EP1782251 - A METHOD FOR PREVENTING INPUT INFORMATION FROM EXPOSING TO OBSERVERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.04.2011 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.04.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.05.2011 [2011/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Park, Seoung-bae Unri Village Dong-bu Centreville 664-6 Pungam-dong Seo-gu Gwangju 502-156 / KR | [2007/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2007/19] | Representative(s) | Greene, Simon Kenneth Elkington and Fife LLP Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2007/19] | Greene, Simon Kenneth Elkington and Fife LLP, Prospect House, 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks Kent TN13 1XR / GB | Application number, filing date | 05746098.2 | 31.05.2005 | [2007/19] | WO2005KR01619 | Priority number, date | KR4039209 | 31.05.2004 Original published format: PCT/KR4039/209 | [2007/19] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005116860 | Date: | 08.12.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1782251 | Date: | 09.05.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.12.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 08.12.2005 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.12.2009 | Classification | IPC: | G06F17/00, G06F1/00 | [2010/03] | CPC: |
G06F21/36 (EP,US);
G06F17/00 (KR);
G06F21/00 (KR);
G06F3/023 (KR);
H04M1/23 (KR)
|
Former IPC [2007/19] | G06F17/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/19] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM VERHINDERN, DASS EINGEGEBENE INFORMATIONEN BEOBACHTERN AUSGESETZT WERDEN | [2007/19] | English: | A METHOD FOR PREVENTING INPUT INFORMATION FROM EXPOSING TO OBSERVERS | [2007/19] | French: | PROCEDE POUR EMPECHER L'EXPOSITION D'INFORMATIONS D'ENTREE | [2007/19] | Entry into regional phase | 08.12.2005 | Translation filed | 27.12.2006 | National basic fee paid | 27.12.2006 | Search fee paid | 27.12.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.12.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.12.2005 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: KR | 27.12.2006 | Examination requested [2007/19] | 26.05.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.12.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/21] | 11.01.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2011/21] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 26.05.2010 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.05.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO2004027632 (PARK SEUNG-BAE [KR], et al) [X] 1-7 * page 37, line 11 - page 39, line 10 * * page 44, line 8 - page 45, line 10 * * figures 28,29 *; | [X]US2004030933 (PARK SEOUNG-BAE [KR]) [X] 1-3 * paragraphs [0051] - [0059] *; | [A]US5815083 (PATARIN JACQUES [FR], et al) [A] 1-11 * column 3 - column 7 * | [X] - SEUNGBAE PARK ET AL, "New Authentication Systems", GRID AND COOPERATIVE COMPUTING; [LECTURE NOTES IN COMPUTER SCIENCE;;LNCS], SPRINGER-VERLAG, BERLIN/HEIDELBERG, (20040417), vol. 3032, ISBN 978-3-540-21988-0, pages 1095 - 1098, XP019004698 [X] 1-3,8-11 * abstract * * Section 3.1 * | International search | [A]KR20010109864 (THREEWIN COM CO LTD [KR]); | [A]KR20020070692 (SEOL DONG SEOK [KR]); | [A]KR20010035407 (LEE DONG GI [KR]) |