EP1760377 - ELECTROMAGNETIC VALVE DRIVE METHOD, ELECTROMAGNETIC VALVE DRIVE DEVICE, AND ELECTRIC CABLE COLORING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.02.2013 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.02.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 13.03.2013 [2013/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states YAZAKI CORPORATION 4-28, Mita 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8333 / JP | [2007/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KAMATA, Takeshi, c/o Yazaki Parts Co., Ltd. 1500, Mishu-ku Susono-shi, Shizuoka 4101194 / JP | 02 /
SUGIMURA, Keigo, c/o Yazaki Parts Co., Ltd. 1500, Mishu-ku, Susono-shi Shizuoka 4101194 / JP | 03 /
SAITO, Sei, c/o Yazaki Parts Co., Ltd. 1500, Mishu-ku Susono-shi, Shizuoka 4101194 / JP | 04 /
YAGI, Kiyoshi, c/o Yazaki Corporation 1500, Mishu-ku Susono-shi, Shizuoka 4101194 / JP | [2012/14] |
Former [2007/10] | 01 /
KAMATA, Takeshi, c/o Yazaki Parts Co., Ltd. 1500, Mishu-ku Susono-shi, Shizuoka 4101194 / JP | ||
02 /
SUGIMURA, Keigo, c/o Yazaki Parts Co., Ltd. 1500, Mishu-ku, Susono-shi Shizuoka 4101194 / JP | |||
03 /
SAITO, Sei, c/o Yazaki Parts Co., Ltd. 1500, Mishu-ku Susono-shi, Shizuoka 4101194 / JP | |||
04 /
YAGI, Kiyoshi, c/o Yazaki Corporation 1500, Mishu-ku Susono-shi, Shizuoka 4101194 / JP | Representative(s) | Viering, Jentschura & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Grillparzerstrasse 14 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/14] | Viering, Jentschura & Partner Postfach 22 14 43 80504 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/28] | Viering, Jentschura & Partner Postfach 22 14 43 80504 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/10] | Viering, Jentschura & Partner Postfach 22 14 43 80504 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05745996.8 | 02.06.2005 | [2007/10] | WO2005JP10149 | Priority number, date | JP20040168979 | 07.06.2004 Original published format: JP 2004168979 | [2007/10] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005121620 | Date: | 22.12.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/51] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1760377 | Date: | 07.03.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.12.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1760377 | Date: | 04.04.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 22.12.2005 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.06.2010 | Classification | IPC: | F16K31/06, H01B13/00 | [2007/10] | CPC: |
F16K31/0655 (EP,US);
F16K31/0651 (EP,US);
F16K31/0675 (EP,US);
H01B13/345 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, LT, PT, SK [2007/37] |
Former [2007/10] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM ANSTEUERN EINES ELEKTROMAGNETISCHEN VENTILS, VORRICHTUNG ZUM ANSTEUERN EINES ELEKTROMAGNETISCHEN VENTILS UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM FÄRBEN EINES ELEKTRISCHEN KABELS | [2007/10] | English: | ELECTROMAGNETIC VALVE DRIVE METHOD, ELECTROMAGNETIC VALVE DRIVE DEVICE, AND ELECTRIC CABLE COLORING DEVICE | [2007/10] | French: | PROCEDE DE COMMANDE DE VALVE ELECTROMAGNETIQUE, DISPOSITIF DE COMMANDE DE VALVE ELECTROMAGNETIQUE, ET DISPOSITIF DE COLORATION DE CABLE ELECTRIQUE | [2012/13] |
Former [2007/10] | PROCÉDÉ DE COMMANDE DE VALVE ÉLECTROMAGNÉTIQUE, DISPOSITIF DE COMMANDE DE VALVE ÉLECTROMAGNÉTIQUE, ET DISPOSITIF DE COLORATION DE CÂBLE ÉLECTRIQUE | Entry into regional phase | 06.12.2006 | Translation filed | 06.12.2006 | National basic fee paid | 06.12.2006 | Search fee paid | 06.12.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.12.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.12.2006 | Examination requested [2007/10] | 16.09.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.12.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.10.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.02.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 17.02.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 16.09.2010 | Opposition(s) | 07.01.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]FR1569445 (HERBERT BORNHORST) [X] 1,2 * page 3, line 41 - page 5, line 30; figure - * [Y] 3-5; | [Y]WO2004015722 (YAZAKI CORP [JP], et al) [Y] 3-5 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0377449 (KABELMETAL ELECTRO GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-5 * column 2, line 54 - column 4, line 28; figure - *; | [A]US3762683 (SANGL D) [A] 1-5 * column 3, line 3 - column 4, line 28; figure - * | International search | [A]JP2004134371 (YAZAKI CORP); | [A]JPH0992056 (HITACHI CABLE); | [A]JP2003240150 (SHIMADZU CORP); | [A]WO03019580 (YAZAKI CORP [JP], et al); | [A]JPS6241973U | by applicant | JPH05111947 | JPH06119833 | JPH0992056 | WO03019580 | JP2003193904 |