station Road Redhill Surrey RH1 1DL / GB | ||
Former [2009/30] | Krott, Michel, et al NXP Semiconductors IP & Licensing Department High Tech Campus 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | ||
Former [2007/08] | Eleveld, Koop Jan Philips Intellectual Property & Standards, P.O. Box 220 5600 AE Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 05740674.6 | 20.05.2005 | [2007/08] | WO2005IB51658 | Priority number, date | US20040573045P | 21.05.2004 Original published format: US 573045 P | US20040612753P | 24.09.2004 Original published format: US 612753 P | [2007/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005114858 | Date: | 01.12.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1754313 | Date: | 21.02.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.12.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1754313 | Date: | 23.11.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.12.2005 | Classification | IPC: | H04B1/69, H04L27/26, H04L5/02 | [2007/08] | CPC: |
H04L27/2602 (EP,KR,US);
H04B1/692 (EP,KR,US);
H04B1/707 (EP,KR,US);
H04B1/7115 (KR);
H04L25/0202 (KR);
H04L25/03828 (KR);
H04L27/2607 (EP,US);
H04L5/0021 (EP,KR,US);
H04J13/0022 (KR);
H04L2025/03414 (EP,US);
H04L25/0224 (EP,US);
H04L25/03159 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/08] | Title | German: | SENDER UND EMPFÄNGER FÜR ULTRABREITBAND-OFDM-SIGNALE, DIE EINE CDMA-SCHICHT NIEDRIGER KOMPLEXITÄT ZUR BANDBREITENEXPANSION VERWENDEN | [2010/43] | English: | A TRANSMITTER AND RECEIVER FOR ULTRA-WIDEBAND OFDM SIGNALS EMPLOYING A LOW-COMPLEXITY CDMA LAYER FOR BANDWIDTH EXPANSION | [2007/08] | French: | TRANSMETTEUR ET RECEVEUR DE SIGNAUX OFDM À BANDE ULTRA LARGE FONCTIONNANT À L'AIDE D'UNE COUCHE CDMA À FAIBLE COMPLEXITÉ POUR ÉLARGIR LA BANDE PASSANTE | [2010/43] |
Former [2007/08] | SENDER UND EMPFÄNGER FÜR ULTRABREITBAND-OFDM-SIGNALE, DIE EINE VDMA-SCHICHT NIEDRIGER KOMPLEXITÄT ZUR BANDBREITENEXPANSION VERWENDEN | ||
Former [2007/08] | TRANSMETTEUR ET RECEVEUR DE SIGNAUX OFDM À BANDE ULTRA LARGE FONCTIONNANT À L"AIDE D"UNE PELLICULE CDMA À FAIBLE COMPLEXITÉ POUR ÉLARGIR LA BANDE PASSANTE | Entry into regional phase | 21.12.2006 | National basic fee paid | 21.12.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.12.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.12.2006 | Examination requested [2007/08] | 27.04.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.10.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.07.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.11.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.11.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.03.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 11.03.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 22.03.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.07.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 27.04.2007 | Opposition(s) | 24.08.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 20.05.2005 | AT | 23.11.2011 | BE | 23.11.2011 | CY | 23.11.2011 | CZ | 23.11.2011 | DK | 23.11.2011 | EE | 23.11.2011 | FI | 23.11.2011 | IT | 23.11.2011 | LT | 23.11.2011 | NL | 23.11.2011 | PL | 23.11.2011 | RO | 23.11.2011 | SE | 23.11.2011 | SI | 23.11.2011 | SK | 23.11.2011 | TR | 23.11.2011 | BG | 23.02.2012 | GR | 24.02.2012 | ES | 05.03.2012 | IS | 23.03.2012 | PT | 23.03.2012 | IE | 20.05.2012 | LU | 20.05.2012 | CH | 31.05.2012 | LI | 31.05.2012 | MC | 31.05.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/27] | AT | 23.11.2011 | |
BE | 23.11.2011 | ||
CY | 23.11.2011 | ||
CZ | 23.11.2011 | ||
DK | 23.11.2011 | ||
EE | 23.11.2011 | ||
FI | 23.11.2011 | ||
IT | 23.11.2011 | ||
LT | 23.11.2011 | ||
NL | 23.11.2011 | ||
PL | 23.11.2011 | ||
RO | 23.11.2011 | ||
SE | 23.11.2011 | ||
