EP1756562 - SURFACE ACOUSTIC WAVE SENSOR COMPRISING A HYDROGEL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.05.2013 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.05.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.06.2013 [2013/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Atonomics A/S Vestre Teglgade 10 2450 Copenhagen SV / DK | [N/P] |
Former [2007/09] | For all designated states Atonomics A/S Vestre Teglgade 10 2450 Copenaghen SV / DK | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WARTHOE, Peter Willemoesgade 54, 3.th DK-2100 Copenhagen Ø / DK | 02 /
SØRENSEN, Iben Åboulevard 4, 4tv DK-2200 Copenhagen N / DK | [2007/15] |
Former [2007/09] | 01 /
WARTHOE, Peter Dr. Tværgade 12 DK-1302 Copenhagen / DK | ||
02 /
SØRENSEN, Iben Åboulevard 4, 4tv DK-2200 Copenhagen N / DK | Representative(s) | Bender, Mikkel, et al COPA copenhagen patents Gammel Kongevej 1 1610 Copenhagen V / DK | [N/P] |
Former [2012/27] | Bender, Mikkel, et al Copa Copenhagen patents Gammel Kongevej 1 1610 Copenhagen V / DK | ||
Former [2007/09] | Thierry-Carstensen, Ole Jean, et al Chas. Hude A/S, 33 H.C. Andersens Boulevard 1553 Copenhagen V / DK | Application number, filing date | 05741788.3 | 20.05.2005 | [2007/09] | WO2005DK00334 | Priority number, date | DK20040000802 | 21.05.2004 Original published format: DK 200400802 | [2007/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005114166 | Date: | 01.12.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1756562 | Date: | 28.02.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.12.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.12.2005 | Classification | IPC: | G01N29/02 | [2007/09] | CPC: |
G01N29/022 (EP,US);
B82Y15/00 (US);
B82Y30/00 (US);
G01N29/226 (EP,US);
G01N29/2462 (EP,US);
G01N29/30 (EP,US);
G01N2291/0255 (EP,US);
G01N2291/0256 (EP,US);
G01N2291/0422 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/09] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | EIN HYDROGEL UMFASSENDER OBERFLÄCHENSCHALLWELLENSENSOR | [2007/09] | English: | SURFACE ACOUSTIC WAVE SENSOR COMPRISING A HYDROGEL | [2007/09] | French: | CAPTEUR D'ONDES ACOUSTIQUES DE SURFACE COMPRENANT UN HYDROGEL | [2007/09] | Entry into regional phase | 21.11.2006 | National basic fee paid | 04.12.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.11.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.03.2006 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 21.11.2006 | Examination requested [2007/09] | 05.02.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.12.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/23] | 17.01.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2013/23] | Divisional application(s) | EP07006848.1 / EP1804059 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.05.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2009 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   30.09.2009 | 31.05.2012 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US2002068157 (WISCHERHOFF ERIK [NL]) [X] 1,2,6,16,17,41,1,2,6,16,17,41,1,2,6,16,17,41 * abstract * * abstract * * abstract *; | [Y]DE19916638 (BIOTUL AG I K [DE]) [Y] 1,2,6,9,13-21,26,41,1,2,6,9,13-21,26,41,1,2,6,9,13-21,26,41 * page 1, lines 5-8 * * page 1, lines 5-8 * * page 1, lines 5-8 *; | [A]US5242828 (BERGSTROEM JAN [SE], et al) [A] 1-41,1-41,1-41 * column 5, line 42 - line 62 * * column 5, line 42 - line 62 * * column 5, line 42 - line 62 * | [X] - PYUN J C ET AL, "Development of a biosensor for E. coli based on a flexural plate wave (FPW) transducer", BIOSENSORS & BIOELECTRONICS ELSEVIER UK, (19981001), vol. 13, no. 7-8, ISSN 0956-5663, pages 839 - 845, XP002342141 [X] 1,2,6,13,16-18,26,41,1,2,6,13,16-18,26,41,1,2,6,13,16-18,26,41 * the whole document * * page 840, column 1, paragraph 2; figure 2 * * the whole document * * page 840, column 1, paragraph 2; figure 2 * * the whole document * * page 840, column 1, paragraph 2; figure 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0956-5663(98)00050-5 | [Y] - STUBBS D D ET AL, "Gas phase activity of anti-FITC antibodies immobilized on a surface acoustic wave resonator device", BIOSENSORS & BIOELECTRONICS ELSEVIER UK, (200206), vol. 17, no. 6-7, ISSN 0956-5663, pages 471 - 477, XP002342142 [Y] 1,2,6,9,13-21,26,41,1,2,6,9,13-21,26,41,1,2,6,9,13-21,26,41 * page 473, column 2, paragraph 2 * * page 474, column 2, paragraph 2 - page 475, column 1, line 7; figures 3,4 * * page 473, column 2, paragraph 2 * * page 474, column 2, paragraph 2 - page 475, column 1, line 7; figures 3,4 * * page 473, column 2, paragraph 2 * * page 474, column 2, paragraph 2 - page 475, column 1, line 7; figures 3,4 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0956-5663(01)00318-9 |