EP1779115 - METHOD FOR DETECTING GLUTEN [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.11.2010 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 21.11.2012 [2012/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Academisch Ziekenhuis Leiden Albinusdreef 2 2333 ZA Leiden / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2007/18] | For all designated states Academisch Ziekenhuis Leiden Albinusdreef 2 2333 ZA Leiden / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DRIJFHOUT, Jan, Wouter Da Costastraat 41 NL-2321 AK Leiden / NL | 02 /
KONING, Frits Zadelmaker 20 NL-2353 WR Leiderdorp / NL | 03 /
SPAENIJ-DEKKING, Elisabeth, Hermine, Adriane Johanna Westerdijkstraat 30 NL-2331 MZ Leiden / NL | [2007/18] | Representative(s) | van Loon, C.J.J., et al Vereenigde Johan de Wittlaan 7 2517 JR Den Haag / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2008/34] | van Loon, C.J.J., et al Vereenigde Johan de Wittlaan 7 2517 JR Den Haag / NL | ||
Former [2008/09] | van Loon, C.J.J., et al c/o VEREENIGDE Johan de Wittlaan 7 2517 JR Den Haag / NL | Application number, filing date | 05749181.3 | 01.06.2005 | [2007/18] | WO2005NL00400 | Priority number, date | EP20040076902 | 30.06.2004 Original published format: EP 04076902 | [2007/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2006004394 | Date: | 12.01.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/02] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1779115 | Date: | 02.05.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.01.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1779115 | Date: | 20.01.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.03.2006 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/564, G01N33/68 | [2007/18] | CPC: |
G01N33/564 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/18] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM NACHWEIS VON GLUTEN | [2007/18] | English: | METHOD FOR DETECTING GLUTEN | [2007/18] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE DOSAGE DU GLUTEN | [2007/18] | Entry into regional phase | 30.01.2007 | National basic fee paid | 30.01.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.01.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.01.2007 | Examination requested [2007/18] | 29.01.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.08.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.02.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.06.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.07.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.11.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 30.11.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.10.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 20.01.2010 | BE | 20.01.2010 | CY | 20.01.2010 | CZ | 20.01.2010 | DK | 20.01.2010 | EE | 20.01.2010 | FI | 20.01.2010 | IT | 20.01.2010 | LT | 20.01.2010 | PL | 20.01.2010 | RO | 20.01.2010 | SE | 20.01.2010 | SI | 20.01.2010 | SK | 20.01.2010 | TR | 20.01.2010 | BG | 20.04.2010 | GR | 21.04.2010 | ES | 01.05.2010 | IS | 20.05.2010 | PT | 20.05.2010 | IE | 01.06.2010 | LU | 01.06.2010 | CH | 30.06.2010 | LI | 30.06.2010 | MC | 30.06.2010 | HU | 21.07.2010 | [2012/47] |
Former [2012/43] | AT | 20.01.2010 | |
BE | 20.01.2010 | ||
CY | 20.01.2010 | ||
CZ | 20.01.2010 | ||
DK | 20.01.2010 | ||
EE | 20.01.2010 | ||
FI | 20.01.2010 | ||
IT | 20.01.2010 | ||
LT | 20.01.2010 | ||
PL | 20.01.2010 | ||
