EP1759225 - COMPUTERIZED TOMOGRAPHY METHOD WITH HELICAL RELATIVE MOVEMENT AND CONICAL BEAM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.10.2011 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For:DE
Philips Intellectual Property & Standards GmbH Steindamm 94 20099 Hamburg / DE | For:AT
BE
BG
CH
CY
CZ
DK
EE
ES
FI
FR
GB
GR
HU
IE
IS
IT
LI
LT
LU
MC
NL
PL
PT
RO
SE
SI
SK
TR
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | [2010/48] |
Former [2009/47] | For:DE
Philips Intellectual Property & Standards GmbH Steindamm 94 20099 Hamburg / DE | ||
For:AT
BE
BG
CH
CY
CZ
DK
EE
ES
FI
FR
GB
GR
HU
IE
IS
IT
LI
LT
LU
MC
NL
PL
PT
RO
SE
SI
SK
TR
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | |||
Former [2007/42] | For:DE
Philips Intellectual Property & Standards GmbH Steindamm 94 20099 Hamburg / DE | ||
For:AT
BE
BG
CH
CY
CZ
DK
EE
ES
FI
FR
GB
GR
HU
IE
IS
IT
LI
LT
LU
MC
NL
PL
PT
RO
SE
SI
SK
TR
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | |||
Former [2007/10] | For:DE
Philips Intellectual Property & Standards GmbH Steindamm 94 20099 Hamburg / DE | ||
For:AT
BE
BG
CH
CY
CZ
DK
EE
ES
FI
FR
GB
GR
HU
IE
IS
IT
LI
LT
LU
MC
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BONTUS, Claas, Philips Int. Property & Stand. GmbH Weisshausstr. 2 52066 Aachen / DE | 02 /
KÖHLER, Thomas, Philips Int. Prop. & Stand. GmbH Weisshausstr. 2 52066 Aachen / DE | [2007/10] | Application number, filing date | 05745112.2 | 09.06.2005 | [2007/10] | WO2005IB51904 | Priority number, date | EP20040102608 | 09.06.2004 Original published format: EP 04102608 | [2007/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005121836 | Date: | 22.12.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/51] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1759225 | Date: | 07.03.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.12.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1759225 | Date: | 01.12.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.12.2005 | Classification | IPC: | G01T1/29 | [2007/10] | CPC: |
A61B6/4042 (EP,US);
A61B6/027 (EP,US);
A61B6/032 (EP,US);
A61B6/4035 (EP,US);
A61B6/4085 (EP,US);
G06T11/005 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/10] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | COMPUTERISIERTES TOMOGRAPHIEVERFAHREN MIT HELIXFÖRMIGER RELATIVBEWEGUNG UND KONISCHEM STRAHL | [2007/10] | English: | COMPUTERIZED TOMOGRAPHY METHOD WITH HELICAL RELATIVE MOVEMENT AND CONICAL BEAM | [2007/10] | French: | METHODE DE TOMOGRAPHIE ASSISTEE PAR ORDINATEUR, A MOUVEMENT RELATIF HELICOIDAL ET FAISCEAU CONIQUE | [2007/10] | Entry into regional phase | 09.01.2007 | National basic fee paid | 09.01.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.01.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.01.2007 | Examination requested [2007/10] | 28.06.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.10.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 21.10.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 02.09.