EP1889806 - LOAD HOIST FOR CONFINED SPACES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.06.2012 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.08.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 17.09.2014 [2014/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tecnología en Sistemas de Elevación y Transporte, S.L. C/ Marques de Teverga, no. 8 33400 Avilés (Asturias) / ES | [2011/34] |
Former [2008/08] | For all designated states Tecnologia en Sistemas de Elevacion y Transporte C/ Marque de Teverga, no. 8 33400 Aviles (Asturias) / ES | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MORO SUAREZ, Anibal C/Libertad, 31 - 2[deg]C E-33450 Piedras Blancas-Castrillon (Asturias) / ES | 02 /
MORO SUAREZ, Alejandro C/Libertad, 31 - 2[deg]C E-33450 Piedras Blancas-Castrillon (Asturias) / ES | 03 /
MORO SUAREZ, Daniel C/Libertad, 31-2[deg]C E-33450 Piedras Blancas-Castrillon (Asturias) / ES | 04 /
GONZALEZ DOMINGUEZ, Jesus Camino Los Quiñones 175, no.204-1 E-33203 Gijon (Asturias) / ES | [2011/33] |
Former [2008/08] | 01 /
MORO SUAREZ, Anibal C/Libertad, 31 - 2 C E-33450 Piedras Blancas - Castrill n (As / ES | ||
02 /
MORO SUAREZ, Alejandro C/Libertad, 31 - 2 C E-33450 Piedras Blancas-Castrill n (Astu / ES | |||
03 /
MORO SUAREZ, Daniel C/Libertad, 31-2 C E-33450 Piedras Blancas-Castrill n (Astu / ES | |||
04 /
GONZALEZ DOMINGUEZ, Jesus Camino Los Quiñones 175, no.204-1 E-33203 Gij n (Asturias) / ES | Representative(s) | Gonzalez-Alberto Rodriguez, Natalia, et al Garrigues Hermosilla, 3 28001 Madrid / ES | [2010/32] |
Former [2010/25] | Pérez Sánchez, Manuel Jesús Garrigues IP S.L.P. C/Hermosilla 3 28001 Madrid / ES | ||
Former [2008/08] | Gonzalez-Alberto Rodriguez, Natalia Carrigues Hermosilla, 3 28001 Madrid / ES | Application number, filing date | 05750510.9 | 19.05.2005 | [2008/08] | WO2005ES00281 | Filing language | ES | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006122991 | Date: | 23.11.2006 | Language: | ES | [2006/47] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1889806 | Date: | 20.02.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1889806 | Date: | 24.08.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | ES | 23.11.2006 | Classification | IPC: | B66B9/02, B66B11/04 | [2008/08] | CPC: |
B66B9/022 (EP);
B66B9/187 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/08] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | 18.12.2007 | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | 18.12.2007 | Title | German: | LASTHEBEZEUG FÜR BEGRENZTE RÄUME | [2008/08] | English: | LOAD HOIST FOR CONFINED SPACES | [2008/08] | French: | MONTE-CHARGE POUR ESPACES CONFINES | [2008/08] | Entry into regional phase | 18.12.2007 | Translation filed | 18.12.2007 | National basic fee paid | 05.02.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.12.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.02.2006 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 18.12.2007 | Examination requested [2008/08] | 29.01.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: filing fee / search fee not paid in time | 07.02.