EP1757161 - DUAL DIAPHRAGM ELECTROACOUSTIC TRANSDUCER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.10.2017 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IS | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sonion Nederland B.V. Taurusavenue 143 2132 LS Hoofddorp / NL | [2013/17] |
Former [2010/01] | For all designated states Sonion Nederland B.V. Zekeringstraat 9 A 1014 BM Amsterdam / NL | ||
Former [2007/09] | For all designated states Sonion Nederland B.V. Zeekeringstraat 9 1014 BM Amsterdam / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MADAFFARI, Peter, L. 16 Bayberry Lane Camden, ME 04843 / US | 02 /
VAN REEUWIJK, Sietse, Jacob Tafelbergstraat 26 NL-2021 SP Haarlem / NL | [2007/09] | Representative(s) | Inspicos P/S Agern Allé 24 2970 Hørsholm / DK | [N/P] |
Former [2016/48] | Inspicos P/S Kogle Allé 2 2970 Hørsholm / DK | ||
Former [2007/09] | Inspicos A/S Bøge Allé 5 P.O. Box 45 2970 Hørsholm / DK | Application number, filing date | 05741835.2 | 11.05.2005 | [2007/09] | WO2005EP05081 | Priority number, date | US20040571083P | 14.05.2004 Original published format: US 571083 P | US20040634230P | 08.12.2004 Original published format: US 634230 P | [2007/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005115053 | Date: | 01.12.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1757161 | Date: | 28.02.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.12.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1757161 | Date: | 30.11.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.12.2005 | Classification | IPC: | H04R9/02, H04R9/06 | [2016/20] | CPC: |
H04R9/025 (EP,US);
H04R9/063 (EP,US);
H04R2209/026 (EP,US);
H04R2209/041 (EP,US);
H04R2499/11 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2007/09] | H04R9/06 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2016/48] |
Former [2007/09] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | ELEKTROAKUSTISCHER WANDLER MIT DOPPELTER MEMBRAN | [2007/09] | English: | DUAL DIAPHRAGM ELECTROACOUSTIC TRANSDUCER | [2007/09] | French: | TRANSDUCTEUR ELECTROACOUSTIQUE A MEMBRANE DOUBLE | [2007/09] | Entry into regional phase | 14.12.2006 | National basic fee paid | 14.12.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.12.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.11.2005 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 14.12.2006 | Examination requested [2007/09] | 20.04.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.08.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.02.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.06.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.07.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.01.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.06.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.10.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 18.10.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 18.10.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 20.04.2007 | Opposition(s) | 31.08.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.05.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 31.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 01.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 31.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Rights in Rem or Legal Means of Execution | ID: | 01 | For: | AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LT LU MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR | Date: | 31.03.2011 | [2011/21] | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 11.05.2005 | AT | 30.11.2016 | BE | 30.11.2016 | CY | 30.11.2016 | CZ | 30.11.2016 | EE | 30.11.2016 | ES | 30.11.2016 | FI | 30.11.2016 | IT | 30.11.2016 | LT | 30.11.2016 | MC | 30.11.2016 | NL | 30.11.2016 | PL | 30.11.2016 | RO | 30.11.2016 | SE | 30.11.2016 | SI | 30.11.2016 | SK | 30.11.2016 | TR | 30.11.2016 | BG | 28.02.2017 | GR | 01.03.2017 | IS | 30.03.2017 | PT | 30.03.2017 | GB | 11.05.2017 | IE | 11.05.2017 | LU | 11.05.2017 | FR | 31.05.2017 | [2020/33] |
