EP1759013 - IDENTIFICATION OF SURFACE-ASSOCIATED ANTIGENS FOR TUMOR DIAGNOSIS AND THERAPY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.03.2011 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BG | published on 16.10.2013 [2013/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ganymed Pharmaceuticals AG Freiligrathstrasse 12 55131 Mainz / DE | [2010/20] |
Former [2007/10] | For all designated states Ganymed Pharmaceuticals AG Freiligrathstr. 12 55131 Mainz / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TÜRECI, Özlem Philipp-von-Zabern-Platz 1 55116 Mainz / DE | 02 /
SAHIN, Ugur Philipp-von-Zabern-Platz 1 55116 Mainz / DE | 03 /
SCHNEIDER, Sandra Lutherstr. 4 76297 Stutensee / DE | 04 /
HELFTENBEIN, Gerd Nieder-Ohmener Str. 16 35329 Gemünden / DE | 05 /
SCHLÜTER, Volker Zacherlweg 18 82061 Neuried / DE | 06 /
USENER, Dirk Richard-Wagner-Str. 87b 65193 Wiesbaden / DE | 07 /
THIEL, Philippe Käthe-Kollwitz-Strasse 4 82152 Planegg / DE | 08 /
KOSLOWSKI, Michael Kaiserstrasse 72 55116 Mainz / DE | [2010/16] |
Former [2008/50] | 01 /
TÜRECI, Özlem Philipp-von-Zabern-Platz 1 55116 Mainz / DE | ||
02 /
SAHIN, Ugur Philipp-von-Zabern-Platz 1 55116 Mainz / DE | |||
03 /
SCHNEIDER, Sandra Lutherstr. 4 76297 Stutensee / DE | |||
04 /
HELFTENBEIN, Gerd Nieder-Ohmener Str. 16 35329 Gemünden / DE | |||
05 /
SCHLÜTER, Volker Zacherlweg 18 82061 Neuried / DE | |||
06 /
USENER, Dirk Richard-Wagner-Str. 87b 65193 Wiesbaden / DE | |||
07 /
THIEL, Philippe Käthe-Kollwitz-Strasse 4 82152 Planegg / DE | |||
Former [2008/01] | 01 /
TÜRECI, Özlem Philipp-von-Zabern-Platz 1 55116 Mainz / DE | ||
02 /
SAHIN, Ugur Philipp-von-Zabern-Platz 1 55116 Mainz / DE | |||
03 /
SCHNEIDER, Sandra Lutherstr. 4 76297 Stutensee / DE | |||
04 /
HELFTENBEIN, Gerd Nieder-Ohmener Str. 16 35329 Gemünden / DE | |||
05 /
SCHLÜTER, Volker Zacherlweg 18 82061 Neuried / DE | |||
06 /
USENER, Dirk Richard-Wagner-Str. 87b 65193 Wiesbaden / DE | |||
07 /
THIEL, Philippe Karl-Sieben-Strasse 6 55268 Nieder-Olm / DE | |||
Former [2007/23] | 01 /
TÜRECI, Özlem Philipp-von-Zabern-Platz 1 55116 Mainz / DE | ||
02 /
SAHIN, Ugur Philipp-von-Zabern-Platz 1 55116 Mainz / DE | |||
03 /
SCHNEIDER, Sandra Lutherstr. 4 76297 Stutensee / DE | |||
04 /
HELFTENBEIN, Gerd Nieder-Ohmener Str. 16 35329 Gemünden / DE | |||
05 /
SCHLÜTER, Volker Zacherlweg 14 82061 Neuried / DE | |||
06 /
USENER, Dirk Richard-Wagner-Str. 87b 65193 Wiesbaden / DE | |||
07 /
THIEL, Philippe Karl-Sieben-Strasse 6 55268 Nieder-Olm / DE | |||
Former [2007/10] | 01 /
TÜRECI, Özlem Philipp-von-Zabern-Platz 1 55116 Mainz / DE | ||
02 /
SAHIN, Ugur Philipp-von-Zabern-Platz 1 55116 Mainz / DE | |||
03 /
SCHNEIDER, Sandra Wilhelm-Blos-Strasse 10 68199 Mannheim / DE | |||
04 /
HELFTENBEIN, Gerd Nieder-Ohmener Str. 16 35329 Gemünden / DE | |||
05 /
SCHLÜTER, Volker Gilmstrasse 64 81377 München / DE | |||
06 /
USENER, Dirk Mainzer Strasse 25a 65185 Wiesbaden / DE | |||
07 /
THIEL, Philippe Karl-Sieben-Strasse 6 55268 Nieder-Olm / DE | Representative(s) | Schnappauf, Georg ZSP Patentanwälte PartG mbB Hansastraße 32 80686 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/10] | Schnappauf, Georg Dr. Volker Vossius Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Geibelstrasse 6 81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05747772.1 | 11.05.2005 | [2007/10] | WO2005EP05104 | Priority number, date | DE20041023187 | 11.05.2004 Original published format: DE102004023187 | [2007/10] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2005110338 | Date: | 24.11.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/47] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1759013 | Date: | 07.03.2007 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.11.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1759013 | Date: | 19.05.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.06.2006 | Classification | IPC: | C12Q1/68 | [2007/10] | CPC: |
