EP1782067 - FILTER DEVICE, THE METHOD, KIT AND USE THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.05.2010 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.05.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 30.06.2010 [2010/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ANI BIOTECH OY Tiilitie 3 01720 Vantaa / FI | [2007/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SARAMÄKI, Mika Eräkatu 5 FI-03620 Karkkila / FI | 02 /
NISKANEN, Aimo Peipontie 20 FI-02660 Espoo / FI | [2007/19] | Representative(s) | Hjelt, Pia Dorrit Helene, et al Boco IP Oy Ab Itämerenkatu 5 00180 Helsinki / FI | [N/P] |
Former [2007/19] | Hjelt, Pia Dorrit Helene, et al Borenius & Co Oy Ab Tallberginkatu 2 A 00180 Helsinki / FI | Application number, filing date | 05754147.6 | 15.06.2005 | [2007/19] | WO2005FI50215 | Priority number, date | FI20040000825 | 15.06.2004 Original published format: FI 20040825 | US20040954627 | 29.09.2004 Original published format: US 954627 | [2007/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005124347 | Date: | 29.12.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1782067 | Date: | 09.05.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.12.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | FI | 29.12.2005 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/543, G01N33/58 | [2007/19] | CPC: |
G01N33/54366 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/19] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FILTERVORRICHTUNG, VERFAHREN, KIT UND VERWENDUNG DAFÜR | [2007/19] | English: | FILTER DEVICE, THE METHOD, KIT AND USE THEREOF | [2007/19] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE FILTRE, PROCEDE, KIT ET UTILISATION DE CELUI-CI | [2007/19] | Entry into regional phase | 12.01.2007 | National basic fee paid | 12.01.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.01.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.01.2007 | Examination requested [2007/19] | 27.03.2007 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: Claims | 04.05.2007 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Claims {1} | 31.12.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/26] | 08.02.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2010/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2009 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US6632681 ; | [Y]US6375028 ; | [Y]US6162398 ; | [Y]WO03098215 ; | [Y]US6737277 ; | [Y]EP0392377 |