EP1895451 - PERSONAL IDENTIFICATION CARD COMPRISING A TWO-DIMENSIONAL IMAGE OF THE USER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.06.2010 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.06.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 14.07.2010 [2010/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Microelectronica Española, S.A.U. Pradillo 36 28002 Madrid / ES | [2008/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PEREZ AZNAR, Javier Pradillo, 36 E-28002 MADRID / ES | [2008/10] | Representative(s) | Carpintero Lopez, Francisco, et al Herrero & Asociados, S.L. Agustín de Foxá, 4-10 28036 Madrid / ES | [N/P] |
Former [2009/29] | Carpintero Lopez, Francisco, et al Herrero & Asociados, S.L. Alcalá 35 28014 Madrid / ES | ||
Former [2008/10] | Carpintero Lopez, Francisco, et al HERRERO & ASOCIADOS, S.L. Alcalá, 35 28014 Madrid / ES | Application number, filing date | 05750841.8 | 20.05.2005 | [2008/10] | WO2005ES00286 | Priority number, date | ES20050000978 | 22.04.2005 Original published format: ES 200500978 | [2008/10] | Filing language | ES | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006114454 | Date: | 02.11.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1895451 | Date: | 05.03.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.11.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | ES | 02.11.2006 | Classification | IPC: | G06K19/16, B42D15/10 | [2008/10] | CPC: |
B42D25/00 (EP,US);
G06K19/16 (ES,KR);
B42D25/23 (KR,US);
B42D25/309 (KR,US);
G06K19/00 (KR);
B42D2035/06 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/10] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | PERSÖNLICHE IDENTIFIKATIONSKARTE MIT ZWEIDIMENSIONALEM BILD DES BENUTZERS | [2008/10] | English: | PERSONAL IDENTIFICATION CARD COMPRISING A TWO-DIMENSIONAL IMAGE OF THE USER | [2008/10] | French: | CARTE D'IDENTIFICATION PERSONNELLE PRESENTANT UNE IMAGE BIDIMENSIONNELLE DE L'UTILISATEUR | [2008/10] | Entry into regional phase | 22.11.2007 | Translation filed | 19.11.2007 | National basic fee paid | 19.11.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.11.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.02.2007 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 19.11.2007 | Examination requested [2008/10] | 01.12.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/28] | 08.01.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2010/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.05.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2009 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]GB1403765 (ROTHFJELL ROLF ERIC); | [X]ES2028780T ; | [X]WO03075217 (SONY CORP [JP], et al) |