EP1755513 - METHOD OF USING AN INTRAVAGINAL DEVICE WITH FLUID TRANSPORT PLATES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.03.2010 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.03.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 21.04.2010 [2010/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Johnson and Johnson Consumer Companies, Inc. 199 Grandview Road Skillman, NJ 08558-9418 / US | [2007/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHASE, David J 69 North Doughty Avenue Somerville, New Jersey 08876 / US | 02 /
DANYI, Erin 104 BRIDGEWAY COURT NICHOLASVILLE, Kentucky 40356 / US | 03 /
HOU, Mari 456 9TH STREET, UNIT 17 HOBOKEN, New Jersey 07030 / US | [2007/09] | Representative(s) | Kirsch, Susan Edith, et al Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2007/09] | Kirsch, Susan Edith, et al Carpmaels & Ransford 43-45 Bloomsbury Square LONDON WC1A 2RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 05749330.6 | 13.05.2005 | [2007/09] | WO2005US17110 | Priority number, date | US20040848208 | 14.05.2004 Original published format: US 848208 | [2007/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005112859 | Date: | 01.12.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1755513 | Date: | 28.02.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.12.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.12.2005 | Classification | IPC: | A61F13/20, A61F13/15, A61F13/22 | [2007/09] | CPC: |
A61F13/206 (EP,US);
A61F13/2065 (EP,US);
A61F13/2068 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/09] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR VERWENDUNG EINER INTRAVAGINALEN VORRICHTUNG MIT FLÜSSIGKEITSTRANSPORTPLATTEN | [2007/09] | English: | METHOD OF USING AN INTRAVAGINAL DEVICE WITH FLUID TRANSPORT PLATES | [2007/09] | French: | PROCEDE D"UTILISATION D"UN DISPOSITIF INTRAVAGINAL DOTE DE PLAQUES DE TRANSPORT DE FLUIDE | [2007/09] | Entry into regional phase | 01.12.2006 | National basic fee paid | 01.12.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.12.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.12.2006 | Examination requested [2007/09] | 20.04.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 31.10.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/16] | 04.12.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2010/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO9600552 (KIMBERLY CLARK GMBH [DE], et al) [A] 1-8 * page 5, lines 6-15; figures 1,4,5 * * page 6, lines 16-27 *; | [A]GB2292526 (SMITH & NEPHEW [GB]) [A] 1,4* page 9, lines 1-7; figure 1 *; | [A]WO0101906 (MCNEIL PPC INC [US]) [A] 1-3 * page 7, lines 7-10; figures 2,3 *; | [A]CA2293599 (NELSON PETER F [CA], et al) [A] 1 * paragraph [0005] *; | [A]US6436328 (DIPALMA JOSEPH [US]) [A] 1-8 * figures 1,2 *; | [A]US6479728 (DIPALMA JOSEPH [US]) [A] 1-8 * column 9, lines 49-59; figures 1,2 *; | [A]US2003093049 (JOHNSON BRUCE C [US], et al) [A] 1-3 * paragraphs [0020] , [0021]; figures 2,3 * |