EP1758570 - COMPOSITION FOR TREATMENT OF A HYDROFLUORIC ACID BURN [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.07.2012 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.07.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 15.08.2012 [2012/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cameco Corporation 1 Eldorado Place Port Hope, Ontario L1A 3A1 / CA | [2007/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TAIROVA, Gioulchen 1000 Frei Street Cobourg, Ontario K9A 5L4 / CA | 02 /
OZBERK, Engin 397 Lakeshore Dr. Cobourg, Ontario K9A 1S2 / CA | 03 /
KERIN, Noel 3266 Yonge St. Toronto, Ontario M4N 3P6 / CA | [2007/10] | Representative(s) | Wright, Andrew John, et al Potter Clarkson LLP The Belgrave Centre Talbot Street Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2007/10] | Wright, Andrew John, et al Eric Potter Clarkson LLP Park View House 58 The Ropewalk Nottingham, NG1 5DD / GB | Application number, filing date | 05749234.0 | 01.06.2005 | [2007/10] | WO2005CA00832 | Priority number, date | US20040575397P | 01.06.2004 Original published format: US 575397 P | [2007/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005117852 | Date: | 15.12.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/50] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1758570 | Date: | 07.03.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.12.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CA | 15.12.2005 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.10.2008 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/19, A61P17/02, A61K31/06, A61K33/06 | [2008/45] | CPC: |
A61K31/06 (EP,US);
A61K31/19 (EP,US);
A61K33/06 (EP,US);
A61P17/02 (EP)
| C-Set: |
A61K31/19, A61K2300/00 (EP,US);
A61K33/06, A61K2300/00 (US,EP) |
Former IPC [2007/10] | A61K31/19, A61P17/02 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/10] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ZUSAMMENSETZUNG ZUR BEHANDLUNG EINER VERÄTZUNG MIT FLUORWASSERSTOFFSÄURE | [2007/10] | English: | COMPOSITION FOR TREATMENT OF A HYDROFLUORIC ACID BURN | [2007/10] | French: | COMPOSITION POUR LE TRAITEMENT D'UNE BRÛLURE À L'ACIDE FLUORHYDRIQUE | [2007/10] | Entry into regional phase | 29.12.2006 | National basic fee paid | 29.12.2006 | Search fee paid | 29.12.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.12.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.12.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.12.2006 | Examination requested [2007/10] | 07.08.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.12.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/33] | 22.01.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2012/33] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 07.08.2009 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2009 | 05   M06   Not yet paid | 30.06.2010 | 06   M06   Not yet paid | 30.06.2011 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A] - MARYADELE J. O'NEIL ET AL, The Merck Index: Calcium Acetate (1645); Calcium Carbonate (1658); Calcium Chloride (1660); Calcium Gluconate (1671), WHITEHOUSE STATION, NJ, MERCK INDEX.AN ENCYCLOPEDIA OF CHEMICALS, DRUGS, AND BIOLOGICALS, MERCK RESEARCH LABORATORIES, (2001), XP002496807 [A] * page 277 * * page 279 * * page 280 * | International search | [Y]CA1120402 (CARNES ALLEN R, et al); | [X] - BERTOLINI JC ET AL, "Hydrofluoric acid: a review of toxocity.", JOURNAL OF EMERGENCY MEDICINE., (1992), vol. 10, no. 2, pages 163 - 168, XP003010371 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0736-4679(92)90211-B | [X] - MISTRY ET AL, "Hydrofluoric acid burns.", AMERICAN FAMILY PHYSICIAN., (199204), vol. 45, pages 1748 - 1754, XP008079976 | [X] - KIRKPATRICK ET AL, "Hydrofluoric acid burns: a review.", BURNS., (1995), vol. 21, no. 7, pages 483 - 493, XP003010395 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0305-4179(95)93254-H | [X] - SEYB ET AL, "A study to determine the efficacy of treatments for hydrofluoric acid burns.", THE JOURNAL OF BURN CARE & REHABILITATION., (1995), vol. 16, pages 253 - 257, XP008079973 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1097/00004630-199505000-00006 | [X] - DUNN ET AL, "Topical treatments for hydrofluoric acid dermal burns.", JOEM., (199605), vol. 38, pages 507 - 514, XP008079972 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1097/00043764-199605000-00011 | [X] - MATSUNO K ET AL, "The treatment of hydrofluoric acid burns.", OCCUPATIONAL MEDICINE., (199608), vol. 46, pages 313 - 317, XP008079979 | [Y] - ALLEN LOYD V. JR., "Calcium Levulinate 15mg/mL injection.", INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF PHARMACEUTICAL COMPOUNDING., (199907), vol. 3, no. 4, page 298, XP008080045 |