EP1747023 - METHODS AND COMPOSITIONS FOR REDUCING HCV VIRAL GENOME AMOUNTS IN A TARGET CELL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2007/05] | METHODS AND COMPOSITIONS FOR REDUCING VIRAL GENOME AMOUNTS IN A TARGET CELL | ||
[2010/39] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 05.02.2016 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.02.2016 | Patent maintained (B2 publication) | published on 09.03.2016 [2016/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Board of Trustees of the Leland Stanford Junior University 1705 El Camino Real Palo Alto, CA 94306-1106 / US | [2016/10] |
Former [2011/01] | For all designated states The Board of Trustees of the Leland Stanford Junior University 1705 El Camino Real Palo Alto, CA 94306-1106 / US | ||
Former [2007/05] | For all designated states THE BOARD OF TRUSTEES OF THE LELAND STANFORD JUNIOR UNIVERSITY 1705 El Camino Real Palo Alto, CA 94306-1106 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SARNOW, Peter 830 Hamilton Avenue Palo Alto, CA 94301 / US | 02 /
JOPLING, Catherine, L. 22 Langton Street San Francisco, CA 94103 / US | 03 /
LANCASTER, Alissa, M. 5923 SE 39th Avenue Portland, OR 97202-7509 / US | [2007/08] |
Former [2007/05] | 01 /
SARNOW, Peter 830 Hamilton Avenue Palo Alto, CA 94301 / US | ||
02 /
JOPLING, Catherine, L. 22 Langton Street San Francisco, CA 94103 / US | |||
03 /
LANCASTER, Alissa, M. 21 Elwood Street Redwood City, CA 94062 / US | Representative(s) | Chapman, Desmond Mark Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [2016/10] |
Former [2009/33] | Chapman, Desmond Mark Carpmaels & Ransford 43-45 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | ||
Former [2007/05] | Heaton, Joanne Marie Stevens, Hewlett & Perkins 1 St. Augustine's Place Bristol BS1 4UD / GB | Application number, filing date | 05749437.9 | 03.05.2005 | [2007/05] | WO2005US15264 | Priority number, date | US20040568358P | 04.05.2004 Original published format: US 568358 P | [2007/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2005107816 | Date: | 17.11.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/46] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1747023 | Date: | 31.01.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.11.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1747023 | Date: | 05.01.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/01] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP1747023 | Date: | 09.03.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 23.02.2006 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.01.2010 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/113, A61K31/712, // A61P31/14 | [2010/39] | CPC: |
C12N15/1131 (EP,US);
A61K31/7088 (US);
A61K45/06 (US);
A61K9/0019 (US);
A61P1/16 (EP);
A61P31/00 (EP);
A61P31/12 (EP);
A61P31/14 (EP);
A61P31/20 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
C12N15/111 (EP,US);
C12N2310/113 (EP,US);
C12N2310/14 (EP,US);
C12N2310/141 (US);
C12N2310/321 (EP,US);
C12N2320/31 (US);
C12N2320/50 (EP,US);
C12N2330/10 (EP,US);
C12N2770/24211 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C12N2310/321, C12N2310/3521 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2007/05] | A61K48/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2016/10] |
Former [2007/05] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN ZUR VERRINGERUNG VON HCV VIRUSGENOMMENGEN IN EINER ZIELZELLE | [2010/39] | English: | METHODS AND COMPOSITIONS FOR REDUCING HCV VIRAL GENOME AMOUNTS IN A TARGET CELL | [2010/39] | French: | METHODES ET COMPOSITIONS PERMETTANT DE LIMITER LES QUANTITES DE GENOME VIRAL DE HCV DANS UNE CELLULE CIBLE | [2010/39] |
Former [2007/05] | VERFAHREN UND ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN ZUR VERRINGERUNG VON VIRUSGENOMMENGEN IN EINER ZIELZELLE | ||
Former [2007/05] | METHODS AND COMPOSITIONS FOR REDUCING VIRAL GENOME AMOUNTS IN A TARGET CELL | ||
Former [2007/05] | METHODES ET COMPOSITIONS PERMETTANT DE LIMITER LES QUANTITES DE GENOME VIRAL DANS UNE CELLULE CIBLE | Entry into regional phase | 25.10.2006 | National basic fee paid | 25.10.2006 | Search fee paid | 25.10.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.10.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.10.2006 | Examination requested [2007/05] | 19.01.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.03.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.08.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.09.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.10.2010 | Observations by third parties | 23.11.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 23.11.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP10196635.6 / EP2338996 | EP12163229.3 Application deemed to be withdrawn : 05.05.2012 | EP12163232.7 / EP2500431 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
