EP1763751 - MULTI-SOURCE, MULTI-DESTINATION DATA TRANSFERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2007/12] | MULTI-SOURCE, MULTI-DESTINATION DATA TRANSFERS | ||
[2014/45] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.09.2015 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.10.2017 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BE | published on 29.11.2017 [2017/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation New Orchard Road Armonk, NY 10504 / US | [2014/45] |
Former [2007/12] | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation New Orchard Road Armonk, N.Y. 10504 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BERSTIS, Viktors 5104 Cuesta Verde Austin, Texas 78746 / US | 02 /
CHEN, Yen-Fu 1920 Maize Bend Drive Austin, TX 78727 / US | 03 /
DUNSMOIR, John 2000 Shadow Brook Circle Round Rock, TX 78681 / US | [2007/12] | Representative(s) | Roberts, Scott Anthony IBM United Kingdom Limited Intellectual Property Law Hursley Park Winchester Hampshire SO21 2JN / GB | [2014/45] |
Former [2007/12] | Roberts, Scott Anthony IBM United Kingdom Limited Intellectual Property Law Hursley Park Winchester Hampshire SO21 2JN / GB | Application number, filing date | 05749701.8 | 26.04.2005 | [2014/45] | WO2005EP51864 | Priority number, date | US20040832036 | 26.04.2004 Original published format: US 832036 | [2007/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005103894 | Date: | 03.11.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1763751 | Date: | 21.03.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.11.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1763751 | Date: | 05.11.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.11.2005 | Classification | IPC: | G06F3/0481 | [2014/29] | CPC: |
G06F9/543 (EP,US);
G06Q50/10 (KR);
G06F3/0486 (US);
G06F3/04812 (US);
G06F3/04817 (US);
G06F3/0482 (US);
|
Former IPC [2007/12] | G06F9/54, G06F3/033 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/12] | Title | German: | DATENTRANSFERS MIT MEHREREN QUELLEN UND MEHREREN ZIELEN | [2014/45] | English: | MULTI-SOURCE, MULTI-DESTINATION DATA TRANSFERS | [2014/45] | French: | TRANSFERTS DE DONNEES MULTI-SOURCE, MULTI-DESTINATION | [2014/45] |
Former [2007/12] | DATENTRANSFERS MIT MEHREREN QUELLEN UND MEHREREN ZIELEN | ||
Former [2007/12] | MULTI-SOURCE, MULTI-DESTINATION DATA TRANSFERS | ||
Former [2007/12] | TRANSFERTS DE DONNEES MULTI-SOURCE, MULTI-DESTINATION | Entry into regional phase | 23.11.2006 | National basic fee paid | 23.11.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.11.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.11.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.11.2006 | Examination requested [2007/12] | 15.03.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.09.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.02.2008 | Invitation to provide information on prior art | 22.05.2008 | Reply to the invitation to provide information on prior art | 08.11.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.05.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.08.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.12.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.08.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.09.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 23.09.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 23.09.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 15.03.2007 | Opposition(s) | 06.08.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.04.