EP1753793 - ISOBUTENE POLYMERISATION IN THE PRESENCE OF COMPLEXES OF ELECTRONDONORS AND FLUORINATED ACIDS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2007/08] | ISOBUTENE POLYMERISATION IN THE PRESENCE OF A DONOR AND FLUORINATED ACIDS COMPLEX | ||
[2010/10] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.06.2011 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BASF SE Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 67056 Ludwigshafen am Rhein / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/10] | For all designated states BASF SE 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | ||
Former [2007/08] | For all designated states BASF Aktiengesellschaft 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HERRLICH-LOOS, Mirjam Werderstrasse 1 68165 Mannheim / DE | 02 /
DROHMANN, Christian Magdalenalei 164 B-2930 Brasschaat / BE | 03 /
MIJOLOVIC, Darijo Obere Riedstr. 26 68309 Mannheim / DE | 04 /
WETTLING, Thomas Trifelsring 11 67117 Limburgerhof / DE | 05 /
MACH, Helmut Kaiserstr. 43 69115 Heidelberg / DE | [2007/08] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2010/16] |
Former [2007/08] | Reitstötter - Kinzebach Patentanwälte, Sternwartstrasse 4 81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05743534.9 | 11.05.2005 | [2007/08] | WO2005EP05093 | Priority number, date | EP20040011971 | 19.05.2004 Original published format: EP 04011971 | [2007/08] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005116094 | Date: | 08.12.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1753793 | Date: | 21.02.2007 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.12.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1753793 | Date: | 04.08.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.12.2005 | Classification | IPC: | C08F10/10, C08F4/12 | [2007/08] | CPC: |
C08F10/10 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C08F10/10, C08F4/06 (US,EP);
C08F10/10, C08F4/12 (EP,US) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/08] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | POLYMERISATION VON ISOBUTEN IN GEGENWART VON KOMPLEXEN VON ELEKTRONENDONOREN MIT FLUOR-HALTIGEN SÄUREN | [2010/10] | English: | ISOBUTENE POLYMERISATION IN THE PRESENCE OF COMPLEXES OF ELECTRONDONORS AND FLUORINATED ACIDS | [2010/10] | French: | POLYMERISATION D'ISOBUTENE EN PRESENCE DE COMPLEXES DE DONNEURS D'ELECTRONS AVEC DES ACIDES FLUORES | [2010/10] |
Former [2007/08] | POLYMERISATION VON ISOBUTEN IN GEGENWART VON KOMPLEXEN VON DONOR MIT FLUOR-HALTI GEN SÄUREN | ||
Former [2007/08] | ISOBUTENE POLYMERISATION IN THE PRESENCE OF A DONOR AND FLUORINATED ACIDS COMPLEX | ||
Former [2007/08] | POLYMERISATION D'ISOBUTENE EN PRESENCE DE COMPLEXES D'UN DONNEUR AVEC DES ACIDES FLUORES | Entry into regional phase | 19.12.2006 | National basic fee paid | 19.12.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.12.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.09.2005 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 19.12.2006 | Examination requested [2007/08] | 21.12.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.02.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.02.