EP1745175 - TREATMENT COMPOSITION FOR MAKING ACQUISITION FLUFF PULP IN SHEET FORM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 14.05.2010 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.05.2010 | Withdrawal of application | published on 16.06.2010 [2010/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rayonier TRS Holdings Inc. 4474 Savannah Highway Jesup, GA 31598 / US | [2007/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HAMED, Othman, A. 108 Alpha Court Jesup, GA 31546 / US | 02 /
HAEUSSLER, Michael 117 Sycamore Crossing Savannah, GA 31410 / US | [2007/04] | Representative(s) | Olgemöller, Luitgard Maria, et al Leonhard & Partner Patentanwälte Postfach 10 09 62 80083 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/04] | Olgemöller, Luitgard Maria, et al Leonhard - Olgemöller - Fricke, Patentanwälte, Postfach 10 09 62 80083 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05740985.6 | 06.05.2005 | [2007/04] | WO2005US15665 | Priority number, date | US20040839715 | 06.05.2004 Original published format: US 839715 | [2007/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2005108669 | Date: | 17.11.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/46] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1745175 | Date: | 24.01.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.11.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 04.10.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.06.2009 | Classification | IPC: | D06M11/00, D06M13/192, D21H11/20, D21H21/18, D21H23/04, A61F13/00 | [2008/08] | CPC: |
D21C9/005 (EP,US);
A61L15/60 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2007/49] | D06M13/192, D21H11/20, D21H21/18 | ||
Former IPC [2007/04] | D06M13/192, D21H11/20, B01J20/24, B01J20/28, D06M11/05 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/04] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BEHANDLUNGSMITTEL ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON AKQUISITIONSFLUFFPULPE IN BLATTFORM | [2007/04] | English: | TREATMENT COMPOSITION FOR MAKING ACQUISITION FLUFF PULP IN SHEET FORM | [2007/04] | French: | COMPOSITION DE TRAITEMENT POUR LA PRODUCTION DE PATE EN FLOCONS D'ACQUISITION SOUS FORME DE FEUILLE | [2007/04] | Entry into regional phase | 28.11.2006 | National basic fee paid | 28.11.2006 | Search fee paid | 28.03.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.03.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.03.2008 | Examination requested [2008/20] | 24.02.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 20.04.2010 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2010/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.05.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4472167 (WELCH CLARK M [US]) [X] 1-53 * column 1, line 8 - line 41 * * column 3, line 3 - line 27 * * column 3, line 49 - column 5, line 46; examples 1-5; claims 1-8 *; | [X]US5779857 (NORLANDER LEIF [SE]) [X] 1-53 * column 2, line 2 - line 31 ** column 4, line 4 - column 5, line 52; figure 7; examples 1-4; claims 1-16 *; | [X]US2003008580 (JEWELL RICHARD A [US], et al) [X] 1-53 * the whole document * | International search | [X]US4853086 (GRAEF PETER A [US]); | [X]US5399240 (GRAEF PETER A [US], et al); | [Y]US5486167 (DRAGOO JERRY L [US], et al); | [Y]US5695324 (WEIRICH DAVID MICHAEL [US]); | [X]US6207278 (JEWELL RICHARD A [US], et al); | [X]US2003230391 (HAMED OTHMAN A [US], et al) |