Former [2020/15] | HU | 11.05.2005 | |
AT | 30.11.2016 | ||
BE | 30.11.2016 | ||
CY | 30.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 30.11.2016 | ||
EE | 30.11.2016 | ||
ES | 30.11.2016 | ||
FI | 30.11.2016 | ||
IT | 30.11.2016 | ||
LT | 30.11.2016 | ||
MC | 30.11.2016 | ||
NL | 30.11.2016 | ||
PL | 30.11.2016 | ||
RO | 30.11.2016 | ||
SE | 30.11.2016 | ||
SI | 30.11.2016 | ||
SK | 30.11.2016 | ||
TR | 30.11.2016 | ||
BG | 28.02.2017 | ||
GR | 01.03.2017 | ||
PT | 30.03.2017 | ||
GB | 11.05.2017 | ||
IE | 11.05.2017 | ||
LU | 11.05.2017 | ||
FR | 31.05.2017 | ||
Former [2019/46] | HU | 11.05.2005 | |
AT | 30.11.2016 | ||
BE | 30.11.2016 | ||
CY | 30.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 30.11.2016 | ||
EE | 30.11.2016 | ||
ES | 30.11.2016 | ||
FI | 30.11.2016 | ||
IT | 30.11.2016 | ||
LT | 30.11.2016 | ||
MC | 30.11.2016 | ||
NL | 30.11.2016 | ||
PL | 30.11.2016 | ||
RO | 30.11.2016 | ||
SE | 30.11.2016 | ||
SI | 30.11.2016 | ||
SK | 30.11.2016 | ||
BG | 28.02.2017 | ||
GR | 01.03.2017 | ||
PT | 30.03.2017 | ||
GB | 11.05.2017 | ||
IE | 11.05.2017 | ||
LU | 11.05.2017 | ||
FR | 31.05.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 11.05.2005 | |
AT | 30.11.2016 | ||
BE | 30.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 30.11.2016 | ||
EE | 30.11.2016 | ||
ES | 30.11.2016 | ||
FI | 30.11.2016 | ||
IT | 30.11.2016 | ||
LT | 30.11.2016 | ||
MC | 30.11.2016 | ||
NL | 30.11.2016 | ||
PL | 30.11.2016 | ||
RO | 30.11.2016 | ||
SE | 30.11.2016 | ||
SI | 30.11.2016 | ||
SK | 30.11.2016 | ||
BG | 28.02.2017 | ||
GR | 01.03.2017 | ||
PT | 30.03.2017 | ||
GB | 11.05.2017 | ||
IE | 11.05.2017 | ||
LU | 11.05.2017 | ||
FR | 31.05.2017 | ||
Former [2018/29] | AT | 30.11.2016 | |
BE | 30.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 30.11.2016 | ||
EE | 30.11.2016 | ||
ES | 30.11.2016 | ||
FI | 30.11.2016 | ||
IT | 30.11.2016 | ||
LT | 30.11.2016 | ||
MC | 30.11.2016 | ||
NL | 30.11.2016 | ||
PL | 30.11.2016 | ||
RO | 30.11.2016 | ||
SE | 30.11.2016 | ||
SI | 30.11.2016 | ||
SK | 30.11.2016 | ||
BG | 28.02.2017 | ||
GR | 01.03.2017 | ||
PT | 30.03.2017 | ||
GB | 11.05.2017 | ||
IE | 11.05.2017 | ||
LU | 11.05.2017 | ||
FR | 31.05.2017 | ||
Former [2018/23] | AT | 30.11.2016 | |
BE | 30.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 30.11.2016 | ||
EE | 30.11.2016 | ||
ES | 30.11.2016 | ||
FI | 30.11.2016 | ||
IT | 30.11.2016 | ||
LT | 30.11.2016 | ||
MC | 30.11.2016 | ||
NL | 30.11.2016 | ||
PL | 30.11.2016 | ||
RO | 30.11.2016 | ||
SE | 30.11.2016 | ||
SI | 30.11.2016 | ||
SK | 30.11.2016 | ||
BG | 28.02.2017 | ||
GR | 01.03.2017 | ||
PT | 30.03.2017 | ||
GB | 11.05.2017 | ||
IE | 11.05.2017 | ||
LU | 11.05.2017 | ||
Former [2018/21] | AT | 30.11.2016 | |
BE | 30.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 30.11.2016 | ||
EE | 30.11.2016 | ||
ES | 30.11.2016 | ||
FI | 30.11.2016 | ||
IT | 30.11.2016 | ||
LT | 30.11.2016 | ||
MC | 30.11.2016 | ||
NL | 30.11.2016 | ||
PL | 30.11.2016 | ||
RO | 30.11.2016 | ||
SE | 30.11.2016 | ||
SI | 30.11.2016 | ||
SK | 30.11.2016 | ||
BG | 28.02.2017 | ||
GR | 01.03.2017 | ||
PT | 30.03.2017 | ||
GB | 11.05.2017 | ||
LU | 11.05.2017 | ||
Former [2018/17] | AT | 30.11.2016 | |
BE | 30.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 30.11.2016 | ||
EE | 30.11.2016 | ||
ES | 30.11.2016 | ||
FI | 30.11.2016 | ||
IT | 30.11.2016 | ||
LT | 30.11.2016 | ||
MC | 30.11.2016 | ||