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.04.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 29.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 26.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 26.04.2005 | AT | 05.11.2014 | BE | 05.11.2014 | BG | 05.11.2014 | CY | 05.11.2014 | CZ | 05.11.2014 | DK | 05.11.2014 | EE | 05.11.2014 | ES | 05.11.2014 | FI | 05.11.2014 | IT | 05.11.2014 | LT | 05.11.2014 | MC | 05.11.2014 | NL | 05.11.2014 | PL | 05.11.2014 | RO | 05.11.2014 | SE | 05.11.2014 | SI | 05.11.2014 | SK | 05.11.2014 | TR | 05.11.2014 | GR | 06.02.2015 | IS | 05.03.2015 | PT | 05.03.2015 | IE | 26.04.2015 | LU | 26.04.2015 | CH | 30.04.2015 | FR | 30.04.2015 | LI | 30.04.2015 | [2017/46] |
Former [2017/39] | HU | 26.04.2005 | |
AT | 05.11.2014 | ||
BG | 05.11.2014 | ||
CY | 05.11.2014 | ||
CZ | 05.11.2014 | ||
DK | 05.11.2014 | ||
EE | 05.11.2014 | ||
ES | 05.11.2014 | ||
FI | 05.11.2014 | ||
IT | 05.11.2014 | ||
LT | 05.11.2014 | ||
MC | 05.11.2014 | ||
NL | 05.11.2014 | ||
PL | 05.11.2014 | ||
RO | 05.11.2014 | ||
SE | 05.11.2014 | ||
SI | 05.11.2014 | ||
SK | 05.11.2014 | ||
TR | 05.11.2014 | ||
GR | 06.02.2015 | ||
IS | 05.03.2015 | ||
PT | 05.03.2015 | ||
IE | 26.04.2015 | ||
LU | 26.04.2015 | ||
CH | 30.04.2015 | ||
FR | 30.04.2015 | ||
LI | 30.04.2015 | ||
Former [2016/20] | AT | 05.11.2014 | |
CY | 05.11.2014 | ||
CZ | 05.11.2014 | ||
DK | 05.11.2014 | ||
EE | 05.11.2014 | ||
ES | 05.11.2014 | ||
FI | 05.11.2014 | ||
IT | 05.11.2014 | ||
LT | 05.11.2014 | ||
MC | 05.11.2014 | ||
NL | 05.11.2014 | ||
PL | 05.11.2014 | ||
RO | 05.11.2014 | ||
SE | 05.11.2014 | ||
SI | 05.11.2014 | ||
SK | 05.11.2014 | ||
GR | 06.02.2015 | ||
IS | 05.03.2015 | ||
PT | 05.03.2015 | ||
IE | 26.04.2015 | ||
LU | 26.04.2015 | ||
CH | 30.04.2015 | ||
FR | 30.04.2015 | ||
LI | 30.04.2015 | ||
Former [2016/12] | AT | 05.11.2014 | |
CY | 05.11.2014 | ||
CZ | 05.11.2014 | ||
DK | 05.11.2014 | ||
EE | 05.11.2014 | ||
ES | 05.11.2014 | ||
FI | 05.11.2014 | ||
IT | 05.11.2014 | ||
LT | 05.11.2014 | ||
MC | 05.11.2014 | ||
NL | 05.11.2014 | ||
PL | 05.11.2014 | ||
RO | 05.11.2014 | ||
SE | 05.11.2014 | ||
SI | 05.11.2014 | ||
SK | 05.11.2014 | ||
GR | 06.02.2015 | ||
IS | 05.03.2015 | ||
PT | 05.03.2015 | ||
LU | 26.04.2015 | ||
CH | 30.04.2015 | ||
FR | 30.04.2015 | ||
LI | 30.04.2015 | ||
Former [2016/06] | AT | 05.11.2014 | |
CY | 05.11.2014 | ||
CZ | 05.11.2014 | ||
DK | 05.11.2014 | ||
EE | 05.11.2014 | ||
ES | 05.11.2014 | ||
FI | 05.11.2014 | ||
IT | 05.11.2014 | ||
LT | 05.11.2014 | ||
MC | 05.11.2014 | ||
NL | 05.11.2014 | ||
PL | 05.11.2014 | ||
RO | 05.11.2014 | ||
SE | 05.11.2014 | ||
SK | 05.11.2014 | ||
GR | 06.02.2015 | ||
IS | 05.03.2015 | ||
PT | 05.03.2015 | ||
LU | 26.04.2015 | ||
CH | 30.04.2015 | ||
LI | 30.04.2015 | ||
Former [2016/03] | AT | 05.11.2014 | |
CY | 05.11.2014 | ||
CZ | 05.11.2014 | ||
DK | 05.11.2014 | ||
EE | 05.11.2014 | ||
ES | 05.11.2014 | ||
FI | 05.11.2014 | ||
IT | 05.11.2014 | ||
LT | 05.11.2014 | ||
MC | 05.11.2014 | ||
NL | 05.11.2014 | ||
PL | 05.11.2014 | ||
RO | 05.11.2014 | ||
SE | 05.11.2014 | ||
SK | 05.11.2014 | ||
GR | 06.02.2015 | ||
IS | 05.03.2015 | ||
PT | 05.03.2015 | ||
LU | 26.04.2015 | ||
Former [2016/01] | AT | 05.11.2014 | |
CY | 05.11.2014 | ||
CZ | 05.11.2014 | ||
DK | 05.11.2014 | ||
EE | 05.11.2014 | ||
ES | 05.11.2014 | ||
FI | 05.11.2014 | ||
LT | 05.11.2014 | ||
MC | 05.11.2014 | ||
NL | 05.11.2014 | ||
PL | 05.11.2014 | ||
RO | 05.11.2014 | ||
SE | 05.11.2014 | ||
SK | 05.11.2014 | ||
GR | 06.02.2015 | ||