SI | 23.11.2011 | ||
SK | 23.11.2011 | ||
TR | 23.11.2011 | ||
BG | 23.02.2012 | ||
GR | 24.02.2012 | ||
ES | 05.03.2012 | ||
IS | 23.03.2012 | ||
PT | 23.03.2012 | ||
IE | 20.05.2012 | ||
LU | 20.05.2012 | ||
CH | 31.05.2012 | ||
LI | 31.05.2012 | ||
MC | 31.05.2012 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AT | 23.11.2011 | |
BE | 23.11.2011 | ||
CY | 23.11.2011 | ||
CZ | 23.11.2011 | ||
DK | 23.11.2011 | ||
EE | 23.11.2011 | ||
FI | 23.11.2011 | ||
IT | 23.11.2011 | ||
LT | 23.11.2011 | ||
NL | 23.11.2011 | ||
PL | 23.11.2011 | ||
RO | 23.11.2011 | ||
SE | 23.11.2011 | ||
SI | 23.11.2011 | ||
SK | 23.11.2011 | ||
TR | 23.11.2011 | ||
BG | 23.02.2012 | ||
GR | 24.02.2012 | ||
ES | 05.03.2012 | ||
IS | 23.03.2012 | ||
PT | 23.03.2012 | ||
IE | 20.05.2012 | ||
CH | 31.05.2012 | ||
LI | 31.05.2012 | ||
MC | 31.05.2012 | ||
Former [2013/29] | AT | 23.11.2011 | |
BE | 23.11.2011 | ||
CY | 23.11.2011 | ||
CZ | 23.11.2011 | ||
DK | 23.11.2011 | ||
EE | 23.11.2011 | ||
FI | 23.11.2011 | ||
IT | 23.11.2011 | ||
LT | 23.11.2011 | ||
NL | 23.11.2011 | ||
PL | 23.11.2011 | ||
RO | 23.11.2011 | ||
SE | 23.11.2011 | ||
SI | 23.11.2011 | ||
SK | 23.11.2011 | ||
BG | 23.02.2012 | ||
GR | 24.02.2012 | ||
ES | 05.03.2012 | ||
IS | 23.03.2012 | ||
PT | 23.03.2012 | ||
IE | 20.05.2012 | ||
CH | 31.05.2012 | ||
LI | 31.05.2012 | ||
MC | 31.05.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | AT | 23.11.2011 | |
BE | 23.11.2011 | ||
CY | 23.11.2011 | ||
CZ | 23.11.2011 | ||
DK | 23.11.2011 | ||
EE | 23.11.2011 | ||
IT | 23.11.2011 | ||
LT | 23.11.2011 | ||
NL | 23.11.2011 | ||
PL | 23.11.2011 | ||
RO | 23.11.2011 | ||
SE | 23.11.2011 | ||
SI | 23.11.2011 | ||
SK | 23.11.2011 | ||
BG | 23.02.2012 | ||
GR | 24.02.2012 | ||
ES | 05.03.2012 | ||
IS | 23.03.2012 | ||
PT | 23.03.2012 | ||
IE | 20.05.2012 | ||
CH | 31.05.2012 | ||
LI | 31.05.2012 | ||
MC | 31.05.2012 | ||
Former [2013/20] | AT | 23.11.2011 | |
BE | 23.11.2011 | ||
CY | 23.11.2011 | ||
CZ | 23.11.2011 | ||
DK | 23.11.2011 | ||
EE | 23.11.2011 | ||
IT | 23.11.2011 | ||
LT | 23.11.2011 | ||
NL | 23.11.2011 | ||
PL | 23.11.2011 | ||
RO | 23.11.2011 | ||
SE | 23.11.2011 | ||
SI | 23.11.2011 | ||
SK | 23.11.2011 | ||
BG | 23.02.2012 | ||
GR | 24.02.2012 | ||
IS | 23.03.2012 | ||
PT | 23.03.2012 | ||
IE | 20.05.2012 | ||
CH | 31.05.2012 | ||
LI | 31.05.2012 | ||
MC | 31.05.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | AT | 23.11.2011 | |
BE | 23.11.2011 | ||
CY | 23.11.2011 | ||
CZ | 23.11.2011 | ||
DK | 23.11.2011 | ||
EE | 23.11.2011 | ||
IT | 23.11.2011 | ||
LT | 23.11.2011 | ||
NL | 23.11.2011 | ||
PL | 23.11.2011 | ||
RO | 23.11.2011 | ||
SE | 23.11.2011 | ||
SI | 23.11.2011 | ||
SK | 23.11.2011 | ||
BG | 23.02.2012 | ||
GR | 24.02.2012 | ||
IS | 23.03.2012 | ||
PT | 23.03.2012 | ||
CH | 31.05.2012 | ||
LI | 31.05.2012 | ||
MC | 31.05.2012 | ||
Former [2013/03] | BE | 23.11.2011 | |
CY | 23.11.2011 | ||
CZ | 23.11.2011 | ||
DK | 23.11.2011 | ||
EE | 23.11.2011 | ||
IT | 23.11.2011 | ||
LT | 23.11.2011 | ||
NL | 23.11.2011 | ||
PL | 23.11.2011 | ||
RO | 23.11.2011 | ||
SE | 23.11.2011 | ||
SI | 23.11.2011 | ||
SK | 23.11.2011 | ||
BG | 23.02.2012 | ||
GR | 24.02.2012 | ||
IS | 23.03.2012 | ||
PT | 23.03.2012 | ||
MC | 31.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/37] | BE | 23.11.2011 | |
CY | 23.11.2011 | ||
CZ | 23.11.2011 | ||
DK | 23.11.2011 | ||
EE | 23.11.2011 | ||
IT | 23.11.2011 | ||
LT | 23.11.2011 | ||
NL | 23.11.2011 | ||
PL | 23.11.2011 | ||
RO | 23.11.2011 | ||
SE | 23.11.2011 | ||
SI | 23.11.2011 | ||
SK | 23.11.2011 | ||
BG | 23.02.2012 | ||
GR | 24.02.2012 | ||
IS | 23.03.2012 | ||
PT | 23.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/36] | BE | 23.11.2011 | |
CY | 23.11.2011 | ||
CZ | 23.11.2011 | ||
DK | 23.11.2011 | ||
