EP1788764 - THE PROCESS SYSTEM FOR THE PACKET DOMAIN SERVICE SIGNAL AND THE METHOD USING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.06.2013 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [N/P] |
Former [2012/33] | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District, Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | ||
Former [2007/21] | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building, Bantian, Longgang District, Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SHI, Youzhu Huawei Adm. Bldg Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | 02 /
ZHU, Dongming Huawei Adm. Bldg Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guang Dong 518129 / CN | [2012/33] |
Former [2007/21] | 01 /
SHI, Youzhu Huawei Adm. Bldg, Bantian, Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | ||
02 /
ZHU, Dongming Huawei Adm. Bldg, Bantian, Longgang District Shenzhen, Guang Dong 518129 / CN | Representative(s) | Thun, Clemens Mitscherlich PartmbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Karlstraße 7 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/33] | Thun, Clemens Mitscherlich & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Sonnenstrasse 33 80331 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/21] | Thun, Clemens Mitscherlich & Partner Sonnenstrasse 33 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05749626.7 | 26.05.2005 | [2007/21] | WO2005CN00734 | Priority number, date | CN20041079901 | 07.09.2004 Original published format: CN200410079901 | [2007/21] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006026901 | Date: | 16.03.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1788764 | Date: | 23.05.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.03.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1788764 | Date: | 15.08.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 16.03.2006 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.09.2010 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/66 | [2007/21] | CPC: |
H04L12/66 (EP,US);
H04L65/1043 (EP,US);
H04M7/123 (EP,US);
H04L65/1016 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/21] | Title | German: | PROZESSSYSTEM FÜR DAS PAKETBEREICHS-DIENSTSIGNAL UND VERFAHREN ZU SEINER VERWENDUNG | [2007/21] | English: | THE PROCESS SYSTEM FOR THE PACKET DOMAIN SERVICE SIGNAL AND THE METHOD USING THE SAME | [2007/21] | French: | SYSTEME DE TRAITEMENT DE SIGNAL DE SERVICE DE DOMAINE DE PAQUET ET PROCEDE UTILISANT CE SYSTEME | [2007/21] | Entry into regional phase | 06.03.2007 | Translation filed | 06.03.2007 | National basic fee paid | 06.03.2007 | Search fee paid | 06.03.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.03.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.03.2007 | Examination requested [2007/21] | 18.05.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.12.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.04.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.04.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.07.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 06.07.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 15.12.2010 | Opposition(s) | 16.05.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 26.05.2005 | AT | 15.08.2012 | BE | 15.08.2012 | CY | 15.08.2012 | CZ | 15.08.2012 | DK | 15.08.2012 | EE | 15.08.2012 | FI | 15.08.2012 | IT | 15.08.2012 | LT | 15.08.2012 | MC | 15.08.2012 | NL | 15.08.2012 | PL | 15.08.2012 | RO | 15.08.2012 | SE | 15.08.2012 | SI | 15.08.2012 | SK | 15.08.2012 | TR | 15.08.2012 | BG | 15.11.2012 | GR | 16.11.2012 | ES | 26.11.2012 | IS | 15.12.2012 | PT | 17.12.2012 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/32] | AT | 15.08.2012 | |
BE | 15.08.2012 | ||
CY | 15.08.2012 | ||
CZ | 15.08.2012 | ||
DK | 15.08.2012 | ||
EE | 15.08.2012 | ||
FI | 15.08.2012 | ||
IT | 15.08.2012 | ||
LT | 15.08.2012 | ||
MC | 15.08.2012 | ||
NL | 15.08.2012 | ||
PL | 15.08.2012 | ||
RO | 15.08.2012 | ||
SE | 15.08.2012 | ||
SI | 15.08.2012 | ||
SK | 15.08.2012 | ||
TR | 15.08.2012 | ||
BG | 15.11.2012 | ||
GR | 16.11.2012 | ||
ES | 26.11.2012 | ||
IS | 15.12.2012 | ||
PT | 17.12.2012 | ||
Former [2014/03] | AT | 15.08.2012 | |
BE | 15.08.2012 | ||
CY | 15.08.2012 | ||
CZ | 15.08.2012 | ||
