EP1761985 - CONTROL DEVICE AND METHOD FOR CONTROLLING AN ADJUSTING DEVICE OF A MOTOR VEHICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.06.2011 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.06.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 20.07.2011 [2011/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Brose Fahrzeugteile GmbH & Co. Kommanditgesellschaft, Coburg Ketschendorfer Strasse 38-50 96450 Coburg / DE | [2007/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ÜBEL, Wolfgang Hutstrasse 6 96479 Weitramsdorf / DE | 02 /
SCHÜSSLER, Markus Trübenbrunn 1 97799 Zeitlofs / DE | 03 /
BUHLHELLER, Jürgen J.v. Wolnbergstrasse 44 97478 Hainert / DE | [2007/11] | Representative(s) | FDST Patentanwälte Nordostpark 16 90411 Nürnberg / DE | [2011/23] |
Former [2008/31] | Tergau & Pohl Patentanwälte Mögeldorfer Hauptstrasse 51 90482 Nürnberg / DE | ||
Former [2007/11] | Tergau & Pohl Patentanwälte Mögeldorfer Hauptstrasse 51 90482 Nürnberg / DE | Application number, filing date | 05753787.0 | 24.06.2005 | [2007/11] | WO2005EP06850 | Priority number, date | DE20042009922U | 24.06.2004 Original published format: DE 202004009922 U | [2007/11] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006000432 | Date: | 05.01.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1761985 | Date: | 14.03.2007 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.01.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.01.2006 | Classification | IPC: | H02H7/085 | [2007/11] | CPC: |
H02H7/0851 (EP,US);
H02H1/0092 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR [2007/40] |
Former [2007/11] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | STEUERUNGSVORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR STEUERUNG EINER VERSTELLEINRICHTUNG EINES KRAFTFAHRZEUGS | [2007/11] | English: | CONTROL DEVICE AND METHOD FOR CONTROLLING AN ADJUSTING DEVICE OF A MOTOR VEHICLE | [2007/11] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE COMMANDE ET PROCEDE DE COMMANDE D'UN DISPOSITIF DE REGLAGE DANS UN VEHICULE AUTOMOBILE | [2007/11] | Entry into regional phase | 24.01.2007 | National basic fee paid | 24.01.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.01.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.01.2007 | Examination requested [2007/11] | 09.02.2007 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 06.04.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.08.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.01.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/29] | 07.02.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2011/29] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 06.04.2009 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2010 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [E]WO2005071812 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE], et al) [E] 1,12,16,17,31,44,71,73-77,87-90 * page 5, line 19 - page 8, line 12; figures 1,2 *; | [A]US5667244 (ITO KOJI [JP], et al) [A] 1-8,44-51,87-90 * column 5, line 20 - column 10, line 47; figures 1-15 *; | [A]EP0903459 (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [A] * the whole document * |