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 01.12.2010 | BE | 01.12.2010 | CY | 01.12.2010 | CZ | 01.12.2010 | DK | 01.12.2010 | EE | 01.12.2010 | FI | 01.12.2010 | HU | 01.12.2010 | IT | 01.12.2010 | LT | 01.12.2010 | NL | 01.12.2010 | PL | 01.12.2010 | RO | 01.12.2010 | SE | 01.12.2010 | SI | 01.12.2010 | SK | 01.12.2010 | TR | 01.12.2010 | BG | 01.03.2011 | GR | 02.03.2011 | ES | 12.03.2011 | IS | 01.04.2011 | PT | 01.04.2011 | IE | 09.06.2011 | LU | 09.06.2011 | CH | 30.06.2011 | FR | 30.06.2011 | LI | 30.06.2011 | MC | 30.06.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | AT | 01.12.2010 | |
BE | 01.12.2010 | ||
CY | 01.12.2010 | ||
CZ | 01.12.2010 | ||
DK | 01.12.2010 | ||
EE | 01.12.2010 | ||
FI | 01.12.2010 | ||
IT | 01.12.2010 | ||
LT | 01.12.2010 | ||
NL | 01.12.2010 | ||
PL | 01.12.2010 | ||
RO | 01.12.2010 | ||
SE | 01.12.2010 | ||
SI | 01.12.2010 | ||
SK | 01.12.2010 | ||
TR | 01.12.2010 | ||
BG | 01.03.2011 | ||
GR | 02.03.2011 | ||
ES | 12.03.2011 | ||
IS | 01.04.2011 | ||
PT | 01.04.2011 | ||
IE | 09.06.2011 | ||
LU | 09.06.2011 | ||
CH | 30.06.2011 | ||
FR | 30.06.2011 | ||
LI | 30.06.2011 | ||
MC | 30.06.2011 | ||
Former [2013/25] | AT | 01.12.2010 | |
BE | 01.12.2010 | ||
CY | 01.12.2010 | ||
CZ | 01.12.2010 | ||
DK | 01.12.2010 | ||
EE | 01.12.2010 | ||
FI | 01.12.2010 | ||
IT | 01.12.2010 | ||
LT | 01.12.2010 | ||
NL | 01.12.2010 | ||
PL | 01.12.2010 | ||
RO | 01.12.2010 | ||
SE | 01.12.2010 | ||
SI | 01.12.2010 | ||
SK | 01.12.2010 | ||
BG | 01.03.2011 | ||
GR | 02.03.2011 | ||
ES | 12.03.2011 | ||
IS | 01.04.2011 | ||
PT | 01.04.2011 | ||
IE | 09.06.2011 | ||
LU | 09.06.2011 | ||
CH | 30.06.2011 | ||
FR | 30.06.2011 | ||
LI | 30.06.2011 | ||
MC | 30.06.2011 | ||
Former [2013/21] | AT | 01.12.2010 | |
BE | 01.12.2010 | ||
CY | 01.12.2010 | ||
CZ | 01.12.2010 | ||
DK | 01.12.2010 | ||
EE | 01.12.2010 | ||
FI | 01.12.2010 | ||
IT | 01.12.2010 | ||
LT | 01.12.2010 | ||
NL | 01.12.2010 | ||
PL | 01.12.2010 | ||
RO | 01.12.2010 | ||
SE | 01.12.2010 | ||
SI | 01.12.2010 | ||
SK | 01.12.2010 | ||
BG | 01.03.2011 | ||
GR | 02.03.2011 | ||
ES | 12.03.2011 | ||
IS | 01.04.2011 | ||
PT | 01.04.2011 | ||
IE | 09.06.2011 | ||
CH | 30.06.2011 | ||
FR | 30.06.2011 | ||
LI | 30.06.2011 | ||
MC | 30.06.2011 | ||
Former [2012/23] | AT | 01.12.2010 | |
BE | 01.12.2010 | ||
CY | 01.12.2010 | ||
CZ | 01.12.2010 | ||
DK | 01.12.2010 | ||
EE | 01.12.2010 | ||
FI | 01.12.2010 | ||
IT | 01.12.2010 | ||
LT | 01.12.2010 | ||
NL | 01.12.2010 | ||
PL | 01.12.2010 | ||
RO | 01.12.2010 | ||
SE | 01.12.2010 | ||
SI | 01.12.2010 | ||
SK | 01.12.2010 | ||
BG | 01.03.2011 | ||
GR | 02.03.2011 | ||
ES | 12.03.2011 | ||
IS | 01.04.2011 | ||
PT | 01.04.2011 | ||
IE | 09.06.2011 | ||
CH | 30.06.2011 | ||
FR | 30.06.2011 | ||
LI | 30.06.2011 | ||
Former [2012/20] | AT | 01.12.2010 | |
BE | 01.12.2010 | ||
CY | 01.12.2010 | ||
CZ | 01.12.2010 | ||
DK | 01.12.2010 | ||
EE | 01.12.2010 | ||
FI | 01.12.2010 | ||
IT | 01.12.2010 | ||
LT | 01.12.2010 | ||
NL | 01.12.2010 | ||
