EP1730238 - MIXED FLUORINATED ORGANIC COMPOUND/SILICON COMPOSITION FOR CONFERRING OIL-REPELLENCY AND/OR WATER-REPELLENCY ON A TEXTILE MATERIAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.05.2016 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.05.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.06.2016 [2016/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bluestar Silicones France 21 Avenue Georges Pompidou Batiment B - Danica 69486 Lyon Cedex 03 / FR | [2010/42] |
Former [2006/50] | For all designated states RHODIA CHIMIE 40 rue de la Haie Coq 93300 Aubervilliers / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DERUELLE, Martial 12 Lotissement Marie Thelisson, Ch. de la Civaude F-69440 Mornant / FR | 02 /
GIRAUD, Yves 11 rue du Brulet F-69110 Sainte Foy les Lyon / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2006/50] | 01 /
DERUELLE, Martial 12 Lotissement Marie Thelisson,Ch. de la Civaude F-69440 Mornant / FR | ||
02 /
GIRAUD, Yves 11 rue du Brulet F-69110 Sainte Foy les Lyon / FR | Representative(s) | Mekki, Boualem, et al Elkem Silicones France SAS 9, rue Spécia 69190 Saint-Fons / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2010/42] | Mekki, Boualem, et al Bluestar Silicones France 55, avenue des Frères Perret 69191 Saint-Fons / FR | ||
Former [2009/27] | Valentino, Cédric Rhodia Services DPI Centre de Recherches de Lyon 85 Avenue des Frères Perret 69190 Saint-Fons / FR | ||
Former [2006/50] | Valentino, Cédric Rhodia Services - DPI CRTL - 85, avenue des frères Perret 69190 Saint-Fons / FR | Application number, filing date | 05746805.0 | 30.03.2005 | [2006/50] | WO2005FR00767 | Priority number, date | FR20040003386 | 31.03.2004 Original published format: FR 0403386 | [2006/50] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005095519 | Date: | 13.10.2005 | Language: | FR | [2005/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1730238 | Date: | 13.12.2006 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.10.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.10.2005 | Classification | IPC: | D06M15/643, D06M15/277, C08L83/04 | [2015/38] | CPC: |
D06M15/643 (EP,KR,US);
C08L33/08 (KR);
C08L83/04 (KR);
D06M15/277 (EP,KR,US);
C08L2203/12 (KR)
|
Former IPC [2006/50] | C08L83/04 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/50] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | EINE FLUORIERTE ORGANISCHE VERBINDUNG UND SILICIUM ENTHALTENDE GEMISCHTE ZUSAMMENSETZUNG ZUR OLEOPHOBIERUNG ODER HYDROPHOBIERUNG EINES TEXTILMATERIALS | [2006/50] | English: | MIXED FLUORINATED ORGANIC COMPOUND/SILICON COMPOSITION FOR CONFERRING OIL-REPELLENCY AND/OR WATER-REPELLENCY ON A TEXTILE MATERIAL | [2006/50] | French: | COMPOSITION MIXTE SILICONE-COMPOSE ORGANIQUE FLUORE POUR CONFERER DE L'OLEOPHOBIE ET/OU DE L'HYDROPHOBIE A UN MATERIAU TEXTILE | [2006/50] | Entry into regional phase | 06.10.2006 | National basic fee paid | 06.10.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.10.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.10.2006 | Examination requested [2006/50] | 12.04.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.10.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.08.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.01.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/26] | 10.02.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2016/26] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 12.04.2010 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 11.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 12.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 10.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2016 | 12   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0436327 (MINNESOTA MINING & MFG [US]) [A] 1,21,26 * page 2, line 44 - line 51 * * page 4, line 21 - line 24; claim - *; | [X]US2003157256 (YAMAGUCHI FUMIHIKO [JP], et al) [X] 1,21,26 * paragraph [0007] * * paragraph [0028] - paragraph [0078] * * paragraph [0079] - paragraph [0127] *; | [A]EP1264863 (CIBA SC PFERSEE GMBH [DE]) [A] 1,21,26 * the whole document *; | [A]WO9813410 (RHONE POULENC CHIMIE [FR], et al) [A] 1,21,26 * the whole document * |