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.06.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 17.06.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.05.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 04.08.2010 | CZ | 04.08.2010 | DK | 04.08.2010 | EE | 04.08.2010 | FI | 04.08.2010 | HU | 04.08.2010 | IE | 04.08.2010 | LT | 04.08.2010 | NL | 04.08.2010 | PL | 04.08.2010 | RO | 04.08.2010 | SE | 04.08.2010 | SI | 04.08.2010 | SK | 04.08.2010 | TR | 04.08.2010 | BG | 04.11.2010 | GR | 05.11.2010 | ES | 15.11.2010 | IS | 04.12.2010 | PT | 06.12.2010 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | CY | 04.08.2010 | |
CZ | 04.08.2010 | ||
DK | 04.08.2010 | ||
EE | 04.08.2010 | ||
FI | 04.08.2010 | ||
IE | 04.08.2010 | ||
LT | 04.08.2010 | ||
NL | 04.08.2010 | ||
PL | 04.08.2010 | ||
RO | 04.08.2010 | ||
SE | 04.08.2010 | ||
SI | 04.08.2010 | ||
SK | 04.08.2010 | ||
TR | 04.08.2010 | ||
BG | 04.11.2010 | ||
GR | 05.11.2010 | ||
ES | 15.11.2010 | ||
IS | 04.12.2010 | ||
PT | 06.12.2010 | ||
Former [2011/29] | CY | 04.08.2010 | |
CZ | 04.08.2010 | ||
DK | 04.08.2010 | ||
EE | 04.08.2010 | ||
FI | 04.08.2010 | ||
IE | 04.08.2010 | ||
LT | 04.08.2010 | ||
NL | 04.08.2010 | ||
PL | 04.08.2010 | ||
RO | 04.08.2010 | ||
SE | 04.08.2010 | ||
SI | 04.08.2010 | ||
SK | 04.08.2010 | ||
BG | 04.11.2010 | ||
GR | 05.11.2010 | ||
ES | 15.11.2010 | ||
IS | 04.12.2010 | ||
PT | 06.12.2010 | ||
Former [2011/23] | CY | 04.08.2010 | |
CZ | 04.08.2010 | ||
DK | 04.08.2010 | ||
EE | 04.08.2010 | ||
FI | 04.08.2010 | ||
IE | 04.08.2010 | ||
LT | 04.08.2010 | ||
NL | 04.08.2010 | ||
PL | 04.08.2010 | ||
SE | 04.08.2010 | ||
SI | 04.08.2010 | ||
SK | 04.08.2010 | ||
BG | 04.11.2010 | ||
GR | 05.11.2010 | ||
IS | 04.12.2010 | ||
PT | 06.12.2010 | ||
Former [2011/19] | CY | 04.08.2010 | |
DK | 04.08.2010 | ||
FI | 04.08.2010 | ||
IE | 04.08.2010 | ||
LT | 04.08.2010 | ||
NL | 04.08.2010 | ||
PL | 04.08.2010 | ||
SE | 04.08.2010 | ||
SI | 04.08.2010 | ||
BG | 04.11.2010 | ||
GR | 05.11.2010 | ||
IS | 04.12.2010 | ||
PT | 06.12.2010 | ||
Former [2011/16] | CY | 04.08.2010 | |
FI | 04.08.2010 | ||
LT | 04.08.2010 | ||
NL | 04.08.2010 | ||
PL | 04.08.2010 | ||
SE | 04.08.2010 | ||
SI | 04.08.2010 | ||
BG | 04.11.2010 | ||
GR | 05.11.2010 | ||
IS | 04.12.2010 | ||
PT | 06.12.2010 | ||
Former [2011/13] | CY | 04.08.2010 | |
FI | 04.08.2010 | ||
LT | 04.08.2010 | ||
NL | 04.08.2010 | ||
PL | 04.08.2010 | ||
SI | 04.08.2010 | ||
BG | 04.11.2010 | ||
IS | 04.12.2010 | ||
PT | 06.12.2010 | ||
Former [2011/11] | FI | 04.08.2010 | |
LT | 04.08.2010 | ||
NL | 04.08.2010 | ||
PL | 04.08.2010 | ||
SI | 04.08.2010 | ||
BG | 04.11.2010 | ||
PT | 06.12.2010 | ||
Former [2011/08] | LT | 04.08.2010 | |
NL | 04.08.2010 | Cited in | International search | [X]GB401297 (IG FARBENINDUSTRIE AG) [X] 1-6,13 * page 3, column 1, line 59 - column 2, line 86 * * example 3 *; | [DA]EP0322241 (EXXON CHEMICAL PATENTS INC [US]) [DA] 1 * claims 1,5 ** page 9, line 40 - line 51 *; | [X]US5556932 (RATH HANS P [DE], et al) [X] 1,3-6,12,13 * claims 1-4 * * examples 1,3,8 * | by applicant | GB486161 | WO8901001 | EP0322241 | EP0337737 | WO9526814 | US5556932 |