EP1756591 - MULTI-AXIS CAPACITIVE TRANSDUCER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2007/09] | MULTI-AXIS CAPACITIVE TRANSDUCER AND MANUFACTURING METHOD FOR PRODUCING IT | ||
[2007/21] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.01.2009 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.12.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 05.01.2011 [2011/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ETH Zurich ETH Transfer Rämistrasse 101 8092 Zürich / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2007/09] | For all designated states ETH Zürich ETH Transfer, Rämistrasse 101 8092 Zürich / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BEYELER, Felix Allenmoosstrasse 101 CH-8092 Zürich / CH | 02 /
NELSON, Bradley, J. Lettenstrasse 5 CH-8126 Zumikon / CH | 03 /
SUN, Yu 705 Spadina Ave. 1 Toronto, M5S 2J4 / CA | [2007/17] |
Former [2007/09] | 01 /
BEYELER, Felix Winterthurerstrasse 374 CH-8057 Zürich / CH | ||
02 /
NELSON, Bradley, J. Lettenstrasse 5 CH-8126 Zumikon / CH | |||
03 /
SUN, Yu 705 Spadina Ave. 1 Toronto, M5S 2J4 / CA | Representative(s) | Kley, Hansjörg, et al Siemens AG Postfach 22 16 34 80506 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/09] | Kley, Hansjörg, et al c/o Siemens AG Patentabteilung Postfach 22 16 34 80506 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05746188.1 | 27.05.2005 | [2007/09] | WO2005EP05770 | Priority number, date | US20040578079P | 09.06.2004 Original published format: US 578079 P | [2007/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005121812 | Date: | 22.12.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/51] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1756591 | Date: | 28.02.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.12.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1756591 | Date: | 19.03.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.12.2005 | Classification | IPC: | G01P15/125, G01P15/18, G01P15/08, H02N1/00, B81B3/00, G01L1/14, G01L5/16 | [2007/09] | CPC: |
G01P15/125 (EP,US);
G01P15/0802 (EP,US);
G01P15/0888 (EP,US);
G01P15/18 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/09] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MEHRACHSIGER KAPAZITIVER WANDLER | [2007/21] | English: | MULTI-AXIS CAPACITIVE TRANSDUCER | [2007/21] | French: | TRANSDUCTEUR CAPACITIF MULTI-AXIAL | [2007/21] |
Former [2007/09] | KAPAZITIVER MEHRACHSENWANDLER UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN ZU SEINER PRODUKTION | ||
Former [2007/09] | MULTI-AXIS CAPACITIVE TRANSDUCER AND MANUFACTURING METHOD FOR PRODUCING IT | ||