PL | 01.12.2010 | ||
RO | 01.12.2010 | ||
SE | 01.12.2010 | ||
SI | 01.12.2010 | ||
SK | 01.12.2010 | ||
BG | 01.03.2011 | ||
GR | 02.03.2011 | ||
ES | 12.03.2011 | ||
IS | 01.04.2011 | ||
PT | 01.04.2011 | ||
IE | 09.06.2011 | ||
CH | 30.06.2011 | ||
LI | 30.06.2011 | ||
Former [2012/03] | AT | 01.12.2010 | |
BE | 01.12.2010 | ||
CY | 01.12.2010 | ||
CZ | 01.12.2010 | ||
DK | 01.12.2010 | ||
EE | 01.12.2010 | ||
FI | 01.12.2010 | ||
IT | 01.12.2010 | ||
LT | 01.12.2010 | ||
NL | 01.12.2010 | ||
PL | 01.12.2010 | ||
RO | 01.12.2010 | ||
SE | 01.12.2010 | ||
SI | 01.12.2010 | ||
SK | 01.12.2010 | ||
BG | 01.03.2011 | ||
GR | 02.03.2011 | ||
ES | 12.03.2011 | ||
IS | 01.04.2011 | ||
PT | 01.04.2011 | ||
Former [2011/47] | AT | 01.12.2010 | |
BE | 01.12.2010 | ||
CY | 01.12.2010 | ||
CZ | 01.12.2010 | ||
DK | 01.12.2010 | ||
EE | 01.12.2010 | ||
FI | 01.12.2010 | ||
LT | 01.12.2010 | ||
NL | 01.12.2010 | ||
PL | 01.12.2010 | ||
RO | 01.12.2010 | ||
SE | 01.12.2010 | ||
SI | 01.12.2010 | ||
SK | 01.12.2010 | ||
BG | 01.03.2011 | ||
GR | 02.03.2011 | ||
ES | 12.03.2011 | ||
IS | 01.04.2011 | ||
PT | 01.04.2011 | ||
Former [2011/37] | AT | 01.12.2010 | |
BE | 01.12.2010 | ||
CY | 01.12.2010 | ||
CZ | 01.12.2010 | ||
EE | 01.12.2010 | ||
FI | 01.12.2010 | ||
LT | 01.12.2010 | ||
NL | 01.12.2010 | ||
PL | 01.12.2010 | ||
RO | 01.12.2010 | ||
SE | 01.12.2010 | ||
SI | 01.12.2010 | ||
SK | 01.12.2010 | ||
BG | 01.03.2011 | ||
GR | 02.03.2011 | ||
ES | 12.03.2011 | ||
IS | 01.04.2011 | ||
PT | 01.04.2011 | ||
Former [2011/35] | AT | 01.12.2010 | |
BE | 01.12.2010 | ||
CY | 01.12.2010 | ||
CZ | 01.12.2010 | ||
EE | 01.12.2010 | ||
FI | 01.12.2010 | ||
LT | 01.12.2010 | ||
NL | 01.12.2010 | ||
SE | 01.12.2010 | ||
SI | 01.12.2010 | ||
BG | 01.03.2011 | ||
GR | 02.03.2011 | ||
ES | 12.03.2011 | ||
IS | 01.04.2011 | ||
PT | 01.04.2011 | ||
Former [2011/32] | AT | 01.12.2010 | |
BE | 01.12.2010 | ||
CY | 01.12.2010 | ||
FI | 01.12.2010 | ||
LT | 01.12.2010 | ||
NL | 01.12.2010 | ||
SE | 01.12.2010 | ||
SI | 01.12.2010 | ||
BG | 01.03.2011 | ||
GR | 02.03.2011 | ||
ES | 12.03.2011 | ||
Former [2011/29] | AT | 01.12.2010 | |
CY | 01.12.2010 | ||
FI | 01.12.2010 | ||
LT | 01.12.2010 | ||
NL | 01.12.2010 | ||
SE | 01.12.2010 | ||
SI | 01.12.2010 | ||
BG | 01.03.2011 | ||
GR | 02.03.2011 | ||
Former [2011/19] | LT | 01.12.2010 | Cited in | International search | [A]US4769757 (HORIBA ISAO [JP], et al) [A] 1-10 * column 5, line 33 - column 11, line 63 * * figures 1-12 *; | [A]US4979111 (NISHIMURA HIROSHI [JP]) [A] 1-10 * column 2, line 25 - column 10, line 56 * * figures 1-12 *; | [A]EP0429191 (PICKER INT INC [US]) [A] 1-10 * column 2, line 27 - column 9, line 33 * * figures 1,2 *; | [A] - PROKSA R ET AL, "The n-PI-Method for Helical Cone-Beam CT", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON MEDICAL IMAGING, IEEE INC. NEW YORK, US, (200009), vol. 19, no. 9, ISSN 0278-0062, pages 848 - 863, XP002241193 [A] 1-10 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/42.887834 |