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.06.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 01.06.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 07.02.2011 | Opposition(s) | 25.05.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/31] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of designation fees TR, SK, SI, SE, RO, PT, PL, NL, MC, LU, LT, IT, IS, IE, HU, GR, GB, FR, FI, ES, EE, DK, DE, CZ, CY, CH, BG, BE, AT | 05.02.2008 | Request for further processing filed | 05.02.2008 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 27.02.2008 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2008 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   08.07.2008 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 19.05.2005 | AT | 24.08.2011 | BE | 24.08.2011 | CY | 24.08.2011 | CZ | 24.08.2011 | DK | 24.08.2011 | EE | 24.08.2011 | FI | 24.08.2011 | GR | 24.08.2011 | IT | 24.08.2011 | LT | 24.08.2011 | NL | 24.08.2011 | PL | 24.08.2011 | PT | 24.08.2011 | RO | 24.08.2011 | SE | 24.08.2011 | SI | 24.08.2011 | SK | 24.08.2011 | TR | 24.08.2011 | BG | 24.11.2011 | IS | 24.12.2011 | GB | 19.05.2012 | IE | 19.05.2012 | LU | 19.05.2012 | [2014/38] |
Former [2014/34] | HU | 19.05.2005 | |
AT | 24.08.2011 | ||
BE | 24.08.2011 | ||
CY | 24.08.2011 | ||
CZ | 24.08.2011 | ||
DK | 24.08.2011 | ||
EE | 24.08.2011 | ||
FI | 24.08.2011 | ||
IT | 24.08.2011 | ||
LT | 24.08.2011 | ||
NL | 24.08.2011 | ||
PL | 24.08.2011 | ||
PT | 24.08.2011 | ||
RO | 24.08.2011 | ||
SE | 24.08.2011 | ||
SI | 24.08.2011 | ||
SK | 24.08.2011 | ||
TR | 24.08.2011 | ||
BG | 24.11.2011 | ||
IS | 24.12.2011 | ||
GB | 19.05.2012 | ||
IE | 19.05.2012 | ||
LU | 19.05.2012 | ||
Former [2014/27] | AT | 24.08.2011 | |
BE | 24.08.2011 | ||
CY | 24.08.2011 | ||
CZ | 24.08.2011 | ||
DK | 24.08.2011 | ||
EE | 24.08.2011 | ||
FI | 24.08.2011 | ||
IT | 24.08.2011 | ||
LT | 24.08.2011 | ||
NL | 24.08.2011 | ||
PL | 24.08.2011 | ||
RO | 24.08.2011 | ||
SE | 24.08.2011 | ||
SI | 24.08.2011 | ||
SK | 24.08.2011 | ||
TR | 24.08.2011 | ||
BG | 24.11.2011 | ||
IS | 24.12.2011 | ||
GB | 19.05.2012 | ||
IE | 19.05.2012 | ||
LU | 19.05.2012 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AT | 24.08.2011 | |
BE | 24.08.2011 | ||
CY | 24.08.2011 | ||
CZ | 24.08.2011 | ||
DK | 24.08.2011 | ||
EE | 24.08.2011 | ||
FI | 24.08.2011 | ||
IT | 24.08.2011 | ||
LT | 24.08.2011 | ||
NL | 24.08.2011 | ||
PL | 24.08.2011 | ||
RO | 24.08.2011 | ||
SE | 24.08.2011 | ||
SI | 24.08.2011 | ||
SK | 24.08.2011 | ||
TR | 24.08.2011 | ||
BG | 24.11.2011 | ||
IS | 24.12.2011 | ||
GB | 19.05.2012 | ||
IE | 19.05.2012 | ||
Former [2013/29] | AT | 24.08.2011 | |
BE | 24.08.2011 | ||
CY | 24.08.2011 | ||
CZ | 24.08.2011 | ||
DK | 24.08.2011 | ||
EE | 24.08.2011 | ||
FI | 24.08.2011 | ||
IT | 24.08.2011 | ||
LT | 24.08.2011 | ||
NL | 24.08.2011 | ||
PL | 24.08.2011 | ||
RO | 24.08.2011 | ||
SE | 24.08.2011 | ||
SI | 24.08.2011 | ||
SK | 24.08.2011 | ||
BG | 24.11.2011 | ||
IS | 24.12.2011 | ||
GB | 19.05.2012 | ||
IE | 19.05.2012 | ||
Former [2013/21] | AT | 24.08.2011 | |
