EP1763624 - EXHAUST GAS DIFFUSER WALL CONTOURING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.02.2014 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.02.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.03.2014 [2014/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/11] | For all designated states Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/12] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HALLER, Brian The Old Rectory, Market Rasen, Panton Lincolnshire LN8 5LQ / GB | [2007/12] | Application number, filing date | 05753971.0 | 09.06.2005 | [2007/12] | WO2005EP52673 | Priority number, date | GB20040014846 | 02.07.2004 Original published format: GB 0414846 | [2007/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006003071 | Date: | 12.01.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1763624 | Date: | 21.03.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.01.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.01.2006 | Classification | IPC: | F01D25/30 | [2007/12] | CPC: |
F01D25/30 (EP,GB,US);
F05D2240/12 (EP,US);
F05D2250/712 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI [2007/41] |
Former [2007/12] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ABGASDIFFUSORWANDKONTURIERUNG | [2007/12] | English: | EXHAUST GAS DIFFUSER WALL CONTOURING | [2007/12] | French: | CONFIGURATION DE PAROIS DE DIFFUSION DE GAZ D'ÉCHAPPEMENT | [2013/18] |
Former [2007/12] | CONFIGURATION DE PAROIS DE DIFFUSION DE GAZ D'ECHAPPEMENT | Entry into regional phase | 27.11.2006 | National basic fee paid | 27.11.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.11.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.02.2006 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 27.11.2006 | Examination requested [2007/12] | 07.03.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.09.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.04.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M03) | 09.07.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.05.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.10.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/13] | 07.11.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2014/13] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 07.03.2008 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 18.06.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 20.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]GB623108 (WESTINGHOUSE ELECTRIC INT CO); | [X]US3625630 (SOO SHAO L); | [A]US5152661 (SHEETS HERMAN E [US]); | [X]US5524827 (ZNAMENSKY VLADIMIR P [RU], et al) |