EP1759552 - SCANNING NEIGHBORING BASE STATIONS IN WIRELESS ACCESS SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.05.2015 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.10.2017 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, TR | published on 15.11.2017 [2017/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG Electronics Inc. 20, Yoido-dong Youngdungpo-gu Seoul 150-721 / KR | [2014/11] |
Former [2007/10] | For all designated states LG Electronics, Inc. 20 Yoido-dong Youngdungpo-gu Seoul 150-721 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KIM, Yong Ho 1503-1304, Hanireum-Hyun Dai APT. Sang-dong, Wonmi-gu Bucheon-si, Gyeonggi-do 420-816 / KR | 02 /
CHO, Ki Hyoung @c/o LG Institute Hogye l(il)-dong, Dongan-gu Anyang-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR | [2014/27] |
Former [2007/16] | 01 /
KIM, Yong Ho 1503-1304, Hanireum-Hyun Dai APT. Sang-dong, Wonmi-gu Bucheon-si, Gyeonggi-do 420-816 / KR | ||
02 /
CHO, Ki Hyoung c/o LG Institute Hogye l(il)-dong, Dongan-gu Anyang-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR | |||
Former [2007/10] | 01 /
KIM, Yong Ho 1503-1304, Hanireum-Hyun Dai APT. Sang-dong, Wonmi-gu Bucheon-si, Gyeonggi-do 420-816 / KR | ||
02 /
CHO, Ki Hyoung 115-907, Saemmaeul Hanyang Apt. Galsan-dong, Dongan-gu Anyang-si, Gyeonggi-do 431-705 / KR | Representative(s) | Urner, Peter Ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Mauerkircherstrasse 45 81679 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/27] | Urner, Peter Ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner Mauerkircherstrasse 45 81679 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/10] | Urner, Peter TER MEER STEINMEISTER & PARTNER GbR Patentanwälte Mauerkircherstrasse 45 81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05749466.8 | 07.06.2005 | [2007/10] | WO2005KR01700 | Priority number, date | KR20040041541 | 07.06.2004 Original published format: KR 2004041541 | KR20040046708 | 22.06.2004 Original published format: KR 2004046708 | [2007/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2005120179 | Date: | 22.12.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/51] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1759552 | Date: | 07.03.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.12.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1759552 | Date: | 02.07.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AT | 11.01.2007 | Classification | IPC: | H04W36/30 | [2014/07] | CPC: |
H04W36/302 (EP,KR,US);
H04W36/0083 (EP,KR)
|
Former IPC [2007/11] | H04Q7/38, H04L12/28, H04B17/00 | ||
Former IPC [2007/10] | H04Q7/38 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/10] | Title | German: | SCANNEN VON BENACHBARTEN BASISSTATIONEN IN EINEM DRAHTLOSEN ZUGANGSSYSTEM | [2007/10] | English: | SCANNING NEIGHBORING BASE STATIONS IN WIRELESS ACCESS SYSTEM | [2007/10] | French: | BALAYAGE DE STATIONS DE BASE AVOISINANTES DANS UN SYSTEME D'ACCES SANS FIL | [2007/10] | Entry into regional phase | 15.12.2006 | National basic fee paid | 15.12.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.12.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.12.2006 | Examination requested [2007/10] | 21.10.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.04.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.01.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.05.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 13.05.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 13.05.