EP1740469 - POWDER-TIGHT PACKAGING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.03.2008 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.03.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 30.04.2008 [2008/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HENKEL KOMMANDITGESELLSCHAFT AUF AKTIEN Henkelstrasse 67 40589 Düsseldorf / DE | [2007/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GROSSMANN, Barbara Am Krahnap 11 40229 Düsseldorf / DE | 02 /
BARTHEL, Wolfgang Schlieperstr. 23a 40764 Langenfeld / DE | 03 /
TÖPLER, Rudolf Buschfeldstrasse 98-100 51067 Köln / DE | 04 /
HASSE, Eiko Innsbrucker Str. 4 40789 Monheim / DE | [2007/02] | Application number, filing date | 05744399.6 | 27.05.2005 | [2007/02] | WO2005EP05739 | Priority number, date | DE20042010230U | 29.06.2004 Original published format: DE 202004010230 U | DE20042011165U | 15.07.2004 Original published format: DE 202004011165 U | DE20041057638 | 30.11.2004 Original published format: DE102004057638 | [2007/02] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006000285 | Date: | 05.01.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1740469 | Date: | 10.01.2007 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.01.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.01.2006 | Classification | IPC: | B65D5/02 | [2007/02] | CPC: |
B65D5/029 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/02] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | PULVERDICHTE VERPACKUNG | [2007/02] | English: | POWDER-TIGHT PACKAGING | [2007/02] | French: | EMBALLAGE ETANCHE A LA POUDRE | [2007/02] | Entry into regional phase | 27.10.2006 | National basic fee paid | 27.10.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.10.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.10.2006 | Examination requested [2007/02] | 21.02.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.04.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.06.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.10.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/18] | 13.12.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2008/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US2067998 (WILLIAMSON MARSHALL I) [A] 5,6,32 * page 3, column R, line 23 - page 4, column L, line 48; figures 11-19 *; | [Y]US4313556 (BOYLE DANIEL J, et al) [Y] 5,6,18,19,32 * column 2, line 38 - column 3, line 24; figures 1-6c; claims 1-4 *; | [Y]DE29909003U (VG NICOLAUS GMBH [DE]) [Y] 20 * figures 1,2; claim 1 *; | [Y]FR2796043 (SMURFIT SOCAR SA [FR]) [Y] 8-14,18,19,22,32,33 * page 5, line 33 - page 7, line 29; figures 1-7b; claim 1 *; | [A]EP1316508 (TETRA LAVAL HOLDINGS & FINANCE [CH]) [A] 1-4* paragraph [0019] - paragraph [0030]; figures 1-5; claims 1,2 *; | [XY]US2004050725 (COLO' CHIARA [IT], et al) [X] 1-4,7,16,21,24-27,38 * paragraph [0002] * * paragraph [0007] - paragraph [0009] * * paragraph [0017] - paragraph [0018] * * paragraph [0035] - paragraph [0037]; figures 1-5 * [Y] 5,6,8-14,18-20,22,32,33 |