EP1766061 - SINGLE LABEL COMPARATIVE HYBRIDIZATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.05.2014 Database last updated on 27.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2016 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 17.08.2016 [2016/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Quest Diagnostics Investments Incorporated 300 Delaware Avenue Wilmington, DE 19899 / US | [2007/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MOHAMMED, Mansoor S. 27266 Los Altos, no. 413 Mission Viejo, CA 92691 / US | 02 /
DZIDIC, Natasa 655 Griffith Way Laguna Beach, CA 92651 / US | 03 /
MCCASKILL, Christopher 2000 Corporate Drive 906 Ladera Ranch, CA 92694 / US | 04 /
KIM, Jaeweon 976 Sea Cliff Drive Carlsbad, CA 92009 / US | [2013/10] |
Former [2007/31] | 01 /
MOHAMMED, Mansoor, S. 27266 Los Altos, no. 413 Mission Viejo, CA 92691 / US | ||
02 /
DZIDIC, Natasa 655 Griffith Way Laguna Beach, CA 92651 / US | |||
03 /
MCCASKILL, Christopher 2000 Corporate Drive 906 Ladera Ranch, CA 92694 / US | |||
04 /
KIM, Jaeweon 976 Sea Cliff Drive Carlsbad, CA 92009 / US | |||
Former [2007/26] | 01 /
MOHAMMED, Mansoor, S. Mission Viejo, CA / US | ||
02 /
DZIDIC, Natasa Laguna Beach, CA / US | |||
03 /
MCCASKILL, Christopher 2000 Corporate Drive 906 Ladera Ranch, CA 92694 / US | |||
04 /
KIM, Jaeweon 976 Sea Cliff Drive Carlsbad, CA 92009 / US | |||
Former [2007/13] | 01 /
MOHAMMED, Mansoor, S. Mission Viejo, CA / US | ||
02 /
DZIDIC, Natasa Laguna Beach, CA / US | |||
03 /
MCCASKILL, Christopher 2000 Corporate Drive 906 Ladera Ranch, CA 92694 / US | |||
04 /
KIM, Jaeweon 976 Sea Cliff Drive Carlsbad, CA 92009 / US | Representative(s) | Schiweck Weinzierl Koch Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Ganghoferstraße 68 B 80339 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/29] | Schiweck, Weinzierl & Koch European Patent Attorneys Landsberger Straße 98 80339 München / DE | ||
Former [2011/13] | Schiweck, Weinzierl & Koch European Patent Attorneys Landsberger Straße 98 80339 München / DE | ||
Former [2009/36] | Viering, Jentschura & Partner Postfach 22 14 43 80504 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/26] | Viering, Jentschura & Partner Grillparzerstrasse 14 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/13] | Viering, Hans-Martin Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Viering, Jentschura & Partner, Steindorfstrasse 6 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05752947.1 | 19.05.2005 | [2007/13] | WO2005US17986 | Priority number, date | US20040573457P | 20.05.2004 Original published format: US 573457 P | US20050648374P | 27.01.2005 Original published format: US 648374 P | [2007/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2005113834 | Date: | 01.12.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/48] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1766061 | Date: | 28.03.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.12.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1766061 | Date: | 17.07.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 29.03.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.04.2009 | Classification | IPC: | C12Q1/68 | [2007/13] | CPC: |
C12Q1/6837 (EP,US);
C12Q1/6825 (US);
C12Q1/6841 (EP,US);
C12Q1/6883 (US);
C12Q1/6823 (EP,US);
C12Q2600/16 (US)
| C-Set: |
C12Q1/6837, C12Q2539/101, C12Q2545/107 (US,EP);