C12Q1/6886 (EP,US);
A61K39/39558 (US);
A61K45/06 (US);
A61P13/08 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P35/04 (EP);
A61P37/04 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
C07K14/4748 (US);
C07K16/28 (US);
C07K16/30 (US);
C12Q1/686 (US);
A61K39/395 (US);
C12Q2600/106 (EP,US);
C12Q2600/156 (EP,US);
G01N33/53 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/10] | Extension states | AL | 18.10.2006 | BA | 18.10.2006 | HR | 18.10.2006 | LV | 18.10.2006 | MK | 18.10.2006 | YU | 18.10.2006 | Title | German: | IDENTIFIZIERUNG VON OBERFLÄCHEN-ASSOZIIERTEN ANTIGENEN FÜR DIE TUMORDIAGNOSE UND -THERAPIE | [2007/10] | English: | IDENTIFICATION OF SURFACE-ASSOCIATED ANTIGENS FOR TUMOR DIAGNOSIS AND THERAPY | [2007/10] | French: | IDENTIFICATION D'ANTIGENES DE SURFACE POUR LE DIAGNOSTIC ET LA THERAPIE DE TUMEURS | [2007/10] | Entry into regional phase | 18.10.2006 | National basic fee paid | 18.10.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.10.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.10.2006 | Examination requested [2007/10] | 15.02.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.01.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.07.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.10.2009 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 27.10.2009 | 27.10.2009 | Date of oral proceedings | 27.10.2009 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 25.11.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.03.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 25.03.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP10005074.9 / EP2239340 | EP10010155.9 / EP2280082 | EP10010156.7 / EP2348135 | EP10010157.5 / EP2275570 | EP10010158.3 / EP2290103 | EP10010159.1 / EP2275571 | EP10010160.9 / EP2290104 | EP10010161.7 / EP2258867 | EP10010162.5 / EP2258868 | EP10010163.3 / EP2258869 | EP10010164.1 / EP2287337 | EP10010165.8 / EP2267156 | EP10010166.6 / EP2267157 | EP10010167.4 / EP2270209 | EP10010168.2 / EP2267158 | EP10010640.0 / EP2275572 | EP18157525.9 | Opposition(s) | 22.02.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 19.05.2010 | EE | 19.05.2010 | RO | 19.05.2010 | SK | 19.05.2010 | BG | 19.08.2010 | IS | 19.09.2010 | [2013/42] |
Former [2011/11] | CY | 19.05.2010 | |
EE | 19.05.2010 | ||
RO | 19.05.2010 | ||
SK | 19.05.2010 | ||
IS | 19.09.2010 | ||
Former [2011/05] | CY | 19.05.2010 | |
IS | 19.09.2010 | ||
Former [2011/01] | IS | 19.09.2010 | Cited in | International search | [A]WO03000928 (ODIN MEDICAL AS [DK], et al) [A] 1-97 * the whole document *; | EP1293569 [ ] (HELIX RES INST [JP], et al); | [A]WO03076631 (SAHIN UGUR [DE], et al) [A] 1-97 * the whole document *; | [PA]WO2004047863 (GANYMED PHARMACEUTICALS AG [DE], et al) [PA] 1-97 * the whole document *; | [X] - "AGENCOURT_7926639 NIH_MGC_72 Homo sapiens cDNA clone IMAGE:6160718 5', mRNA sequence.", EMBL, (20020528), Database accession no. BQ427878, URL: EBI, XP002358303 [X] 1-97 * the whole document * | [X] - "Sequence 695 from Patent EP1293569.", EMBL, (20030415), Database accession no. AX714011, URL: EBI, XP002358304 [X] 10,73,74 * the whole document * | [X] - "Homo sapiens cDNA FLJ31461 fis, clone NT2NE2001247.", EMBL, (20011031), Database accession no. AK056023, URL: EBI, XP002358305 [X] 10,73,74 * the whole document * | [X] - "Hypothetical protein FLJ31461.", UniProt, (20011201), Database accession no. Q96N35, URL: EBI, XP002358306 [X] 10,73,74 * the whole document * | [A] - SCHEURLE DANIELA ET AL, "Cancer gene discovery using Digital Differential Display", CANCER RESEARCH, AMERICAN ASSOCIATION FOR CANCER RESEARCH, BALTIMORE, MD, US, (20000801), vol. 60, no. 15, ISSN 0008-5472, pages 4037 - 4043, XP002256957 [A] 1-97 * the whole document * |