EP1754360 - METHOD AND MODULE FOR SOFTWARE UPDATING OF A GATEWAY BETWEEN A NETWORK OPERATOR AND A LOCAL AREA NETWORK [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 29.01.2016 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.01.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.03.2016 [2016/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states INVENTEL 35, rue Tournefort 75005 Paris / FR | [2007/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HUTCHINGS, Cédric 26, rue de Villiers F-92300 Levallois / FR | 02 /
MOREAU, Clément 12, rue Antoine Bourdelle F-75015 Paris / FR | 03 /
CARREEL, Eric 9, rue du Général Gouraud F-92190 Meudon / FR | [2007/08] | Representative(s) | Huchet, Anne, et al TECHNICOLOR 1-5, rue Jeanne d'Arc 92130 Issy-les-Moulineaux / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2014/11] | Huchet, Anne, et al TECHNICOLOR European Patent Operations 1-5, rue Jeanne d'Arc 92443 Issy-les-Moulineaux Cedex / FR | ||
Former [2011/31] | Ruellan-Lemonnier, Brigitte, et al Technicolor European Patent Operations 1-5 Rue Jeanne d'Arc 92443 Issy-les-Moulineaux Cedex / FR | ||
Former [2007/08] | Berthier, Karine THOMSON, European Patent Operations, 46 Quai Alphonse Le Gallo 92648 Boulogne Cédex / FR | Application number, filing date | 05750014.2 | 01.04.2005 | [2007/08] | WO2005FR00800 | Priority number, date | FR20040006243 | 09.06.2004 Original published format: FR 0406243 | [2007/08] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006005818 | Date: | 19.01.2006 | Language: | FR | [2006/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1754360 | Date: | 21.02.2007 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.01.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.01.2006 | Classification | IPC: | H04L29/06 | [2007/08] | CPC: |
H04L12/287 (EP,US);
H04L9/40 (US);
H04L67/34 (EP,US);
H04L69/329 (EP,US);
G06F8/60 (EP,US);
H04L67/75 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2007/37] |
Former [2007/08] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND MODUL ZUR SOFTWAREAKTUALISIERUNG EINES GATEWAYS ZWISCEHN EINEM NETZWERKBETREIBER UND EINEM LOKALEN NETZWERK | [2007/08] | English: | METHOD AND MODULE FOR SOFTWARE UPDATING OF A GATEWAY BETWEEN A NETWORK OPERATOR AND A LOCAL AREA NETWORK | [2007/08] | French: | PROCEDE ET MODULE DE MISE A JOUR LOGICIELLE D'UNE PASSERELLE ENTRE UN RESEAU OPERATEUR ET UN RESEAU LOCAL | [2007/08] | Entry into regional phase | 28.11.2006 | National basic fee paid | 28.11.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.11.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.11.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.11.2006 | Examination requested [2007/08] | 13.05.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.09.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/09] | 22.10.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2016/09] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 13.05.2015 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.04.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 24.04.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 24.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 29.04.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2015 | 11   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US2002157090 (ANTON JR FRANCIS M [US]) [Y] 1-8 * paragraphs [0024] , [0030] , [0062] , [0067] , [0070]; figure 6 *; | [Y]US2003046676 (CHENG WILLIAM [US], et al) [Y] 1-8 * figure 5 *; | [A]EP1418760 (FRACARRO RADIOINDUSTRIE [IT]) [A] 1-8 * column 1, lines 22-27 * * column 5, line 2933 * * column 7, lines 22-32 * * column 7, lines 41-43; figure 4 * * column 10, lines 1-4 ** column 10, lines 8,9 * |