EP1721122 - METHOD FOR THE NONDESTRUCTIVE DETERMINATION OF THE INNER DIMENSIONS AND/OR THE OUTER DIMENSIONS OF A SHOE AND/OR OF A LAST [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.04.2014 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.04.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 14.05.2014 [2014/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Eberhard-Karls-Universität Tübingen Universitätsklinikum Geissweg 3 72076 Tübingen / DE | [2007/02] |
Former [2006/46] | For all designated states BECKER, Norbert L. Wilhelmstrasse 134 72074 Tübingen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Becker, Norbert L. Wilhelmstrasse 134 72074 Tübingen / DE | [2007/02] |
Former [2006/46] | 01 /
see applicant ... | Representative(s) | Witte, Weller & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Postfach 10 54 62 70047 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/03] | Witte, Weller & Partner Postfach 10 54 62 70047 Stuttgart / DE | ||
Former [2006/51] | Witte, Alexander Witte, Weller & Partner, Patentanwälte, Postfach 105462 70047 Stuttgart / DE | ||
Former [2006/46] | Dziewior, Joachim, et al Ensingerstrasse 21 89073 Ulm / DE | Application number, filing date | 05750264.3 | 03.05.2005 | [2006/46] | WO2005DE00831 | Priority number, date | DE20042007398U | 08.05.2004 Original published format: DE 202004007398 U | [2006/46] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005111539 | Date: | 24.11.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/47] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1721122 | Date: | 15.11.2006 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.11.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.11.2005 | Classification | IPC: | G01B15/00, G01N23/04, A43D1/02 | [2006/46] | CPC: |
G01B15/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/46] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR ZERSTÖRUNGSFREIEN ERMITTLUNG DER INNENMASSE UND/ODER AUSSENMASSE EINES SCHUHS UND/ODER DER AUSSENMASSE EINES LEISTENS | [2006/46] | English: | METHOD FOR THE NONDESTRUCTIVE DETERMINATION OF THE INNER DIMENSIONS AND/OR THE OUTER DIMENSIONS OF A SHOE AND/OR OF A LAST | [2006/46] | French: | PROCEDE POUR DETERMINER, SANS ENTRAINER D'ALTERATION, LA MASSE INTERIEURE ET/OU LA MASSE EXTERIEURE D'UNE CHAUSSURE ET/OU LA MASSE EXTERIEURE D'UNE FORME | [2006/46] | Entry into regional phase | 16.11.2005 | National basic fee paid | 16.11.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.11.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.11.2005 | Examination requested [2006/46] | 17.11.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.07.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.12.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.12.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/20] | 09.01.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2014/20] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 28.07.2008 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 22.05.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2010 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   13.10.2010 | 31.05.2013 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XA]US5515268 (YODA KIYOSHI [JP]) [X] 1-9 * column 4, line 22 - column 6, line 3; figures 1,2 * * column 6, line 55 - column 7, line 23; figure 5 * * column 8, lines 1-41; figures 7,9 * [A] 10,11; | [XA]US2141193 (MOTT HOWARD V S) [X] 1,9 * page 2, column LINKS, line 51 - page 3, column RECHTS, line 75; figures 1-6 * [A] 2-8,10,11; | [XA]US2126608 (BRADY DAVID R) [X] 1,9 * page 1, column RECHTS, line 5 - page 2, column RECHTS, line 30; figures 1-6 * [A] 2-8,10,11 |