DK | 15.08.2012 | ||
EE | 15.08.2012 | ||
FI | 15.08.2012 | ||
IT | 15.08.2012 | ||
LT | 15.08.2012 | ||
MC | 15.08.2012 | ||
NL | 15.08.2012 | ||
PL | 15.08.2012 | ||
RO | 15.08.2012 | ||
SE | 15.08.2012 | ||
SI | 15.08.2012 | ||
SK | 15.08.2012 | ||
BG | 15.11.2012 | ||
GR | 16.11.2012 | ||
ES | 26.11.2012 | ||
IS | 15.12.2012 | ||
PT | 17.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/34] | AT | 15.08.2012 | |
BE | 15.08.2012 | ||
CY | 15.08.2012 | ||
CZ | 15.08.2012 | ||
DK | 15.08.2012 | ||
EE | 15.08.2012 | ||
FI | 15.08.2012 | ||
IT | 15.08.2012 | ||
LT | 15.08.2012 | ||
NL | 15.08.2012 | ||
PL | 15.08.2012 | ||
RO | 15.08.2012 | ||
SE | 15.08.2012 | ||
SI | 15.08.2012 | ||
SK | 15.08.2012 | ||
BG | 15.11.2012 | ||
GR | 16.11.2012 | ||
ES | 26.11.2012 | ||
IS | 15.12.2012 | ||
PT | 17.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/23] | AT | 15.08.2012 | |
BE | 15.08.2012 | ||
CY | 15.08.2012 | ||
CZ | 15.08.2012 | ||
DK | 15.08.2012 | ||
EE | 15.08.2012 | ||
FI | 15.08.2012 | ||
IT | 15.08.2012 | ||
LT | 15.08.2012 | ||
NL | 15.08.2012 | ||
PL | 15.08.2012 | ||
RO | 15.08.2012 | ||
SE | 15.08.2012 | ||
SI | 15.08.2012 | ||
SK | 15.08.2012 | ||
GR | 16.11.2012 | ||
ES | 26.11.2012 | ||
IS | 15.12.2012 | ||
PT | 17.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | AT | 15.08.2012 | |
BE | 15.08.2012 | ||
CY | 15.08.2012 | ||
CZ | 15.08.2012 | ||
DK | 15.08.2012 | ||
EE | 15.08.2012 | ||
FI | 15.08.2012 | ||
LT | 15.08.2012 | ||
NL | 15.08.2012 | ||
PL | 15.08.2012 | ||
SE | 15.08.2012 | ||
SI | 15.08.2012 | ||
GR | 16.11.2012 | ||
ES | 26.11.2012 | ||
IS | 15.12.2012 | ||
PT | 17.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/21] | AT | 15.08.2012 | |
BE | 15.08.2012 | ||
CY | 15.08.2012 | ||
DK | 15.08.2012 | ||
FI | 15.08.2012 | ||
LT | 15.08.2012 | ||
NL | 15.08.2012 | ||
PL | 15.08.2012 | ||
SE | 15.08.2012 | ||
SI | 15.08.2012 | ||
GR | 16.11.2012 | ||
IS | 15.12.2012 | ||
PT | 17.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/15] | AT | 15.08.2012 | |
BE | 15.08.2012 | ||
CY | 15.08.2012 | ||
FI | 15.08.2012 | ||
LT | 15.08.2012 | ||
NL | 15.08.2012 | ||
PL | 15.08.2012 | ||
SE | 15.08.2012 | ||
SI | 15.08.2012 | ||
GR | 16.11.2012 | ||
IS | 15.12.2012 | ||
PT | 17.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/13] | AT | 15.08.2012 | |
BE | 15.08.2012 | ||
CY | 15.08.2012 | ||
FI | 15.08.2012 | ||
LT | 15.08.2012 | ||
PL | 15.08.2012 | ||
SE | 15.08.2012 | ||
SI | 15.08.2012 | ||
GR | 16.11.2012 | ||
IS | 15.12.2012 | ||
PT | 17.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/12] | AT | 15.08.2012 | |
BE | 15.08.2012 | ||
CY | 15.08.2012 | ||
FI | 15.08.2012 | ||
LT | 15.08.2012 | ||
PL | 15.08.2012 | ||
SE | 15.08.2012 | ||
SI | 15.08.2012 | ||
GR | 16.11.2012 | ||
IS | 15.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/11] | AT | 15.08.2012 | |
CY | 15.08.2012 | ||
FI | 15.08.2012 | ||
LT | 15.08.2012 | ||
PL | 15.08.2012 | ||
SI | 15.08.2012 | ||
GR | 16.11.2012 | ||
IS | 15.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/10] | AT | 15.08.2012 | |
CY | 15.08.2012 | ||
FI | 15.08.2012 | ||
LT | 15.08.2012 | ||
IS | 15.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/09] | AT | 15.08.2012 | |
FI | 15.08.2012 | ||
LT | 15.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | AT | 15.08.2012 | |
LT | 15.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | AT | 15.08.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [X] - "3rd Generation Partnership Project;Technical Specification Group Core Network;Interworking between the IM CN subsystem and CS networks(Release 6)", 3GPP DRAFT; 29163-151, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20030407), vol. CN WG3, no. Sophia Antipolis, France; 20030401, XP050407439 [X] 1-6 * Chapters 4 to 8; pages 11-45 * | [A] - 3GPP DRAFT; S2-042797, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20040823), vol. SA WG2, no. Montreal; 20040823, XP050249959 [A] 1-19 * Section 7: "Possible Reuse of IMS to support PSTN/ISDN service emulation"; pages 13-14 * | International search | [Y]CN1469605 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]); | [Y]KR20020043434 (HYNIX SEMICONDUCTOR INC [KR]); | [X]US2002024943 (KARAUL MEHMET [US], et al); | [A]WO03036905 (SIEMENS AG [DE], et al) |