EP1869740 - CABLE DUCT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.05.2015 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.08.2017 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 27.09.2017 [2017/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CableRunner Austria GmbH & Co. KG Kolbegasse 68 1230 Wien / AT | [2010/01] |
Former [2007/52] | For all designated states Wien Kanal-Abwassertechnologien GesmbH Modecenterstrasse 14, Block C 1030 Wien / AT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
REISS, Gerhard Heinrich Ottgasse 7 A-2361 Laxenburg / AT | 02 /
KADRNOSKA, Helmut Doningasse 21 A-1220 Wien / AT | [2007/52] | Representative(s) | Wildhack & Jellinek Patentanwälte Patentanwälte Landstraßer Hauptstraße 50 1030 Wien / AT | [N/P] |
Former [2014/29] | Wildhack & Jellinek Patentanwälte Landstraßer Hauptstraße 50 1030 Wien / AT | ||
Former [2009/17] | Wildhack & Jellinek Patentanwälte Landstraßer Hauptstraße 50 1030 Wien / AT | ||
Former [2009/15] | Wildhack & Jellinek Patentanwälte Landstraßer Hauptstraße 50 1030 Wien / CH | ||
Former [2007/52] | Wildhack, Helmut, et al Patentanwälte Dipl.-Ing. Dr. Helmut Wildhack Dipl.-Ing. Dr.Gerhard Jellinek Landstrasser Hauptstrasse 50 1030 Wien / AT | Application number, filing date | 05743192.6 | 25.05.2005 | [2007/52] | WO2005AT00180 | Priority number, date | AT20050000641 | 15.04.2005 Original published format: AT 6412005 | [2007/52] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006108199 | Date: | 19.10.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/42] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1869740 | Date: | 26.12.2007 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.10.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1869740 | Date: | 16.07.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.10.2006 | Classification | IPC: | H02G3/04 | [2007/52] | CPC: |
G02B6/4461 (EP,US);
H02G3/04 (KR);
F16G13/16 (KR);
H02G3/0475 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/52] | Extension states | HR | 01.10.2007 | YU | 01.10.2007 | Title | German: | KABELKANAL | [2007/52] | English: | CABLE DUCT | [2007/52] | French: | PASSAGE DE CABLES | [2007/52] | Entry into regional phase | 01.10.2007 | National basic fee paid | 01.10.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.10.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.10.2007 | Examination requested [2007/52] | 05.03.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.05.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.07.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.01.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.02.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.06.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 03.06.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 03.06.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 05.03.2013 | Opposition(s) | 17.04.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 06.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 07.05.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 11.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 22.05.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 25.05.2005 | CY | 16.07.2014 | DK | 16.07.2014 | EE | 16.07.2014 | FI | 16.07.2014 | LT | 16.07.2014 | MC | 16.07.2014 | NL | 16.07.2014 | RO | 16.07.2014 | SE | 16.07.2014 | SI | 16.07.2014 | SK | 16.07.2014 | BG | 16.10.2014 | GR | 17.10.2014 | IS | 16.11.2014 | PT | 17.11.2014 | [2017/39] |
Former [2016/06] | CY | 16.07.2014 | |
DK | 16.07.2014 | ||
EE | 16.07.2014 | ||
FI | 16.07.2014 | ||
LT | 16.07.2014 | ||
MC | 16.07.2014 | ||
NL | 16.07.2014 | ||
RO | 16.07.2014 | ||
SE | 16.07.2014 | ||
SI | 16.07.2014 | ||
SK | 16.07.2014 | ||
BG | 16.10.2014 | ||
GR | 17.10.2014 | ||
IS | 16.11.2014 | ||
PT | 17.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/50] | CY | 16.07.2014 | |
DK | 16.07.2014 | ||
EE | 16.07.2014 | ||
FI | 16.07.2014 | ||
LT | 16.07.2014 | ||
NL | 16.07.2014 | ||
RO | 16.07.2014 | ||
SE | 16.07.2014 | ||
SI | 16.07.2014 | ||
SK | 16.07.2014 | ||
BG | 16.10.2014 | ||
GR | 17.10.2014 | ||
IS | 16.11.2014 | ||
PT | 17.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/23] | CY | 16.07.2014 | |
DK | 16.07.2014 | ||
EE | 16.07.2014 | ||
FI | 16.07.2014 | ||
LT | 16.07.2014 | ||
NL | 16.07.2014 | ||
RO | 16.07.2014 | ||
SE | 16.07.2014 | ||
SK | 16.07.2014 | ||
BG | 16.10.2014 | ||
GR | 17.10.2014 | ||
IS | 16.11.2014 | ||
PT | 17.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/22] | CY | 16.07.2014 | |
DK | 16.07.2014 | ||
FI | 16.07.2014 | ||
LT | 16.07.2014 | ||
NL | 16.07.2014 | ||
RO | 16.07.2014 | ||
SE | 16.07.2014 | ||
BG | 16.10.2014 | ||
GR | 17.10.2014 | ||
IS | 16.11.2014 | ||
PT | 17.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/12] | CY | 16.07.2014 | |
FI | 16.07.2014 | ||
LT | 16.07.2014 | ||
NL | 16.07.2014 | ||
SE | 16.07.2014 | ||
BG | 16.10.2014 | ||
GR | 17.10.2014 | ||
IS | 16.11.2014 | ||
PT | 17.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/11] | CY | 16.07.2014 | |
FI | 16.07.2014 | ||
LT | 16.07.2014 | ||
SE | 16.07.2014 | ||
BG | 16.10.2014 | ||
GR | 17.10.2014 | ||
PT | 17.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/10] | FI | 16.07.2014 | |
LT | 16.07.2014 | ||
SE | 16.07.2014 | ||
BG | 16.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/09] | FI | 16.07.2014 | |
LT | 16.07.2014 | ||
SE | 16.07.2014 | ||
Former [2015/08] | LT | 16.07.2014 | Cited in | International search | [Y]US6107565 (O'ROURKE JAMES D [US]) [Y] 1,4,9-11 * the whole document *; | [Y]US2002108365 (BLASE FRANK [DE], et al) [Y] 1,4,9-11 * the whole document *; | [A]US4104871 (MORITZ WERNER [DE]) [A] 1 * the whole document * | by applicant | US6107565 | US2002018365 | US4104871 |