NL | 30.11.2016 | ||
PL | 30.11.2016 | ||
RO | 30.11.2016 | ||
SE | 30.11.2016 | ||
SI | 30.11.2016 | ||
SK | 30.11.2016 | ||
BG | 28.02.2017 | ||
GR | 01.03.2017 | ||
PT | 30.03.2017 | ||
LU | 11.05.2017 | ||
Former [2018/06] | AT | 30.11.2016 | |
BE | 30.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 30.11.2016 | ||
EE | 30.11.2016 | ||
ES | 30.11.2016 | ||
FI | 30.11.2016 | ||
IT | 30.11.2016 | ||
LT | 30.11.2016 | ||
MC | 30.11.2016 | ||
NL | 30.11.2016 | ||
PL | 30.11.2016 | ||
RO | 30.11.2016 | ||
SE | 30.11.2016 | ||
SI | 30.11.2016 | ||
SK | 30.11.2016 | ||
BG | 28.02.2017 | ||
GR | 01.03.2017 | ||
PT | 30.03.2017 | ||
LU | 31.05.2017 | ||
Former [2017/52] | AT | 30.11.2016 | |
BE | 30.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 30.11.2016 | ||
EE | 30.11.2016 | ||
ES | 30.11.2016 | ||
FI | 30.11.2016 | ||
IT | 30.11.2016 | ||
LT | 30.11.2016 | ||
NL | 30.11.2016 | ||
PL | 30.11.2016 | ||
RO | 30.11.2016 | ||
SE | 30.11.2016 | ||
SI | 30.11.2016 | ||
SK | 30.11.2016 | ||
BG | 28.02.2017 | ||
GR | 01.03.2017 | ||
PT | 30.03.2017 | ||
LU | 31.05.2017 | ||
Former [2017/38] | AT | 30.11.2016 | |
BE | 30.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 30.11.2016 | ||
EE | 30.11.2016 | ||
ES | 30.11.2016 | ||
FI | 30.11.2016 | ||
IT | 30.11.2016 | ||
LT | 30.11.2016 | ||
NL | 30.11.2016 | ||
PL | 30.11.2016 | ||
RO | 30.11.2016 | ||
SE | 30.11.2016 | ||
SK | 30.11.2016 | ||
BG | 28.02.2017 | ||
GR | 01.03.2017 | ||
PT | 30.03.2017 | ||
LU | 31.05.2017 | ||
Former [2017/37] | AT | 30.11.2016 | |
BE | 30.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 30.11.2016 | ||
EE | 30.11.2016 | ||
ES | 30.11.2016 | ||
FI | 30.11.2016 | ||
IT | 30.11.2016 | ||
LT | 30.11.2016 | ||
NL | 30.11.2016 | ||
PL | 30.11.2016 | ||
RO | 30.11.2016 | ||
SE | 30.11.2016 | ||
SK | 30.11.2016 | ||
GR | 01.03.2017 | ||
PT | 30.03.2017 | ||
LU | 31.05.2017 | ||
Former [2017/36] | AT | 30.11.2016 | |
BE | 30.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 30.11.2016 | ||
EE | 30.11.2016 | ||
ES | 30.11.2016 | ||
FI | 30.11.2016 | ||
LT | 30.11.2016 | ||
NL | 30.11.2016 | ||
PL | 30.11.2016 | ||
RO | 30.11.2016 | ||
SE | 30.11.2016 | ||
SK | 30.11.2016 | ||
GR | 01.03.2017 | ||
PT | 30.03.2017 | ||
LU | 31.05.2017 | ||
Former [2017/35] | AT | 30.11.2016 | |
CZ | 30.11.2016 | ||
EE | 30.11.2016 | ||
ES | 30.11.2016 | ||
FI | 30.11.2016 | ||
LT | 30.11.2016 | ||
NL | 30.11.2016 | ||
PL | 30.11.2016 | ||
RO | 30.11.2016 | ||
SE | 30.11.2016 | ||
GR | 01.03.2017 | ||
PT | 30.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/31] | AT | 30.11.2016 | |
ES | 30.11.2016 | ||
FI | 30.11.2016 | ||
LT | 30.11.2016 | ||
NL | 30.11.2016 | ||
PL | 30.11.2016 | ||
SE | 30.11.2016 | ||
GR | 01.03.2017 | ||
PT | 30.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/26] | AT | 30.11.2016 | |
ES | 30.11.2016 | ||
FI | 30.11.2016 | ||
LT | 30.11.2016 | ||
PL | 30.11.2016 | ||
SE | 30.11.2016 | ||
GR | 01.03.2017 | ||
PT | 30.03.2017 | Cited in | International search | [XY]EP1257147 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1-6,9-14,16,17,21-24,27,28,31,32,7,8,15,18,25,26,28-30 * paragraphs [0001] , [0046] - [0057] - [0071] , [0081] , [0085] , [0089] , [0136] , [0151] * * figures 1B,2B,3B,5A,5B,6A,6B,13A,15,22 * * the whole document * * figure 6B * [Y] 19; | [XY]WO2004012068 (SONIONKIRK AS [DK], et al) [X] 1,3,5,6,9-14,16,17,31,32,2,4,15,20-23,27,28,30 * page 1, lines 10-15 * * page 11, lines 3-12 * * page 13, lines 14-22 * * page 15, lines 26-29 * * figures 3-6,8,9,11,12A,12B,13A * * the whole document * * figures 8,11 * [Y] 19; | [X]WO03063545 (SONIONKIRK AS [DK], et al) [X] 1,2,5,12,14,16,17,31,32 * page 1, lines 1-5; figures 4,6,7 * | Examination | US6563933 | JP2000138997 |