EE | 23.11.2011 | ||
LT | 23.11.2011 | ||
NL | 23.11.2011 | ||
RO | 23.11.2011 | ||
SE | 23.11.2011 | ||
SI | 23.11.2011 | ||
SK | 23.11.2011 | ||
BG | 23.02.2012 | ||
GR | 24.02.2012 | ||
IS | 23.03.2012 | ||
PT | 23.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/35] | BE | 23.11.2011 | |
CY | 23.11.2011 | ||
CZ | 23.11.2011 | ||
DK | 23.11.2011 | ||
EE | 23.11.2011 | ||
LT | 23.11.2011 | ||
NL | 23.11.2011 | ||
SE | 23.11.2011 | ||
SI | 23.11.2011 | ||
BG | 23.02.2012 | ||
GR | 24.02.2012 | ||
IS | 23.03.2012 | ||
PT | 23.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/34] | BE | 23.11.2011 | |
CY | 23.11.2011 | ||
CZ | 23.11.2011 | ||
LT | 23.11.2011 | ||
NL | 23.11.2011 | ||
SE | 23.11.2011 | ||
SI | 23.11.2011 | ||
GR | 24.02.2012 | ||
IS | 23.03.2012 | ||
PT | 23.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/28] | BE | 23.11.2011 | |
CY | 23.11.2011 | ||
LT | 23.11.2011 | ||
NL | 23.11.2011 | ||
SE | 23.11.2011 | ||
SI | 23.11.2011 | ||
GR | 24.02.2012 | ||
IS | 23.03.2012 | ||
PT | 23.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/25] | BE | 23.11.2011 | |
LT | 23.11.2011 | ||
NL | 23.11.2011 | ||
SE | 23.11.2011 | ||
SI | 23.11.2011 | ||
GR | 24.02.2012 | ||
IS | 23.03.2012 | ||
PT | 23.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/24] | LT | 23.11.2011 | |
NL | 23.11.2011 | ||
SE | 23.11.2011 | ||
SI | 23.11.2011 | ||
GR | 24.02.2012 | ||
IS | 23.03.2012 | ||
PT | 23.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/23] | LT | 23.11.2011 | |
NL | 23.11.2011 | ||
GR | 24.02.2012 | ||
IS | 23.03.2012 | ||
PT | 23.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/21] | LT | 23.11.2011 | |
IS | 23.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/20] | LT | 23.11.2011 | Cited in | International search | [A]US2003043733 (MAEDA NORIYUKI [JP], et al) [A] 1-25 * paragraph [0002] ** paragraph [0109] - paragraph [0111] *; | [PX]WO2005034419 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [PX] 1-25 * abstract * * page 1, line 1 - line 29 * * page 4, line 20 - page 5, line 3 * * page 6, line 2 - page 7, line 10 *; | [PX]US2005078598 (BATRA ANUJ [US], et al) [PX] 1-3,8-12,19,20,23 * abstract * * paragraph [0003] * * paragraph [0043] * * paragraph [0053] - paragraph [0060] *; | [XY] - VANDENDORPE L, "Multitone spread spectrum multiple access communications system in a multipath Rician fading channel", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON VEHICULAR TECHNOLOGY, IEEE INC. NEW YORK, US, (199505), vol. 44, no. 2, ISSN 0018-9545, pages 327 - 337, XP002086456 [X] 1,3-7,12-19,21-25 * abstract * [Y] 2,8-11,20 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/25.385926 | [Y] - MUQUET B ET AL, "CYCLIC PREFIXING OR ZERO PADDING FOR WIRELESS MULTICARRIER TRANSMISSIONS?", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON COMMUNICATIONS, IEEE INC. NEW YORK, US, (200212), vol. 50, no. 12, ISSN 0090-6778, pages 2136 - 2148, XP001158048 [Y] 2,8-11,20 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/TCOMM.2002.806518 | [A] - SABERINIA E ET AL, "Outage capacity of pulsed-OFDM ultra wideband communications", ULTRA WIDEBAND SYSTEMS, 2004. JOINT WITH CONFERENCE ON ULTRAWIDEBAND SYSTEMS AND TECHNOLOGIES. JOINT UWBST & IWUWBS. 2004 INTERNATIONAL WORKSHOP ON KYOTO, JAPAN MAY 18-21, 2004, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA,IEEE, (20040518), ISBN 0-7803-8373-7, pages 323 - 327, XP010716261 [A] 1-25 * abstract * * 1. Introduction 2. Pulsed-OFDM System Figure 3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/UWBST.2004.1320988 | by applicant | - "Multitone spread spectrum multiple access communications system in a multipath Rician fading channel", VANDENDORPE L, IEEE Transactions on Vehicular Technology, IEEE INC., (199505), vol. 44, pages 327 - 337 |