IS | 05.03.2015 | ||
PT | 05.03.2015 | ||
LU | 26.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/52] | AT | 05.11.2014 | |
CY | 05.11.2014 | ||
CZ | 05.11.2014 | ||
DK | 05.11.2014 | ||
EE | 05.11.2014 | ||
ES | 05.11.2014 | ||
FI | 05.11.2014 | ||
LT | 05.11.2014 | ||
NL | 05.11.2014 | ||
PL | 05.11.2014 | ||
RO | 05.11.2014 | ||
SE | 05.11.2014 | ||
SK | 05.11.2014 | ||
GR | 06.02.2015 | ||
IS | 05.03.2015 | ||
PT | 05.03.2015 | ||
LU | 26.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/37] | AT | 05.11.2014 | |
CY | 05.11.2014 | ||
CZ | 05.11.2014 | ||
DK | 05.11.2014 | ||
EE | 05.11.2014 | ||
ES | 05.11.2014 | ||
FI | 05.11.2014 | ||
LT | 05.11.2014 | ||
NL | 05.11.2014 | ||
PL | 05.11.2014 | ||
RO | 05.11.2014 | ||
SE | 05.11.2014 | ||
SK | 05.11.2014 | ||
GR | 06.02.2015 | ||
IS | 05.03.2015 | ||
PT | 05.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/36] | AT | 05.11.2014 | |
CY | 05.11.2014 | ||
CZ | 05.11.2014 | ||
DK | 05.11.2014 | ||
EE | 05.11.2014 | ||
ES | 05.11.2014 | ||
FI | 05.11.2014 | ||
LT | 05.11.2014 | ||
NL | 05.11.2014 | ||
PL | 05.11.2014 | ||
RO | 05.11.2014 | ||
SE | 05.11.2014 | ||
GR | 06.02.2015 | ||
IS | 05.03.2015 | ||
PT | 05.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/35] | AT | 05.11.2014 | |
CY | 05.11.2014 | ||
DK | 05.11.2014 | ||
EE | 05.11.2014 | ||
ES | 05.11.2014 | ||
FI | 05.11.2014 | ||
LT | 05.11.2014 | ||
NL | 05.11.2014 | ||
PL | 05.11.2014 | ||
SE | 05.11.2014 | ||
GR | 06.02.2015 | ||
IS | 05.03.2015 | ||
PT | 05.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/26] | AT | 05.11.2014 | |
CY | 05.11.2014 | ||
ES | 05.11.2014 | ||
FI | 05.11.2014 | ||
LT | 05.11.2014 | ||
NL | 05.11.2014 | ||
PL | 05.11.2014 | ||
SE | 05.11.2014 | ||
GR | 06.02.2015 | ||
IS | 05.03.2015 | ||
PT | 05.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/25] | AT | 05.11.2014 | |
ES | 05.11.2014 | ||
FI | 05.11.2014 | ||
LT | 05.11.2014 | ||
NL | 05.11.2014 | ||
PL | 05.11.2014 | ||
SE | 05.11.2014 | ||
GR | 06.02.2015 | ||
IS | 05.03.2015 | ||
PT | 05.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/24] | ES | 05.11.2014 | |
FI | 05.11.2014 | ||
LT | 05.11.2014 | ||
NL | 05.11.2014 | ||
PL | 05.11.2014 | ||
SE | 05.11.2014 | ||
GR | 06.02.2015 | ||
IS | 05.03.2015 | ||
PT | 05.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/23] | ES | 05.11.2014 | |
FI | 05.11.2014 | ||
LT | 05.11.2014 | ||
NL | 05.11.2014 | ||
IS | 05.03.2015 | ||
PT | 05.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/22] | LT | 05.11.2014 | |
PT | 05.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/20] | LT | 05.11.2014 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0785507 (CANON INFORMATION SYST INC [US]) [A] 1-27 * abstract * * column 3, lines 17-55 * * column 7, line 2 - column 8, line 16 *; | [A]EP0851349 (IBM [US]) [A] 1-27 * abstract ** column 2, lines 33-40 *; | [X] - APPERLEY M ET AL, "Breaking the copy/paste cycle: the Stretchable Selection Tool", USER INTERFACE CONFERENCE, 2000. AUIC 2000. FIRST AUSTRALASIAN CANBERRA, ACT, AUSTRALIA 31 JAN.-3 FEB. 2000, LOS ALAMITOS, CA, USA,IEEE COMPUT. SOC, US, (20000131), ISBN 0-7695-0515-5, pages 3 - 10, XP010371179 [X] 1-27 * abstract * * page 3, column R, line 8 - page 4, column L, line 5 * * page 6, column R, line 6 - page 7, column R, line 11 * | [A] - ANONYMOUS, "BULLETIN BOARD BUFFER", IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN, IBM CORP. NEW YORK, US, (19920601), vol. 35, no. 1B, ISSN 0018-8689, pages 287 - 288, XP000309068 [A] 1-27 * the whole document * |