EP1739892 - A METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR TRANSPORTING ETHERNET NETWORK SERVICES IN THE RPR NETWORK. [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 13.05.2011 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.05.2011 | Withdrawal of application | published on 15.06.2011 [2011/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [N/P] |
Former [2007/01] | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building, Bantian Longgang District, Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
QUAN, Xingyue Huawei Administr. Bldg, Bantian, Longgang Dist. Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | 02 /
MA, Yunfei Huawei Administr. Bldg, Bantian, Longgang Dist. Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2007/01] | Representative(s) | Thun, Clemens Mitscherlich PartmbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Karlstraße 7 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/01] | Thun, Clemens Mitscherlich & Partner Sonnenstrasse 33 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05743188.4 | 12.04.2005 | [2007/01] | WO2005CN00484 | Priority number, date | CN20041037026 | 21.04.2004 Original published format: CN200410037026 | [2007/01] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005104449 | Date: | 03.11.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1739892 | Date: | 03.01.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.11.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 03.11.2005 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.05.2007 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/46 | [2007/01] | CPC: |
H04L12/433 (EP);
H04L12/46 (EP);
H04L12/4641 (EP);
H04L45/50 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/01] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM ZUM TRANSPROTIEREN VON ETHERNET-NETZWERKDIENSTEN IN DEM RPR-NETZWERK | [2007/01] | English: | A METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR TRANSPORTING ETHERNET NETWORK SERVICES IN THE RPR NETWORK. | [2007/01] | French: | PROCEDE ET SYSTEME D'ACHEMINEMENT DE SERVICES DE RESEAU ETHERNET DANS LE RESEAU RPR | [2007/01] | Entry into regional phase | 25.08.2006 | Translation filed | 25.08.2006 | National basic fee paid | 25.08.2006 | Search fee paid | 25.08.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.08.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.08.2006 | Examination requested [2007/01] | 20.09.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.01.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.02.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.05.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.09.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.01.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.05.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.08.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.04.2011 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2011/24] | 09.05.2011 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 28.09.2011 | 28.09.2011 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 20.09.2007 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [X]US2003074469 (BUSI ITALO [IT], et al); | [A]EP1388979 (CIT ALCATEL [FR]) |