RO | 20.01.2010 | ||
SE | 20.01.2010 | ||
SI | 20.01.2010 | ||
SK | 20.01.2010 | ||
BG | 20.04.2010 | ||
GR | 21.04.2010 | ||
ES | 01.05.2010 | ||
IS | 20.05.2010 | ||
PT | 20.05.2010 | ||
IE | 01.06.2010 | ||
LU | 01.06.2010 | ||
CH | 30.06.2010 | ||
LI | 30.06.2010 | ||
MC | 30.06.2010 | ||
HU | 21.07.2010 | ||
Former [2012/42] | AT | 20.01.2010 | |
BE | 20.01.2010 | ||
CY | 20.01.2010 | ||
CZ | 20.01.2010 | ||
DK | 20.01.2010 | ||
EE | 20.01.2010 | ||
FI | 20.01.2010 | ||
IT | 20.01.2010 | ||
LT | 20.01.2010 | ||
PL | 20.01.2010 | ||
RO | 20.01.2010 | ||
SE | 20.01.2010 | ||
SI | 20.01.2010 | ||
SK | 20.01.2010 | ||
BG | 20.04.2010 | ||
GR | 21.04.2010 | ||
ES | 01.05.2010 | ||
IS | 20.05.2010 | ||
PT | 20.05.2010 | ||
IE | 01.06.2010 | ||
CH | 30.06.2010 | ||
LI | 30.06.2010 | ||
MC | 30.06.2010 | ||
HU | 21.07.2010 | ||
Former [2011/20] | AT | 20.01.2010 | |
BE | 20.01.2010 | ||
CY | 20.01.2010 | ||
CZ | 20.01.2010 | ||
DK | 20.01.2010 | ||
EE | 20.01.2010 | ||
FI | 20.01.2010 | ||
IT | 20.01.2010 | ||
LT | 20.01.2010 | ||
PL | 20.01.2010 | ||
RO | 20.01.2010 | ||
SE | 20.01.2010 | ||
SI | 20.01.2010 | ||
SK | 20.01.2010 | ||
BG | 20.04.2010 | ||
GR | 21.04.2010 | ||
ES | 01.05.2010 | ||
IS | 20.05.2010 | ||
PT | 20.05.2010 | ||
IE | 01.06.2010 | ||
CH | 30.06.2010 | ||
LI | 30.06.2010 | ||
MC | 30.06.2010 | ||
Former [2011/19] | AT | 20.01.2010 | |
BE | 20.01.2010 | ||
CY | 20.01.2010 | ||
CZ | 20.01.2010 | ||
DK | 20.01.2010 | ||
EE | 20.01.2010 | ||
FI | 20.01.2010 | ||
IT | 20.01.2010 | ||
LT | 20.01.2010 | ||
PL | 20.01.2010 | ||
RO | 20.01.2010 | ||
SE | 20.01.2010 | ||
SI | 20.01.2010 | ||
SK | 20.01.2010 | ||
BG | 20.04.2010 | ||
GR | 21.04.2010 | ||
ES | 01.05.2010 | ||
IS | 20.05.2010 | ||
PT | 20.05.2010 | ||
IE | 01.06.2010 | ||
MC | 30.06.2010 | ||
Former [2011/16] | AT | 20.01.2010 | |
BE | 20.01.2010 | ||
CY | 20.01.2010 | ||
CZ | 20.01.2010 | ||
DK | 20.01.2010 | ||
EE | 20.01.2010 | ||
FI | 20.01.2010 | ||
IT | 20.01.2010 | ||
LT | 20.01.2010 | ||
PL | 20.01.2010 | ||
RO | 20.01.2010 | ||
SE | 20.01.2010 | ||
SI | 20.01.2010 | ||
SK | 20.01.2010 | ||
BG | 20.04.2010 | ||
GR | 21.04.2010 | ||
ES | 01.05.2010 | ||
IS | 20.05.2010 | ||
PT | 20.05.2010 | ||
MC | 30.06.2010 | ||
Former [2011/07] | AT | 20.01.2010 | |
BE | 20.01.2010 | ||
CY | 20.01.2010 | ||
CZ | 20.01.2010 | ||
DK | 20.01.2010 | ||
EE | 20.01.2010 | ||
FI | 20.01.2010 | ||
LT | 20.01.2010 | ||
PL | 20.01.2010 | ||
RO | 20.01.2010 | ||
SE | 20.01.2010 | ||
SI | 20.01.2010 | ||
SK | 20.01.2010 | ||
BG | 20.04.2010 | ||
GR | 21.04.2010 | ||
ES | 01.05.2010 | ||
IS | 20.05.2010 | ||
PT | 20.05.2010 | ||
MC | 30.06.2010 | ||
Former [2011/01] | AT | 20.01.2010 | |
BE | 20.01.2010 | ||
CY | 20.01.2010 | ||
CZ | 20.01.2010 | ||
EE | 20.01.2010 | ||
FI | 20.01.2010 | ||
LT | 20.01.2010 | ||
PL | 20.01.2010 | ||
RO | 20.01.2010 | ||
SE | 20.01.2010 | ||
SI | 20.01.2010 | ||
SK | 20.01.2010 | ||
BG | 20.04.2010 | ||
GR | 21.04.2010 | ||
ES | 01.05.2010 | ||
IS | 20.05.2010 | ||
PT | 20.05.2010 | ||
Former [2010/39] | AT | 20.01.2010 | |
FI | 20.01.2010 | ||
LT | 20.01.2010 | ||
PL | 20.01.2010 | ||
SI | 20.01.2010 | ||
ES | 01.05.2010 | ||
IS | 20.05.2010 | ||
PT | 20.05.2010 | ||
Former [2010/33] | AT | 20.01.2010 | |
ES | 01.05.2010 | ||
