EP1769433 - FORECASTING DATA WITH REAL-TIME UPDATES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 08.05.2020 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.05.2020 | Refusal of application | published on 10.06.2020 [2020/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states RIGHT90, INC. 5201 Great America Parkway, S. 506 Santa Clara CA 95054 / US | [2007/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ORUMCHIAN, Kim c/o 4100 East Third Avenue, Suite 104 Foster City, California 84404 / US | 02 /
STABENOW, Art c/o 4100 East Third Avenue, Suite 104 Foster City, California 94404 / US | 03 /
SKELTON, Dean c/o 4100 East Third Avenue, Suite 104 Foster City, California 94404 / US | 04 /
PETIOT, David c/o 4100 East Third Avenue, Suite 104 Foster City, CAlifornia 94404 / US | [2007/14] | Representative(s) | WP Thompson 138 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/51] | Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | ||
Former [2007/14] | McLeish, Nicholas Alistair Maxwell Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | Application number, filing date | 05742949.0 | 26.04.2005 | [2007/14] | WO2005US14363 | Priority number, date | US20040565758P | 26.04.2004 Original published format: US 565758 P | [2007/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2005104736 | Date: | 10.11.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/45] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1769433 | Date: | 04.04.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.11.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 30.03.2006 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.04.2009 | Classification | IPC: | G06Q10/00 | [2007/14] | CPC: |
G06Q10/063 (EP,US);
G06F16/90335 (EP,US);
G06F16/2228 (EP,US);
G06F16/254 (EP,US);
G06F16/283 (EP,US);
G06Q10/04 (EP,US);
G06Q10/0631 (EP,US);
G06Q30/02 (EP,US);
G06Q30/0202 (EP,US);
G06Q30/06 (EP,US);
G06Q40/04 (EP,US);
G06Q40/06 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/14] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DATENVORHERSAGE MIT ECHTZEIT-AKTUALISIERUNGEN | [2007/14] | English: | FORECASTING DATA WITH REAL-TIME UPDATES | [2007/14] | French: | DONNEES DE PREVISION AVEC MISES A JOUR EN TEMPS REEL | [2007/14] | Entry into regional phase | 27.11.2006 | National basic fee paid | 27.11.2006 | Search fee paid | 27.11.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.11.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.11.2006 | Examination requested [2007/14] | 16.10.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.02.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.10.2013 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 17.10.2013 | 17.10.2013 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 30.07.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2020/24] | 19.03.2020 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2020/24] | Appeal following examination | 30.09.2014 | Appeal received No. T0183/15 | 08.12.2014 | Statement of grounds filed | 19.03.2020 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the applicant withdrawn | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 16.10.2009 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.04.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 12.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 25.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 10.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 11.04.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 10.04.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 11.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 15.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 31.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 16 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2007 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   25.07.2007 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO0111497 (HYPERROLL ISRAEL LTD [US], et al); | International search | [A]US5873097 (HARRIS JARED M [US], et al); | [A]US5926820 (AGRAWAL RAKESH [US], et al); | [A]US6094651 (AGRAWAL RAKESH [US], et al); | [A]US6108647 (POOSALA VISWANATH [US], et al); | [A]US6366905 (NETZ AMIR [US]); | [A]US6430565 (BERGER ALEXANDER [US], et al) |