EP1761463 - OSMIUM DIBORIDE COMPOUNDS AND THEIR USES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.05.2014 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.05.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.06.2014 [2014/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Regents of the University of California-San Francisco 1111 Franklin Street, 12th Floor Oakland, CA 94607-5200 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2007/11] | For all designated states The Regents of the University of California-San Francisco 1111 Franklin Street, 12th Floor Oakland, CA 94607-5200 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KANER, Richard, B. 481 Almar Avenue Pacific Palisades, CA 90272 / US | 02 /
GILMAN, John, J. 405 Hilgard Avenue Los Angeles, CA 90095 / US | [2007/11] | Representative(s) | Wright, Howard Hugh Burnby, et al Withers & Rogers LLP 2 London Bridge London SE1 9RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2011/38] | Wright, Howard Hugh Burnby, et al Withers & Rogers LLP Goldings House 2 Hays Lane London SE1 2HW / GB | ||
Former [2008/13] | Watterson, Peer Marten John, et al Withers & Rogers LLP Goldings House 2 Hays Lane London SE1 2HW / GB | ||
Former [2007/11] | Jones, David Colin, et al Withers & Rogers LLP Goldings House, 2 Hays Lane London SE1 2HW / GB | Application number, filing date | 05749821.4 | 10.05.2005 | [2007/11] | WO2005US16372 | Priority number, date | US20040570320P | 11.05.2004 Original published format: US 570320 P | [2007/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2005110924 | Date: | 24.11.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/47] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1761463 | Date: | 14.03.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.11.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 10.08.2006 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.07.2008 | Classification | IPC: | B24D3/02, C01B35/04, B26B9/00, B26D1/00, C09K3/14, B23B27/14 | [2013/31] | CPC: |
B23B27/148 (EP,US);
C01G55/00 (KR);
B24D3/02 (EP,US);
B26B9/00 (EP,US);
B26D1/0006 (EP,US);
C01B35/04 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2007/11] | C01G55/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2007/33] |
Former [2007/11] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | OSMIUMDIBORIDVERBINDUNGEN UND DEREN VERWENDUNG | [2007/11] | English: | OSMIUM DIBORIDE COMPOUNDS AND THEIR USES | [2007/11] | French: | COMPOSÉS DE DIBORIDE D"OSMIUM ET LEURS USAGES | [2007/11] | Entry into regional phase | 20.11.2006 | National basic fee paid | 20.11.2006 | Search fee paid | 20.11.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.11.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.11.2006 | Examination requested [2007/11] | 28.11.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.04.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.09.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.03.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.10.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.02.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.04.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.06.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.08.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.12.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/24] | 24.01.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2014/24] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 28.11.2008 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.05.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 28.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US6217413 (CHRISTIANSON TODD J [US]) [Y] 1-6,13-19 * column 1, line 13 - line 19 * * column 14, line 19 - line 27 *; | [DY] - R.B. ROOF, C.P. KEMPTER, "New orthorhombic Phase in the Ru-B and Os-B Systems", J. CHEM. PHYS., (19621001), vol. 37, no. 7, pages 1473 - 1476, XP009102147 [DY] 1-26 * Section Results and Discussion * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1063/1.1733309 | [Y] - H. HOLLECK, "Material selection for hard coatings", J. VAC. SCI. TECHNOL. A, (1986), vol. 4, no. 6, pages 2661 - 2669, XP002485848 [Y] 7-12,20-26 * Section II: Classification of hard materials * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1116/1.573700 | International search | [A]US4745035 (SAURER ERIC [CH], et al); | [A]US2002069592 (SHERMAN ANDREW J [US], et al) |