04.10.2011
04.11.2011
ADMISSIBLE Roche Innovation Center Copenhagen A/S Fremtidsvej 3 2970 Hørsholm / DK Opponent's representative D Young & Co LLP Briton House Briton Street Southampton SO14 3EB / GB | [2015/34] |
Former [2014/52] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
04.10.2011
04.11.2011
ADMISSIBLE Roche Innovation Center Copenhagen A/S Fremtidsvej 3 2970 Hørsholm / DK Opponent's representative Harding, Charles Thomas D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | ||
Former [2011/45] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
04.10.2011
Santaris Pharma A/S Kogle Allé 6 2970 Hørsholm / DK Opponent's representative Harding, Charles Thomas D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | 11.11.2011 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 23.07.2012 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 10.12.2014 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 17.12.2014 | 17.12.2014 | Date of oral proceedings | 23.12.2014 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 30.04.2015 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 13.10.2015 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 11.01.2016 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Appeal following opposition | 02.03.2015 | Appeal received No. T0438/15 | 30.04.2015 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the proprietor withdrawn | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.05.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO02081494 (RIBOZYME PHARM INC [US], et al) [A] 1-19 * the whole document *; | [A]WO03029459 (MAX PLANCK GES ZUR [DE], et al) [A] 1-19 * page 11; sequence 43 * * page 19, line 20 - line 21 * * page 32, line 9 - line 11 * * figure 5 *; | [A] - MCCAFFREY, A. ET AL., "RNA interference in adult mice", NATURE, (20020704), vol. 418, no. 6893, ISSN 0028-0836, pages 38 - 39, XP002234152 [A] 1-19 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/418038a | [AD] - MEISTER GUNTER ET AL, "Sequence-specific inhibition of microRNA- and siRNA-induced RNA silencing", RNA, (20040301), vol. 10, no. 3, ISSN 1355-8382, pages 544 - 550, XP002376645 [AD] 1-19 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1261/rna.5235104 | [T] - JOPLING CATHERINE L ET AL, "Modulation of hepatitis C virus RNA abundance by a liver-specific microRNA", SCIENCE, (20050901), vol. 309, no. 5740, ISSN 0036-8075, pages 1577 - 1581, XP009109384 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.1113329 | International search | [AE]US2004175732 (RANA TARIQ M [US]); | [AE]US2005059005 (TUSCHL THOMAS [US], et al); | [AE]US2005227256 (HUTVAGNER GYORGY [US], et al); | [X] - KASSCHAU K.D. ET AL, "P1-HC-Pro, a viral suppressor and RNA silencing, interferes with arabidopsis development and mirna function", DEVELOPMENT CELL, (200302), vol. 4, no. 2, pages 206 - 217, XP009037925 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S1534-5807(03)00025-X | [AP] - CULLEN B.R., "Derivation and function of small interfering RNAs and microRNAs", VIRUS RESEARCH, (20040601), vol. 102, no. 1, pages 3 - 9, XP002993013 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.virusres.2004.01.009 | [A] - BOUTLA A. ET AL, "Developmental defects by antisense-mediated inactivation of micr-RNAs 2 and 13 in Drosophila and the identification of putative target genes", NUCLEIC ACIDS RESEARCH, (200309), vol. 31, no. 17, pages 4973 - 4980, XP002993014 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/nar/gkg707 | by applicant | WO02081494 | - MCCAFFREY, A. ET AL., NATURE, vol. 418, no. 6893, pages 38 - 39 | - CHANG ET AL., J. VIROL., (2001), vol. 75, pages 3469 - 3473 | - LIU ET AL., GENE THER., (1999), vol. 6, pages 1258 - 1266 | - WOLFF ET AL., SCIENCE, (1990), vol. 247, pages 1465 - 1468 | - ZHANG ET AL., HUM. GENE THER., (1999), vol. 10, pages 1735 - 1737 | - ZHANG ET AL., GENE THER., (1999), vol. 7, pages 1344 - 1349 | other | WO9530746 | EP0699751 | US6423489 | WO02081494 | WO03029459 | WO03070750 | WO2005013905 | WO2005013901 | WO2007027894 | US7683036 | - JOPLING C.L. ET AL, "Liver-Specific microRNA122 regulates hepatitis C Viral RNA Abundance", TRANSLATIONAL CONTROL, (20040907), page 124, XP003028324 | - JOPLING CATHERINE L., "Position-dependent function for a tandem microRNA miR-122-binding site located in the hepatitis C virus RNA genome", CELL HOST & MICROBE, (20080717), vol. 4, no. 1, pages 77 - 85, XP008100800 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/J.CHEM.2008.05.013 | - LAGOS-QUINTANA M; ET AL, "Identification of tissue-specific microRNAs from mouse", CURRENT BIOLOGY, (20020430), vol. 12, no. 9, pages 735 - 739, XP002284274 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0960-9822(02)00809-6 | - KHAN A.A. ET AL, "Transfection of small RNA's globally perturbs gene regulation by endogenous