C12Q1/6841, C12Q2565/501, C12Q2539/101, C12Q2537/155 (EP,US) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/13] | Title | German: | VERGLEICHENDE EINFACHMARKIERUNG-HYBRIDISIERUNG | [2007/13] | English: | SINGLE LABEL COMPARATIVE HYBRIDIZATION | [2007/13] | French: | HYBRIDATION COMPARATIVE A MARQUEUR UNIQUE | [2007/13] | Entry into regional phase | 20.12.2006 | National basic fee paid | 20.12.2006 | Search fee paid | 20.12.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.12.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.12.2006 | Examination requested [2007/13] | 12.07.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.01.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.06.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.10.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.07.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 14.09.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.02.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.06.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 06.06.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 12.07.2010 | Opposition(s) | 22.04.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 10.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 19.05.2005 | AT | 17.07.2013 | BE | 17.07.2013 | BG | 17.07.2013 | CY | 17.07.2013 | CZ | 17.07.2013 | DK | 17.07.2013 | EE | 17.07.2013 | FI | 17.07.2013 | IT | 17.07.2013 | LT | 17.07.2013 | MC | 17.07.2013 | NL | 17.07.2013 | PL | 17.07.2013 | RO | 17.07.2013 | SE | 17.07.2013 | SI | 17.07.2013 | SK | 17.07.2013 | TR | 17.07.2013 | GR | 18.10.2013 | ES | 28.10.2013 | IS | 17.11.2013 | PT | 18.11.2013 | [2016/33] |
Former [2016/32] | HU | 19.05.2005 | |
AT | 17.07.2013 | ||
BE | 17.07.2013 | ||
BG | 17.07.2013 | ||
CY | 17.07.2013 | ||
CZ | 17.07.2013 | ||
DK | 17.07.2013 | ||
EE | 17.07.2013 | ||
FI | 17.07.2013 | ||
IT | 17.07.2013 | ||
LT | 17.07.2013 | ||
MC | 17.07.2013 | ||
NL | 17.07.2013 | ||
PL | 17.07.2013 | ||
RO | 17.07.2013 | ||
SE | 17.07.2013 | ||
SI | 17.07.2013 | ||
SK | 17.07.2013 | ||
GR | 18.10.2013 | ||
ES | 28.10.2013 | ||
IS | 17.11.2013 | ||
PT | 18.11.2013 | ||
Former [2016/25] | AT | 17.07.2013 | |
BE | 17.07.2013 | ||
BG | 17.07.2013 | ||
CY | 17.07.2013 | ||
CZ | 17.07.2013 | ||
DK | 17.07.2013 | ||
EE | 17.07.2013 | ||
FI | 17.07.2013 | ||
IT | 17.07.2013 | ||
LT | 17.07.2013 | ||
MC | 17.07.2013 | ||
NL | 17.07.2013 | ||
PL | 17.07.2013 | ||
RO | 17.07.2013 | ||
SE | 17.07.2013 | ||
SI | 17.07.2013 | ||
SK | 17.07.2013 | ||
GR | 18.10.2013 | ||
ES | 28.10.2013 | ||
IS | 17.11.2013 | ||
PT | 18.11.2013 | ||
Former [2015/09] | AT | 17.07.2013 | |
BE | 17.07.2013 | ||
CY | 17.07.2013 | ||
CZ | 17.07.2013 | ||
DK | 17.07.2013 | ||
EE | 17.07.2013 | ||
FI | 17.07.2013 | ||
IT | 17.07.2013 | ||
LT | 17.07.2013 | ||
MC | 17.07.2013 | ||
NL | 17.07.2013 | ||
PL | 17.07.2013 | ||
RO | 17.07.2013 | ||
SE | 17.07.2013 | ||
SI | 17.07.2013 | ||
SK | 17.07.2013 | ||
GR | 18.10.2013 | ||
ES | 28.10.2013 | ||
IS | 17.11.2013 | ||
PT | 18.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/24] | AT | 17.07.2013 | |
BE | 17.07.2013 | ||
CY | 17.07.2013 | ||
CZ | 17.07.2013 | ||
DK | 17.07.2013 | ||
EE | 17.07.2013 | ||
FI | 17.07.2013 | ||
IT | 17.07.2013 | ||
LT | 17.07.2013 | ||
NL | 17.07.2013 | ||
PL | 17.07.2013 | ||
RO | 17.07.2013 | ||
SE | 17.07.2013 | ||
SI | 17.07.2013 | ||
SK | 17.07.2013 | ||
GR | 18.10.2013 | ||
ES | 28.10.2013 | ||
IS | 17.11.2013 | ||
PT | 18.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/23] | AT | 17.07.2013 | |
BE | 17.07.2013 | ||
CY | 17.07.2013 | ||
CZ | 17.07.2013 | ||
DK | 17.07.2013 | ||
EE | 17.07.2013 | ||
FI | 17.07.2013 | ||
LT | 17.07.2013 | ||
NL | 17.07.2013 | ||
PL | 17.07.2013 | ||
RO | 17.07.2013 | ||
SE | 17.07.2013 | ||
SI | 17.07.2013 | ||
SK | 17.07.2013 | ||
GR | 18.10.2013 | ||
ES | 28.10.2013 | ||
IS | 17.11.2013 | ||
PT | 18.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/22] | AT | 17.07.2013 | |