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP12158482.5 / EP2464171 | EP12158487.4 / EP2464172 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 21.10.2011 | Opposition(s) | 07.04.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 20.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 31.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 07.06.2005 | AT | 02.07.2014 | BE | 02.07.2014 | CY | 02.07.2014 | CZ | 02.07.2014 | DK | 02.07.2014 | EE | 02.07.2014 | ES | 02.07.2014 | IT | 02.07.2014 | LT | 02.07.2014 | MC | 02.07.2014 | PL | 02.07.2014 | RO | 02.07.2014 | SI | 02.07.2014 | SK | 02.07.2014 | TR | 02.07.2014 | BG | 02.10.2014 | GR | 03.10.2014 | IS | 02.11.2014 | PT | 03.11.2014 | [2017/40] |
Former [2016/32] | AT | 02.07.2014 | |
BE | 02.07.2014 | ||
CY | 02.07.2014 | ||
CZ | 02.07.2014 | ||
DK | 02.07.2014 | ||
EE | 02.07.2014 | ||
ES | 02.07.2014 | ||
IT | 02.07.2014 | ||
LT | 02.07.2014 | ||
MC | 02.07.2014 | ||
PL | 02.07.2014 | ||
RO | 02.07.2014 | ||
SI | 02.07.2014 | ||
SK | 02.07.2014 | ||
BG | 02.10.2014 | ||
GR | 03.10.2014 | ||
IS | 02.11.2014 | ||
PT | 03.11.2014 | ||
Former [2016/09] | AT | 02.07.2014 | |
CY | 02.07.2014 | ||
CZ | 02.07.2014 | ||
DK | 02.07.2014 | ||
EE | 02.07.2014 | ||
ES | 02.07.2014 | ||
IT | 02.07.2014 | ||
LT | 02.07.2014 | ||
MC | 02.07.2014 | ||
PL | 02.07.2014 | ||
RO | 02.07.2014 | ||
SI | 02.07.2014 | ||
SK | 02.07.2014 | ||
BG | 02.10.2014 | ||
GR | 03.10.2014 | ||
IS | 02.11.2014 | ||
PT | 03.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/50] | AT | 02.07.2014 | |
CY | 02.07.2014 | ||
CZ | 02.07.2014 | ||
DK | 02.07.2014 | ||
EE | 02.07.2014 | ||
ES | 02.07.2014 | ||
IT | 02.07.2014 | ||
LT | 02.07.2014 | ||
PL | 02.07.2014 | ||
RO | 02.07.2014 | ||
SI | 02.07.2014 | ||
SK | 02.07.2014 | ||
BG | 02.10.2014 | ||
GR | 03.10.2014 | ||
IS | 02.11.2014 | ||
PT | 03.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/25] | AT | 02.07.2014 | |
CY | 02.07.2014 | ||
CZ | 02.07.2014 | ||
DK | 02.07.2014 | ||
EE | 02.07.2014 | ||
ES | 02.07.2014 | ||
IT | 02.07.2014 | ||
LT | 02.07.2014 | ||
PL | 02.07.2014 | ||
RO | 02.07.2014 | ||
SK | 02.07.2014 | ||
BG | 02.10.2014 | ||
GR | 03.10.2014 | ||
IS | 02.11.2014 | ||
PT | 03.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/23] | CY | 02.07.2014 | |
CZ | 02.07.2014 | ||
DK | 02.07.2014 | ||
EE | 02.07.2014 | ||
ES | 02.07.2014 | ||
IT | 02.07.2014 | ||
LT | 02.07.2014 | ||
PL | 02.07.2014 | ||
RO | 02.07.2014 | ||
SK | 02.07.2014 | ||
BG | 02.10.2014 | ||
GR | 03.10.2014 | ||
IS | 02.11.2014 | ||
PT | 03.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/22] | CY | 02.07.2014 | |
CZ | 02.07.2014 | ||
DK | 02.07.2014 | ||
ES | 02.07.2014 | ||
IT | 02.07.2014 | ||
LT | 02.07.2014 | ||
PL | 02.07.2014 | ||
RO | 02.07.2014 | ||
BG | 02.10.2014 | ||
GR | 03.10.2014 | ||
IS | 02.11.2014 | ||
PT | 03.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/12] | CY | 02.07.2014 | |
CZ | 02.07.2014 | ||
ES | 02.07.2014 | ||
LT | 02.07.2014 | ||
PL | 02.07.2014 | ||
BG | 02.10.2014 | ||
GR | 03.10.2014 | ||
IS | 02.11.2014 | ||
PT | 03.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/11] | CY | 02.07.2014 | |
CZ | 02.07.2014 | ||
ES | 02.07.2014 | ||
LT | 02.07.2014 | ||
PL | 02.07.2014 | ||
BG | 02.10.2014 | ||
GR | 03.10.2014 | ||
PT | 03.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/10] | CZ | 02.07.2014 | |
ES | 02.07.2014 | ||
LT | 02.07.2014 | ||
BG | 02.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/08] | LT | 02.07.2014 | Cited in | International search | [A]WO9512932 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE], et al); | [A]WO9943178 (NOKIA TELECOMMUNICATIONS OY [FI], et al); |