Former [2007/09] | TRANSDUCTEUR CAPACITIF A PLUSIEURS AXES ET SON PROCEDE DE FABRICATION | Entry into regional phase | 08.01.2007 | National basic fee paid | 08.01.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.01.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.01.2007 | Examination requested [2007/09] | 28.03.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.04.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.10.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.02.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 04.02.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.12.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 19.03.2008 | BE | 19.03.2008 | CY | 19.03.2008 | CZ | 19.03.2008 | DK | 19.03.2008 | EE | 19.03.2008 | FI | 19.03.2008 | IT | 19.03.2008 | LT | 19.03.2008 | NL | 19.03.2008 | PL | 19.03.2008 | RO | 19.03.2008 | SI | 19.03.2008 | SK | 19.03.2008 | TR | 19.03.2008 | IE | 27.05.2008 | LU | 27.05.2008 | MC | 31.05.2008 | BG | 19.06.2008 | SE | 19.06.2008 | GR | 20.06.2008 | ES | 30.06.2008 | IS | 19.07.2008 | PT | 27.08.2008 | HU | 20.09.2008 | [2011/01] |
Former [2010/39] | AT | 19.03.2008 | |
BE | 19.03.2008 | ||
CY | 19.03.2008 | ||
CZ | 19.03.2008 | ||
DK | 19.03.2008 | ||
EE | 19.03.2008 | ||
FI | 19.03.2008 | ||
IT | 19.03.2008 | ||
LT | 19.03.2008 | ||
NL | 19.03.2008 | ||
PL | 19.03.2008 | ||
RO | 19.03.2008 | ||
SI | 19.03.2008 | ||
SK | 19.03.2008 | ||
TR | 19.03.2008 | ||
IE | 27.05.2008 | ||
LU | 27.05.2008 | ||
MC | 31.05.2008 | ||
BG | 19.06.2008 | ||
SE | 19.06.2008 | ||
ES | 30.06.2008 | ||
IS | 19.07.2008 | ||
PT | 27.08.2008 | ||
HU | 20.09.2008 | ||
Former [2010/33] | AT | 19.03.2008 | |
BE | 19.03.2008 | ||
CY | 19.03.2008 | ||
CZ | 19.03.2008 | ||
DK | 19.03.2008 | ||
EE | 19.03.2008 | ||
FI | 19.03.2008 | ||
IT | 19.03.2008 | ||
LT | 19.03.2008 | ||
NL | 19.03.2008 | ||
PL | 19.03.2008 | ||
RO | 19.03.2008 | ||
SI | 19.03.2008 | ||
SK | 19.03.2008 | ||
IE | 27.05.2008 | ||
LU | 27.05.2008 | ||
MC | 31.05.2008 | ||
BG | 19.06.2008 | ||
SE | 19.06.2008 | ||
ES | 30.06.2008 | ||
IS | 19.07.2008 | ||
PT | 27.08.2008 | ||
Former [2009/48] | AT | 19.03.2008 | |
BE | 19.03.2008 | ||
CY | 19.03.2008 | ||
CZ | 19.03.2008 | ||
DK | 19.03.2008 | ||
EE | 19.03.2008 | ||
FI | 19.03.2008 | ||
IT | 19.03.2008 | ||
LT | 19.03.2008 | ||
NL | 19.03.2008 | ||
PL | 19.03.2008 | ||
RO | 19.03.2008 | ||
SI | 19.03.2008 | ||
SK | 19.03.2008 | ||
IE | 27.05.2008 | ||
MC | 31.05.2008 | ||
BG | 19.06.2008 | ||
SE | 19.06.2008 | ||
ES | 30.06.2008 | ||
IS | 19.07.2008 | ||
PT | 27.08.2008 | ||
Former [2009/27] | AT | 19.03.2008 | |
BE | 19.03.2008 | ||
CZ | 19.03.2008 | ||
DK | 19.03.2008 | ||
EE | 19.03.2008 | ||
FI | 19.03.2008 | ||
LT | 19.03.2008 | ||
NL | 19.03.2008 | ||
PL | 19.03.2008 | ||
RO | 19.03.2008 | ||
SI | 19.03.2008 | ||
SK | 19.03.2008 | ||
IE | 27.05.2008 | ||
MC | 31.05.2008 | ||
BG | 19.06.2008 | ||
SE | 19.06.2008 | ||
ES | 30.06.2008 | ||
IS | 19.07.2008 | ||
PT | 27.08.2008 | ||
Former [2009/22] | AT | 19.03.2008 | |
BE | 19.03.2008 | ||
CZ | 19.03.2008 | ||
DK | 19.03.2008 | ||
EE | 19.03.2008 | ||
FI | 19.03.2008 | ||
LT | 19.03.2008 | ||
NL | 19.03.2008 | ||
PL | 19.03.2008 | ||
RO | 19.03.2008 | ||
SI | 19.03.2008 | ||
SK | 19.03.2008 | ||
MC | 31.05.2008 | ||
SE | 19.06.2008 | ||
ES | 30.06.2008 | ||
IS | 19.07.2008 | ||
PT | 27.08.2008 | ||
Former [2009/09] | AT | 19.03.2008 | |
BE | 19.03.2008 | ||
CZ | 19.03.2008 | ||
DK | 19.03.2008 | ||
FI | 19.03.2008 | ||
