EP1768378 - DOT DATA PROCESSING DEVICE, IMAGE OUTPUT SYSTEM, AND METHOD THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.04.2010 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.04.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.05.2010 [2010/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Seiko Epson Corporation 4-1, Nishi-Shinjuku 2-chome Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 163-0811 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2007/13] | For all designated states SEIKO EPSON CORPORATION 4-1, Nishi-shinjuku 2-chome Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 163-0811 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KAKUTANI, Toshiaki, c/o Seiko Epson Corporation 3-5, Owa 3-chome Suwa-shi, Nagano 3928502 / JP | [2007/13] | Representative(s) | Winter, Brandl - Partnerschaft mbB Alois-Steinecker-Straße 22 85354 Freising / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/13] | Winter, Brandl, Fürniss, Hübner Röss, Kaiser, Polte Partnerschaft Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Alois-Steinecker-Strasse 22 85354 Freising / DE | Application number, filing date | 05743555.4 | 18.05.2005 | [2007/13] | WO2005JP09507 | Priority number, date | JP20040149171 | 19.05.2004 Original published format: JP 2004149171 | [2007/13] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005112426 | Date: | 24.11.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/47] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1768378 | Date: | 28.03.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.11.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 24.11.2005 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.04.2008 | Classification | IPC: | H04N1/405, B41J2/525, G06T5/00 | [2007/13] | CPC: |
H04N1/4057 (EP,US);
H04N1/40087 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/13] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | PUNKTDATEN-VERARBEITUNGSEINRICHTUNG, BILDAUSGABESYSTEM UND VERFAHREN DAFÜR | [2007/13] | English: | DOT DATA PROCESSING DEVICE, IMAGE OUTPUT SYSTEM, AND METHOD THEREOF | [2007/13] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE TRAITEMENT DE DONNÉES DE POINT, SYSTÈME DE PRODUCTION D'IMAGE, ET PROCÉDÉ DE CELUI-CI | [2007/13] | Entry into regional phase | 11.12.2006 | Translation filed | 11.12.2006 | National basic fee paid | 11.12.2006 | Search fee paid | 11.12.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.12.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.12.2006 | Examination requested [2007/13] | 08.08.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.12.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.12.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/21] | 13.01.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2010/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2009 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0683599 (IBM [US]) [A] 1-21 * abstract * * column 8, lines 9-51 * * column 9, lines 21-50 *; | [A]US4760460 (SHIMOTOHNO SUSUMU [JP]) [A] 1-21 * the whole document *; | [A]EP1195981 (SEIKO EPSON CORP [JP]) [A] 1-21 * abstract *; | [A]EP0902398 (XEROX CORP [US]) [A] 1-21 * abstract * * paragraphs [0010] , [0017] , [0025] - [0037] *; | [A]US4667251 (HASEGAWA AKIRA [JP]) | International search | [A]JP2002185789 (SEIKO EPSON CORP); | [A]JPH0865511 (MURATA MACHINERY LTD); | [A]JPH08116440 (FUJI XEROX CO LTD); | [A]JP2000004359 (HITACHI LTD); | [A]JPS62176371 (TOSHIBA CORP) |