Former [2010/30] | AT | 20.01.2010 | Cited in | International search | [A]WO9709620 (AGEN BIOMEDICAL LTD [AU], et al) [A] 3 * example 3 *; | [X]EP0905518 (ACADEMISCH ZIEKENHUIS LEIDEN [NL], et al) [X] 1,2 * paragraphs [0009] - [0012] - [0022] , [0023]; claims 18,19 *; | [A]WO0125793 (ISIS INNOVATION [GB], et al) [A] 9 * table 5 *; | [XY]WO0175451 (AGRONOMIQUE INST NAT RECH [FR], et al) [X] 1-4,7,8,10-20 * page 6, line 3 * * page 7, line 24 * * page 8, line 28 * * page 9, line 15 * * page 10, line 7 * [Y] 5,6,9; | [Y]WO02083722 (ACADEMISCH ZIEKENHUIS LEIDEN [NL], et al) [Y] 5,6,9,23,32-34,44,45 * page 30, lines 4,5 *; | [XY]WO03066079 (ACADEMISCH ZIEKENHUIS LEIDEN [NL], et al) [X] 21,22,24-31,35-43 * claims 9,18-24 * [Y] 23,32-34,44,45; | [X] - CGN, Wageningen UR, (20040621), Database accession no. CGN 10684, URL: WWW.CGN.WAGENINGEN-UR.NL, XP002359265 [X] 47-51 * column A * | [X] - "Sappo", CGN, Wageningen-UR, (20040621), Database accession no. CGN 12393, URL: WWW.CGN.WAGENINGEN--UR.NL, XP002359266 [X] 47-51 * column A * | [X] - "Weissahr Rotkorn Binkel", CGN, Wageningen UR, (20040621), Database accession no. CGN 04210, URL: WWW.CGN.WAGENINGEN-UR.NL, XP002359267 [X] 47-51 * column A * | [PX] - SPAENIJ-DEKKING E H A ET AL, "A novel and sensitive method for the detection of T cell stimulatory epitopes of alpha/beta- and gamma-gliadin", GUT, (200409), vol. 53, no. 9, pages 1267 - 1273, XP008040242 [PX] 1-20 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1136/gut.2003.037952 | [T] - SPAENIJ-DEKKING L ET AL, "Natural variation in toxicity of wheat: potential for selection of nontoxic varieties for celiac disease patients.", GASTROENTEROLOGY., (200509), vol. 129, no. 3, pages 797 - 806, XP002359246 [T] 1-51 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1053/j.gastro.2005.06.017 | [A] - HILL A S ET AL, "MONOCLONAL ANTIBODY BASED TWO-SITE ENZYME IMMUNOASSAYS FOR WHEAT GLUTEN PROTEINS 1. KINETIC CHARACTERISTICS AND COMPARISON WITH OTHER ELISA FORMATS", FOOD AND AGRICULTURAL IMMUNOLOGY, (1989), vol. 1, no. 3, pages 147 - 160, XP008040240 [A] 3,5 * page 150, paragraph 3 * * page 158, line 32 - line 36 * | [A] - SKERRITT J H ET AL, "CELLULAR AND HUMORAL RESPONSES IN COELIAC DISEASE. 2. PROTEIN EXTRACTS FROM DIFFERENT CEREALS", CLINICA CHIMICA ACTA, (1991), vol. 204, no. 1/3, pages 109 - 122, XP000673555 [A] 3 * page 112, paragraph 3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0009-8981(91)90222-X | [A] - VADER W ET AL, "THE GLUTEN RESPONSE IN CHILDREN WITH CELIAC DISEASE IS DIRECTED TOWARD MULTIPLE GLIADIN AND GLUTENIN PEPTIDES", GASTROENTEROLOGY, (200006), vol. 122, no. 7, pages 1729 - 1737, XP009013823 [A] 9 * table 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1053/gast.2002.33606 | [A] - VADER LW ET AL, "Characterization of cereal toxicity for celiac disease patients based on protein homology in grains.", GASTROENTEROLOGY, (200310), vol. 125, no. 4, pages 1105 - 1113, XP002359247 [A] 42 * page 1112 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0016-5085(03)01204-6 | [A] - MOLBERG O ET AL, "Intestinal T-cell responses to high-molecular-weight glutenins in celiac disease.", GASTROENTEROLOGY, (200308), vol. 125, no. 2, pages 337 - 344, XP002359248 [A] 25,29 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0016-5085(03)00890-4 | [PA] - MOLBERG O ET AL, "Mapping of gluten T-cell epitopes in the bread wheat ancestors: implications for celiac disease.", GASTROENTEROLOGY, (200502), vol. 128, no. 2, pages 393 - 401, XP002359249 [PA] 21-51 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1053/j.gastro.2004.11.003 |