LT | 19.03.2008 | ||
NL | 19.03.2008 | ||
PL | 19.03.2008 | ||
RO | 19.03.2008 | ||
SI | 19.03.2008 | ||
SK | 19.03.2008 | ||
MC | 31.05.2008 | ||
SE | 19.06.2008 | ||
ES | 30.06.2008 | ||
IS | 19.07.2008 | ||
PT | 27.08.2008 | ||
Former [2009/04] | AT | 19.03.2008 | |
BE | 19.03.2008 | ||
CZ | 19.03.2008 | ||
FI | 19.03.2008 | ||
LT | 19.03.2008 | ||
NL | 19.03.2008 | ||
PL | 19.03.2008 | ||
RO | 19.03.2008 | ||
SI | 19.03.2008 | ||
SK | 19.03.2008 | ||
MC | 31.05.2008 | ||
SE | 19.06.2008 | ||
ES | 30.06.2008 | ||
IS | 19.07.2008 | ||
PT | 27.08.2008 | ||
Former [2009/01] | AT | 19.03.2008 | |
BE | 19.03.2008 | ||
CZ | 19.03.2008 | ||
FI | 19.03.2008 | ||
LT | 19.03.2008 | ||
NL | 19.03.2008 | ||
PL | 19.03.2008 | ||
RO | 19.03.2008 | ||
SI | 19.03.2008 | ||
SK | 19.03.2008 | ||
SE | 19.06.2008 | ||
ES | 30.06.2008 | ||
PT | 27.08.2008 | ||
Former [2008/49] | AT | 19.03.2008 | |
BE | 19.03.2008 | ||
CZ | 19.03.2008 | ||
FI | 19.03.2008 | ||
LT | 19.03.2008 | ||
PL | 19.03.2008 | ||
RO | 19.03.2008 | ||
SI | 19.03.2008 | ||
SK | 19.03.2008 | ||
SE | 19.06.2008 | ||
ES | 30.06.2008 | ||
PT | 27.08.2008 | ||
Former [2008/46] | AT | 19.03.2008 | |
BE | 19.03.2008 | ||
FI | 19.03.2008 | ||
LT | 19.03.2008 | ||
PL | 19.03.2008 | ||
SI | 19.03.2008 | ||
SE | 19.06.2008 | ||
ES | 30.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/44] | AT | 19.03.2008 | |
BE | 19.03.2008 | ||
FI | 19.03.2008 | ||
LT | 19.03.2008 | ||
PL | 19.03.2008 | ||
SI | 19.03.2008 | ||
Former [2008/43] | AT | 19.03.2008 | |
BE | 19.03.2008 | ||
FI | 19.03.2008 | ||
LT | 19.03.2008 | ||
PL | 19.03.2008 | ||
Former [2008/39] | AT | 19.03.2008 | |
FI | 19.03.2008 | ||
LT | 19.03.2008 | Cited in | International search | [XI]US5806365 (ZUNINO HELEN M [US], et al) [X] 1,2,5-8 * column 1, line 61 - column 3, line 44 * * column 4, line 57 - column 5, line 65; figure - * [I] 3,4,9; | [A]US2001004846 (KAWAI HIROSHI [JP]) [A] 1-9* paragraphs [0093] - [0097]; figure 5 *; | [DA] - LEMKIN M A ET AL, "A 3-axis force balanced accelerometer using a single proof-mass", 1997 INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON SOLID-STATE SENSORS AND ACTUATORS. DIGEST OF TECHNICAL PAPERS. TRANSDUCERS 97. CHICAGO, IL, JUNE 16 - 19, 1997. SESSIONS 3A1 - 4D3. PAPERS NO. 3A1.01 - 4D3.14P, INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON SOLID-STATE SENSORS AND ACTU, (19970616), VOL. 2, ISBN 0-7803-3829-4, pages 1185 - 1188, XP010240691 [DA] 1-9 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/SENSOR.1997.635417 | [A] - SUN YU ET AL, "A bulk microfabricated multi-axis capacitive cellular force sensor using transverse comb drives", COMPENDEX, ENGINEERING INFORMATION, INC., NEW YORK, NY, US, Database accession no. E2002497256212, XP002343174 [A] 1 * abstract * | [DA] - J MICROMECH MICROENGINEERING; JOURNAL OF MICROMECHANICS AND MICROENGINEERING NOVEMBER 2002, (200211), vol. 12, no. 6, pages 832 - 840, XP002343140 [DA] 4 * page 833, column R; figures 1,2,9 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1088/0960-1317/12/6/314 |