EP1879772 - METHOD FOR OPERATING A MOTOR VEHICLE WITH A LARGE NUMBER OF FUNCTION SYSTEMS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 21.09.2012 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.09.2012 | Refusal of application | published on 24.10.2012 [2012/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bayerische Motoren Werke Aktiengesellschaft Petuelring 130 80809 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/04] | For all designated states Bayerische Motorenwerke Aktiengesellschaft Petuelring 130 80809 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DECKE, Ralf Oskar-von-Miller-Strasse 6a 82008 Unterhaching / DE | 02 /
ALTHOFF, Frank Schwarzspechtstr. 11 81827 München / DE | 03 /
STRENZL, Karl Ludwig-Thoma-Strasse 14 82110 Germering / DE | 04 /
RIES, Klaus Kienestrasse 1 80933 München / DE | [2008/04] | Application number, filing date | 05747697.0 | 11.05.2005 | [2008/04] | WO2005EP05064 | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006119788 | Date: | 16.11.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1879772 | Date: | 23.01.2008 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.11.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.11.2006 | Classification | IPC: | B60R16/02 | [2008/04] | CPC: |
B60W50/00 (EP,US);
B60R16/037 (EP,US);
B60R25/2081 (EP,US);
B60W2050/0005 (EP,US);
B60W2050/0045 (EP,US);
B60W2050/065 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2008/34] |
Former [2008/04] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM BETREIBEN EINES KRAFTFAHRZEUGS MIT EINER VIELZAHL AN FUNKTIONSSYSTEMEN | [2008/04] | English: | METHOD FOR OPERATING A MOTOR VEHICLE WITH A LARGE NUMBER OF FUNCTION SYSTEMS | [2008/04] | French: | PROCEDE PERMETTANT DE FAIRE FONCTIONNER UN VEHICULE AU MOYEN D'UNE PLURALITE DE SYSTEMES FONCTIONNELS | [2008/04] | Entry into regional phase | 13.10.2007 | National basic fee paid | 13.10.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.10.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.10.2007 | Examination requested [2008/04] | 10.08.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.02.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.10.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.04.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.06.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2012/43] | 15.06.2012 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2012/43] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 10.08.2010 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 18.05.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]EP0626527 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [X] 1,6,7,11 * figures 1-6 *; | [YA]DE10015114 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [Y] 2-5 * abstract * * paragraphs [0020] , [0021]; figures 1-4 * [A] 1,11; | [XY]DE10103044 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [X] 1,9,10 * paragraphs [0001] , [0003] * * column 2, lines 66-68 * * column 3, line 27 - column 4, line 28; figures 1,2 * [Y] 2-5; | [DA]EP1316478 (DAIMLER CHRYSLER AG [DE]) [DA] 1 * abstract ** paragraphs [0003] , [0004] , [0008] , [0013] - [0015] - [0022] *; | [XY]DE10345746 (DAIMLER CHRYSLER AG [DE]) [X] 1,9,10 * abstract * * paragraphs [0001] , [0002] , [0004] - [0006] - [0014] - [0018] - [0021] , [0024] * * claims 1,7 * [Y] 2-5 | Examination | EP1704073 | by applicant | EP0626527 | DE19926206 | DE10103044 | DE10345746 |