EP1755514 - INTRAVAGINAL DEVICE WITH FLUID TRANSPORT PLATES AND METHODS OF MAKING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.10.2011 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.09.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 30.10.2013 [2013/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Johnson and Johnson Consumer Companies, Inc. 199 Grandview Road Skillman, NJ 08558-9418 / US | [2007/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BINNER, Curt 42 CARLISLE COURT SOMERSET, New Jersey 08873 / US | 02 /
CARASSO, Samuel C 12 JANET COURT MILLTOWN, New Jersey 08850 / US | 03 /
CHASE, David 69 North Doughty Avenue Somerville New Jersey 08876 / US | 04 /
DANYI, Erin 104 Bridgeway Court Nicholasville Kentucky 40356 / US | 05 /
GLASGOW, Tara 212 Riverwoods Drive New Hope Pennsylvania 18938 / US | 06 /
KIMBALL, David L 21 Greenwood Pl Flemington New Jersey 08822 / US | 07 /
KOZOROVITSKY, Julia 12 Golf Club Drive Longhorne Pennsylvania 19047 / US | 08 /
NG, Tony C 51 Jernee Drive East Brunswick New Jersey 08816 / US | [2007/09] | Representative(s) | Kirsch, Susan Edith, et al Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2007/09] | Kirsch, Susan Edith, et al Carpmaels & Ransford 43-45 Bloomsbury Square LONDON WC1A 2RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 05749337.1 | 13.05.2005 | [2007/09] | WO2005US17113 | Priority number, date | US20040572055P | 14.05.2004 Original published format: US 572055 P | US20040848257 | 14.05.2004 Original published format: US 848257 | US20040847951 | 14.05.2004 Original published format: US 847951 | [2007/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005112860 | Date: | 01.12.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1755514 | Date: | 28.02.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.12.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1755514 | Date: | 01.12.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.12.2005 | Classification | IPC: | A61F13/20, A61F13/15, D04H1/22 | [2007/09] | CPC: |
A61F13/2082 (EP);
A61F13/2065 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/09] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | INTRAVAGINALE VORRICHTUNG MIT FLÜSSIGKEITSTRANSPORTPLATTEN UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN | [2007/09] | English: | INTRAVAGINAL DEVICE WITH FLUID TRANSPORT PLATES AND METHODS OF MAKING | [2007/09] | French: | DISPOSITIF INTRAVAGINAL DOTE DE PLAQUES DE TRANSPORT DE FLUIDE ET PROCEDES DE FABRICATION | [2007/09] | Entry into regional phase | 01.12.2006 | National basic fee paid | 01.12.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.12.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.12.2006 | Examination requested [2007/09] | 13.06.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.01.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 01.04.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.03.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.04.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.07.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.10.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 19.10.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 02.09.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/45] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 01.04.2008 | Request for further processing filed | 01.04.2008 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 17.04.2008 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 01.12.2010 | CY | 01.12.2010 | DK | 01.12.2010 | EE | 01.12.2010 | FI | 01.12.2010 | LT | 01.12.2010 | NL | 01.12.2010 | RO | 01.12.2010 | SI | 01.12.2010 | SK | 01.12.2010 | TR | 01.12.2010 | BG | 01.03.2011 | GR | 02.03.2011 | IS | 01.04.2011 | PT | 01.04.2011 | IE | 13.05.2011 | LU | 13.05.2011 | MC | 31.05.2011 | [2013/44] |
Former [2013/25] | AT | 01.12.2010 | |
CY | 01.12.2010 | ||
DK | 01.12.2010 | ||
EE | 01.12.2010 | ||
FI | 01.12.2010 | ||
LT | 01.12.2010 | ||
NL | 01.12.2010 | ||
RO | 01.12.2010 | ||
SI | 01.12.2010 | ||
SK | 01.12.2010 | ||
BG | 01.03.2011 | ||
GR | 02.03.2011 | ||
IS | 01.04.2011 | ||
PT | 01.04.2011 | ||
IE | 13.05.2011 | ||
LU | 13.05.2011 | ||
MC | 31.05.2011 | ||
Former [2012/20] | AT | 01.12.2010 | |
CY | 01.12.2010 | ||
DK | 01.12.2010 | ||
EE | 01.12.2010 | ||
FI | 01.12.2010 | ||
LT | 01.12.2010 | ||
NL | 01.12.2010 | ||
RO | 01.12.2010 | ||
SI | 01.12.2010 | ||
SK | 01.12.2010 | ||
BG | 01.03.2011 | ||
GR | 02.03.2011 | ||
IS | 01.04.2011 | ||
PT | 01.04.2011 | ||
IE | 13.05.2011 | ||
MC | 31.05.2011 | ||
Former [2012/05] | AT | 01.12.2010 | |
CY | 01.12.2010 | ||
DK | 01.12.2010 | ||
EE | 01.12.2010 | ||
FI | 01.12.2010 | ||
LT | 01.12.2010 | ||
NL | 01.12.2010 | ||
RO | 01.12.2010 | ||
SI | 01.12.2010 | ||
SK | 01.12.2010 | ||
BG | 01.03.2011 | ||
GR | 02.03.2011 | ||
IS | 01.04.2011 | ||
PT | 01.04.2011 | ||
MC | 31.05.2011 | ||
Former [2011/47] | AT | 01.12.2010 | |
CY | 01.12.2010 | ||
DK | 01.12.2010 | ||
EE | 01.12.2010 | ||
FI | 01.12.2010 | ||
LT | 01.12.2010 | ||
NL | 01.12.2010 | ||
RO | 01.12.2010 | ||
SI | 01.12.2010 | ||
SK | 01.12.2010 | ||
BG | 01.03.2011 | ||
GR | 02.03.2011 | ||
IS | 01.04.2011 | ||
PT | 01.04.2011 | ||
Former [2011/37] | AT | 01.12.2010 | |
CY | 01.12.2010 | ||
EE | 01.12.2010 | ||
FI | 01.12.2010 | ||
LT | 01.12.2010 | ||
NL | 01.12.2010 | ||
RO | 01.12.2010 | ||
SI | 01.12.2010 | ||
SK | 01.12.2010 | ||
BG | 01.03.2011 | ||
GR | 02.03.2011 | ||
IS | 01.04.2011 | ||
PT | 01.04.2011 | ||
Former [2011/29] | AT | 01.12.2010 | |
CY | 01.12.2010 | ||
FI | 01.12.2010 | ||
LT | 01.12.2010 | ||
NL | 01.12.2010 | ||
SI | 01.12.2010 | ||
BG | 01.03.2011 | ||
GR | 02.03.2011 | ||
Former [2011/19] | LT | 01.12.2010 | Cited in | International search | [A]WO9709017 (MCNEIL PPC INC [US]) [A] 1-21* figure 3 *; | [X]WO9900096 (MCNEIL PPC INC [US]) [X] 2 * figure 1a *; | [X]WO0101906 (MCNEIL PPC INC [US]) [X] 2 * figures 2,3 *; | [X]US6177608 (WEINSTRAUCH FRITZ [DE]) [X] 1,2,11 * figures 1,5,9 * |