BE | 17.07.2013 | ||
CY | 17.07.2013 | ||
DK | 17.07.2013 | ||
FI | 17.07.2013 | ||
LT | 17.07.2013 | ||
NL | 17.07.2013 | ||
PL | 17.07.2013 | ||
RO | 17.07.2013 | ||
SE | 17.07.2013 | ||
SI | 17.07.2013 | ||
GR | 18.10.2013 | ||
ES | 28.10.2013 | ||
IS | 17.11.2013 | ||
PT | 18.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AT | 17.07.2013 | |
BE | 17.07.2013 | ||
CY | 17.07.2013 | ||
DK | 17.07.2013 | ||
FI | 17.07.2013 | ||
LT | 17.07.2013 | ||
NL | 17.07.2013 | ||
PL | 17.07.2013 | ||
SE | 17.07.2013 | ||
SI | 17.07.2013 | ||
GR | 18.10.2013 | ||
ES | 28.10.2013 | ||
IS | 17.11.2013 | ||
PT | 18.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/14] | AT | 17.07.2013 | |
BE | 17.07.2013 | ||
CY | 17.07.2013 | ||
FI | 17.07.2013 | ||
LT | 17.07.2013 | ||
NL | 17.07.2013 | ||
PL | 17.07.2013 | ||
SE | 17.07.2013 | ||
SI | 17.07.2013 | ||
GR | 18.10.2013 | ||
ES | 28.10.2013 | ||
IS | 17.11.2013 | ||
PT | 18.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/12] | AT | 17.07.2013 | |
BE | 17.07.2013 | ||
CY | 17.07.2013 | ||
FI | 17.07.2013 | ||
LT | 17.07.2013 | ||
PL | 17.07.2013 | ||
SE | 17.07.2013 | ||
SI | 17.07.2013 | ||
GR | 18.10.2013 | ||
ES | 28.10.2013 | ||
IS | 17.11.2013 | ||
PT | 18.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/11] | AT | 17.07.2013 | |
BE | 17.07.2013 | ||
CY | 17.07.2013 | ||
FI | 17.07.2013 | ||
LT | 17.07.2013 | ||
PL | 17.07.2013 | ||
SE | 17.07.2013 | ||
IS | 17.11.2013 | ||
PT | 18.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/10] | AT | 17.07.2013 | |
BE | 17.07.2013 | ||
CY | 17.07.2013 | ||
LT | 17.07.2013 | ||
SE | 17.07.2013 | ||
IS | 17.11.2013 | ||
PT | 18.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | AT | 17.07.2013 | |
BE | 17.07.2013 | ||
LT | 17.07.2013 | ||
SE | 17.07.2013 | ||
PT | 18.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/08] | LT | 17.07.2013 | |
PT | 18.11.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2004009493 (MOHAMMED MANSOOR [US], et al) [A] 1-10,19-67 * paragraph [0028] *; | [A]WO02061140 (AMBION INC [US], et al) [A] 1-10,19-67 * page 57, line 23 - page 58, line 21; figure 8 * * page 4, line 18 - line 19 * * page 8, line 29 - page 9, line 4 *; | [A]WO03012147 (DATASCOPE INVESTMENT CORP [US], et al) [A] 1-10,19-67 * the whole document *; | [A] - RAMAKRISHNAN R ET AL, "An assessment of motorola codelink microarray performance for gene expression profiling applications", NUCLEIC ACIDS RESEARCH, OXFORD UNIVERSITY PRESS, SURREY, GB, (20020101), vol. 30, no. 7, ISSN 0305-1048, pages 1 - 12(e30), XP002962789 [A] 1-10,19-67 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/nar/30.7.e30 | [A] - ARMSTRONG B ET AL, "Suspension arrays for high throughput, multiplexed single nucleotide polymorphism genotyping", CYTOMETRY, ALAN LISS, NEW YORK, US, (20000601), vol. 40, no. 2, ISSN 0196-4763, pages 102 - 108, XP002372536 [A] 1-10,19-67 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/(SICI)1097-0320(20000601)40:2<102::AID-CYTO3>3.0.CO;2-4 | International search | [X]WO9318186 (UNIV CALIFORNIA [US]); | [Y]US5830645 (PINKEL DANIEL [US], et al) | [X] - SCHEMA ET AL., PROCEEDING NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES, (199610), vol. 93, pages 10614 - 10619, XP002022507 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.93.20.10614 | by applicant | US2004009493 | - KALLIONIEMI ET AL., SCIENCE, (1992), vol. 258, pages 818 - 821 | - "Catalog of Chromosome Aberrations", MITTELMAN ET AL., CANCER, WILEY-LISS, (1994), vol. 2 | - WHITEMAN ET AL., AM. J. HUM. GENET., (1991), vol. 49, pages A127 - 129 | - KLINGER ET AL., AM. J. HUM. GENET., (1992), vol. 51, pages 52 - 65 |