BE | 24.08.2011 | ||
CY | 24.08.2011 | ||
CZ | 24.08.2011 | ||
DK | 24.08.2011 | ||
EE | 24.08.2011 | ||
FI | 24.08.2011 | ||
IT | 24.08.2011 | ||
LT | 24.08.2011 | ||
NL | 24.08.2011 | ||
PL | 24.08.2011 | ||
RO | 24.08.2011 | ||
SE | 24.08.2011 | ||
SI | 24.08.2011 | ||
SK | 24.08.2011 | ||
IS | 24.12.2011 | ||
GB | 19.05.2012 | ||
IE | 19.05.2012 | ||
Former [2013/20] | AT | 24.08.2011 | |
BE | 24.08.2011 | ||
CY | 24.08.2011 | ||
CZ | 24.08.2011 | ||
DK | 24.08.2011 | ||
EE | 24.08.2011 | ||
FI | 24.08.2011 | ||
IT | 24.08.2011 | ||
LT | 24.08.2011 | ||
NL | 24.08.2011 | ||
PL | 24.08.2011 | ||
RO | 24.08.2011 | ||
SE | 24.08.2011 | ||
SI | 24.08.2011 | ||
SK | 24.08.2011 | ||
IS | 24.12.2011 | ||
IE | 19.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/33] | AT | 24.08.2011 | |
BE | 24.08.2011 | ||
CY | 24.08.2011 | ||
CZ | 24.08.2011 | ||
DK | 24.08.2011 | ||
EE | 24.08.2011 | ||
FI | 24.08.2011 | ||
IT | 24.08.2011 | ||
LT | 24.08.2011 | ||
NL | 24.08.2011 | ||
PL | 24.08.2011 | ||
RO | 24.08.2011 | ||
SE | 24.08.2011 | ||
SI | 24.08.2011 | ||
SK | 24.08.2011 | ||
IS | 24.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/23] | AT | 24.08.2011 | |
BE | 24.08.2011 | ||
CY | 24.08.2011 | ||
CZ | 24.08.2011 | ||
EE | 24.08.2011 | ||
FI | 24.08.2011 | ||
IT | 24.08.2011 | ||
LT | 24.08.2011 | ||
NL | 24.08.2011 | ||
PL | 24.08.2011 | ||
RO | 24.08.2011 | ||
SE | 24.08.2011 | ||
SI | 24.08.2011 | ||
SK | 24.08.2011 | ||
IS | 24.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/21] | AT | 24.08.2011 | |
BE | 24.08.2011 | ||
CY | 24.08.2011 | ||
CZ | 24.08.2011 | ||
FI | 24.08.2011 | ||
LT | 24.08.2011 | ||
NL | 24.08.2011 | ||
PL | 24.08.2011 | ||
SE | 24.08.2011 | ||
SI | 24.08.2011 | ||
IS | 24.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/17] | AT | 24.08.2011 | |
BE | 24.08.2011 | ||
CY | 24.08.2011 | ||
FI | 24.08.2011 | ||
LT | 24.08.2011 | ||
NL | 24.08.2011 | ||
PL | 24.08.2011 | ||
SE | 24.08.2011 | ||
SI | 24.08.2011 | ||
IS | 24.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/12] | AT | 24.08.2011 | |
CY | 24.08.2011 | ||
FI | 24.08.2011 | ||
LT | 24.08.2011 | ||
NL | 24.08.2011 | ||
PL | 24.08.2011 | ||
SE | 24.08.2011 | ||
SI | 24.08.2011 | ||
IS | 24.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/11] | AT | 24.08.2011 | |
FI | 24.08.2011 | ||
LT | 24.08.2011 | ||
NL | 24.08.2011 | ||
PL | 24.08.2011 | ||
SE | 24.08.2011 | ||
SI | 24.08.2011 | ||
IS | 24.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/10] | FI | 24.08.2011 | |
LT | 24.08.2011 | ||
NL | 24.08.2011 | ||
SE | 24.08.2011 | ||
IS | 24.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/09] | FI | 24.08.2011 | |
LT | 24.08.2011 | ||
NL | 24.08.2011 | ||
IS | 24.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/08] | LT | 24.08.2011 | |
NL | 24.08.2011 | ||
IS | 24.12.2011 | Cited in | International search | [A]FR1415335 ; | [A]GB2067512 (EMMERSON D); | [A]JPH07101649 (TAKENAKA KOMUTEN CO); | [A]JPH08277079 (ETSUHARA YOSHITADA); | [A]JPH09240962 (SHIMIZU CONSTRUCTION CO LTD, et al); | [A]JPH09302938 (TAKENAKA KOMUTEN CO, et al) |