EP1782121 - RESIDUAL ACCOMODATION THRESHOLD FOR CORRECTION OF PRESBYOPIA AND OTHER PRESBYOPIA CORRECTION USING PATIENT DATA [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 16.11.2018 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.11.2018 | Withdrawal of application | published on 19.12.2018 [2018/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AMO Manufacturing USA, LLC 1700 E. St. Andrew Place Santa Ana, CA 92705-4933 / US | [2010/42] |
Former [2008/15] | For all designated states AMO Manufacturing USA, LLC 3400 Central Expressway Santa Clara, CA 95051 / US | ||
Former [2007/19] | For all designated states Visx, Incorporated 3400 Central Expressway Santa Clara, CA 95051-0703 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DAI, Guangming 34249 Xanadu Terrace Fremont, CA 94555 / US | 02 /
YEE, Kingman 1913 Fumia Place San Jose, CA 95131 / US | [2007/19] | Representative(s) | Tunstall, Christopher Stephen, et al Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/39] | Clark, Jane Anne, et al Mathys & Squire LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2SQ / GB | ||
Former [2007/19] | Kazi, Ilya Mathys & Squire 120 Holborn London EC1N 2SQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 05754065.0 | 20.05.2005 | [2007/19] | WO2005US18106 | Priority number, date | US20040579124P | 10.06.2004 Original published format: US 579124 P | US20040911400 | 03.08.2004 Original published format: US 911400 | [2007/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2005124433 | Date: | 29.12.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/52] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1782121 | Date: | 09.05.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.12.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 19.04.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.07.2009 | Classification | IPC: | A61B3/00, A61B3/10, A61B3/14, A61B3/08, // A61F9/01 | [2009/36] | CPC: |
A61B3/0025 (EP,US);
A61B3/09 (EP,US);
A61B3/112 (US);
A61F2009/00872 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2007/29] | A61B3/00, A61B3/10, A61B3/14, A61B3/08 | ||
Former IPC [2007/19] | G02C7/02 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/19] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | RESIDUALUNTERBRINGUNGSSCHWELLE ZUR KORREKTUR VON ALTERSWEITSICHTIGKEIT UND ANDERE KORREKTUR VON ALTERSWEITSICHTIGKEIT UNTER VERWENDUNG VON PATIENTENDATEN | [2007/19] | English: | RESIDUAL ACCOMODATION THRESHOLD FOR CORRECTION OF PRESBYOPIA AND OTHER PRESBYOPIA CORRECTION USING PATIENT DATA | [2007/19] | French: | SEUIL D'ACCOMMODATION RESIDUELLE POUR CORRECTION DE LA PRESBYTIE ET AUTRE CORRECTION DE LA PRESBYTIE AU MOYEN DE DONNEES RELATIVES AU PATIENT | [2007/19] | Entry into regional phase | 12.03.2007 | National basic fee paid | 12.03.2007 | Search fee paid | 12.03.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.03.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.02.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: filing fee / search fee not paid in time | 12.03.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.03.2007 | Examination requested [2007/19] | 30.10.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.05.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.03.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.09.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.11.2018 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2018/51] | 09.11.2018 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 06.12.2018 | 06.12.2018 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Divisional application(s) | EP18204737.3 / EP3459433 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 30.10.2009 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.05.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 21.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 26.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 26.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 07.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 30.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 05.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 10.05.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 14 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US5574518 (MERCURE ROBERT [CA]) [X] 1 * column 4, line 32 - line 52 * * column 9, line 41 - column 12, line 39 * [Y] 6,7; | [A]US5777719 (WILLIAMS DAVID R [US], et al) [A] 2-8* column 4, line 12 - column 8, line 27 *; | [Y]US6280435 (ODRICH MARC [US], et al) [Y] 4,5 * column 15, line 16 - column 17, line 4 * * figures 10-14 *; | [A]US2002140902 (GUIRAO ANTONIO [ES], et al) [A] 2-8 * paragraph [0056] - paragraph [0112] *; | [XY]US2003199858 (SCHELONKA LEE PAUL [US]) [X] 1-3,8,24 * paragraph [0039] - paragraph [0065] * * figures 2,4-9 * * tables 3,5 * [Y] 4-7 | International search | [X]US5002384 (TRACHTMAN JOSEPH N [US]); | [A]US2002040219 (NAKAMURA TAKUA [JP], et al) | Examination | US2002167643 |