EP1755962 - DISPENSING SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.09.2008 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.09.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.10.2008 [2008/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bayer CropScience LP Two T.W. Alexander Drive Research Triangle Park, NC 27709 / US | [2007/29] |
Former [2007/09] | For all designated states GUSTAFSON LLC 1400 Preston Road Suite 400 Plano TX 75093 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LUND, Virgil, D. 7125 Fruitville Road,No.755 Sarasota, Florida 34240 / US | [2007/28] |
Former [2007/09] | 01 /
LUND, Virgil, D. 10112 Juniper Lane Eden Prairie, MN 55347 / US | Representative(s) | Pearson, James Ginn Abel & Imray 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2007/09] | Pearson, James Ginn Abel & Imray, 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 05754162.5 | 18.04.2005 | [2007/09] | WO2005US13276 | Priority number, date | US20040563173P | 16.04.2004 Original published format: US 563173 P | US20040565615P | 27.04.2004 Original published format: US 565615 P | US20050106786 | 15.04.2005 Original published format: US 106786 | [2007/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005100166 | Date: | 27.10.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/43] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1755962 | Date: | 28.02.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.10.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.10.2005 | Classification | IPC: | B65B69/00 | [2007/09] | CPC: |
B65B69/0041 (EP,US);
B65D77/36 (KR);
B65B69/00 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/09] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ABGABESYSTEM | [2007/09] | English: | DISPENSING SYSTEM | [2007/09] | French: | SYSTEME DISTRIBUTEUR | [2007/09] | Entry into regional phase | 14.11.2006 | National basic fee paid | 14.11.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.11.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.11.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.11.2006 | Examination requested [2007/09] | 24.10.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.05.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/44] | 10.06.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2008/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]GB191512070 (LESLIE-MELVILLE JANNETTE [GB], et al) [A] 1 * figure - *; | [A]US2416725 (WILLIAMSON MARSHALL I) [A] 1* abstract *; | [A]US3348738 (HERTLEIN RONALD G) [A] 1 * figure -; claim 1 *; | [A]US4040389 (WALTERS JAMES H) [A] 1,9,14,18,22,32,35 * abstract *; | [A]GB2082540 (MID ANGLIA PROJECT ENGINEERING) [A] 1,9,14,18,22,32,35 * abstract *; | [A]US4527716 (HAAS LOUIS M [US], et al); | [A]US5405053 (ZUBLIN CASPER W [US]) [A] 1,9,14,18,22,32,35 * abstract *; | [A]DE20113798U (WELLPAPPENWERK BRUCHSAL GMBH & [DE]) [A] 1 * abstract * |