EP1675841 - PROCESS FOR PREPARATION OF MYCOPHENOLATE MOFETIL AND OTHER ESTERS OF MYCOPHENOLIC ACID [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.03.2010 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.03.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 21.04.2010 [2010/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Teva Gyógyszergyár Zártköruen Muködo Részvenytarsaság Pallagi út 13 4042 Debrecen / HU | [2006/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MOLNAR, Sandor Derék u. 126. 1/3 H-4031 Debrecen / HU | 02 /
SZABO, Csaba Tozser u. 1. H-4031 Debrecen / HU | 03 /
TAMAS, Tivadar Szep utca 20 H-4034 Debrecen / HU | 04 /
HAJKO, Janos Zold Sandor utca 20 4/17 H-4028 Debrecen / HU | 05 /
KOSZTYA, Beata Gorgey 18 4032 Debrecen / HU | 06 /
SINGER, Claude 8/8 Daviad Elazar Kfar Saba 44358 / IL | [2007/19] |
Former [2007/15] | 01 /
MOLNAR, Sandor Tocoskert ter 2, IX/71 H-4031 Debrecen / HU | ||
02 /
SZABO, Csaba Tozser u. 1. H-4031 Debrecen / HU | |||
03 /
TAMAS, Tivadar Szep utca 20 H-4034 Debrecen / HU | |||
04 /
HAJKO, Janos Zold Sandor utca 20 4/17 H-4028 Debrecen / HU | |||
05 /
KOSZTYA, Beata Gorgey 18 4032 Debrecen / HU | |||
06 /
SINGER, Claude 8/8 Daviad Elazar Kfar Saba 44358 / IL | |||
Former [2006/27] | 01 /
MOLNAR, Sandor Tocoskert ter 2, IX/71 H-4031 Debrecen / HU | ||
02 /
SZABO, Csaba Tozser u. 1. H-4031 Debrecen / HU | |||
03 /
TAMAS, Tivadar Budai Nagy Antal u.37 H-4034 Debrecen / HU | |||
04 /
HAJKO, Janos Zold Sandor utca 20 4/17 H-4028 Debrecen / HU | |||
05 /
KOSZTYA, Beata Gorgey 18 4032 Debrecen / HU | |||
06 /
SINGER, Claude 8/8 Daviad Elazar Kfar Saba 44358 / IL | Representative(s) | Wong, Kit Yee D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2006/27] | Wong, Kit Yee D Young & Co 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | Application number, filing date | 05744402.8 | 26.04.2005 | [2006/27] | WO2005US14238 | Priority number, date | US20040566056P | 27.04.2004 Original published format: US 566056 P | US20040572985P | 20.05.2004 Original published format: US 572985 P | US20040589400P | 19.07.2004 Original published format: US 589400 P | US20040639151P | 22.12.2004 Original published format: US 639151 P | US20040638478P | 23.12.2004 Original published format: US 638478 P | US20050642867P | 10.01.2005 Original published format: US 642867 P | US20050661485P | 15.03.2005 Original published format: US 661485 P | [2006/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005105771 | Date: | 10.11.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/45] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1675841 | Date: | 05.07.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.11.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.11.2005 | Classification | IPC: | C07D307/88, C07B41/12, C07B63/00 | [2006/27] | CPC: |
C07D307/88 (EP,US);
A61P31/00 (EP);
A61P37/06 (EP);
A61P39/00 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
Y10T436/141111 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/27] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON MYKOPHENOLATMOFETIL UND ANDEREN ESTERN VON MYKOPHENOLSÄURE | [2006/27] | English: | PROCESS FOR PREPARATION OF MYCOPHENOLATE MOFETIL AND OTHER ESTERS OF MYCOPHENOLIC ACID | [2006/27] | French: | PROCEDE DE PREPARATION DE MYCOPHENOLATE MOFETIL ET D'AUTRES ESTERS D'ACIDE MYCOPHENOLIQUE | [2006/27] | Entry into regional phase | 29.11.2005 | National basic fee paid | 29.11.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.11.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.11.2005 | Examination requested [2006/27] | 13.09.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.03.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.02.2009 | Observations by third parties | 12.06.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.10.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/16] | 30.11.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2010/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [DA]US5247083 (KNOX MARTIN [IE], et al) [D] 1-30 * the whole document * [A] ; | [X]WO9401427 (SYNTEX INC [US]) [X] 1,3,6 * page 7, line 17 *; | [XDA]WO0034503 (BIOCON INDIA LIMITED [IN], et al) [XD] 1,3,6,15,16 * examples 1-7 * * the whole document *[A] 1-30; | [XDP]US2004167130 (LEE KWANG-CHUNG [TW], et al) [XDP] 8,12,15-17 * page 1, paragraphs 0009 and 0013 * |