microRNAs", NATURE BIOTECHNOLOGY, (20090524), pages 1 - 9, XP003028325 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/NBT.1543 | - SCOTT DAVIS ET AL, "Potent inhibition of microRNA in vivo without degradation", NUCLEIC ACIDS RESEARCH, (20081116), vol. 37, no. 1, pages 70 - 77, XP003028326 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/NAR/GKN904 | - ESAU C.C. ET AL, "Inhibition of microRNA with antisense oligonucleotides", METHODS : A COMPANION TO METHODS IN ENZYMOLOGY, (20071223), vol. 44, no. 1, pages 55 - 60, XP022398580 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.ymeth.2007.11.001 | - "Guidance for industry Antiviral product development - conducting and submitting virology studies to the agency", FOOD AND DRUG ADMINISTRATION, (200606), pages 1 - 14, XP003028327 | - S.T. CROOKE, "Basic Principle of Antisense Technology", S.T. CROOKE, S.T. CROOKE, Antisense Drug Technology, MARCEL DEKKER INC, pages 1 - 18, ISBN 0-8247-0566-1, XP003028328 | - BIRKE BARTOSCH ET AL, "Cell Entry of Hepatitis C Virus Requires a Set of Co-receptors That Include the CD81 Tetraspanin and the SR-B1 Scavenger Receptor", JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, (20031024), vol. 278, no. 43, pages 41624 - 41630, XP007917959 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1074/jbc.M305289200 | - N. PAVIO ET AL, "The hepatitis C virus persistence: how to evade the immune system?", J. BIOSCI., (200304), vol. 28, no. 3, pages 287 - 304, XP003028329 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/BF02970148 | - BALKRISHEN BHAT ET AL, "2?-O-Methoxyethyl/2?-Fluoro Modified Oligonucleotides Result in More Potent Inhibition of micro RNA-122 in Vivo: A Target implicatedin HCV Replication", NUCLEIC ACIDS SYMPOSIUM SERIES, (20080908), vol. 52, no. 1, page 69, XP003028330 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/NASS/NRN035 | - KRUETZFELDT JAN; ET AL, "Silencing of microRNAs in vivo with 'antagomirs'", NATURE, (20051201), vol. 438, no. 7068, pages 685 - 689, XP002376647 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nature04303 | - IKEDA M. ET AL, "Selectable subgenomic and genome-length dicistronic RNAs derived from an infectious molecular clone of the HCV-N strain of Hepatitis C virus replicates efficiently in cultured Huh7 cells", JOURNAL OF VIROLOGY, (20020301), vol. 76, no. 6, pages 2997 - 3006, XP002967510 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1128/JVI.76.6.2997-3006.2002 | - YI MINKYUNG ET AL, "Adaptive mutations producing efficient replication of genotype 1a hepatitis C virus RNA in normal Huh7 cells", JOURNAL OF VIROLOGY, (20040801), vol. 78, no. 15, pages 7904 - 7915, XP002426794 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1128/JVI.78.15.7904-7915.2004 | - ZHONG JIN; ET AL, "Robust hepatitis C virus infection in vitro", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES OF USA, (20050601), vol. 102, no. 26, pages 9294 - 9299, XP002418002 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.0503596102 | - LINDENBACH B D; ET AL, "Complete replication of hepatitis C virus in cell culture", SCIENCE, (20050722), vol. 309, no. 5734, pages 623 - 626, XP002993377 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.1114016 | - KRÜTZFELDT J; ET AL, "Specificity, duplex degradation and subcellular localization of antagomirs", NUCLEIC ACIDS RESEARCH, (20070416), vol. 35, no. 9, pages 2885 - 2892, XP002532650 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/NAR/GKM024 | - LANFORD ROBERT E; ET AL, "Therapeutic silencing of microRNA-122 in primates with chronic hepatitis C virusinfection", SCIENCE, (20100108), vol. 327, no. 5962, pages 198 - 201, XP002595740 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.1178178 | - S. DAVIS ET AL, "Improved targeting of miRNA with antisense oligonucleotides", NUCLEIC ACIDS RESEARCH, (2006), vol. 34, no. 8, pages 2294 - 2304, XP003028331 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/NAR/GKL183 | - CHANG JINHONG; ET AL, "miR-122, a mammalian liver-specific microRNA, is processed from hcr mRNA and maydownregulate the high affinity cationic amino acid transporter CAT-1", RNA BIOLOGY, (20040701), vol. 1, no. 2, pages 106 - 113, XP002544785 | - BARTENSCHLAGER R; LOHMANN V, "REPLICATION OF HEPATITIS C VIRUS", JOURNAL OF GENERAL VIROLOGY, (20000701), vol. 81, no. 07, pages 1631 - 1648, XP000982017 | - ELMÉN J; ET AL, "LNA-mediated microRNA silencing in non-human primates", NATURE, (20080417), vol. 452, pages 896 - 900, XP002533567 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/NATURE06783 | - CZECH M.P., "MicroRNAs as therapeutic targets", NEW ENGLAND JOURNAL OF MEDICINE, (20060316), vol. 354, no. 11, pages 1194 - 195, XP002532649 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1056/NEJMcibr060065 | Opposition | WO9530746 | EP0699751 | US6423489 |