EP1754190 - METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR PROVIDING NETWORK BASED TARGET ADVERTISING AND ENCAPSULATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.05.2010 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.05.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.06.2010 [2010/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dizpersion Group, L.L.C. 1603 Orrington Avenue Suite 2000 Evanston IL 60201 / US | [2007/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NICHOLAS, Frank C. 1583 Monterey Drive Glenview IL 60035 / US | 02 /
CARSWELL, Ian B. 3416 North Southport Avenue Chicago IL 60657 / US | 03 /
HLETKO, Paul M. 711 Custer Avenue Evanston IL 60202 / US | [2007/08] | Representative(s) | Franks, Robert Benjamin Franks & Co Limited 15 Jessops Riverside Brightside Lane Sheffield S9 2RX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2007/08] | Franks, Robert Benjamin Franks & Co. 15, Jessops Riverside Brightside Lane Sheffield S9 2RX / GB | Application number, filing date | 05754203.7 | 20.05.2005 | [2007/08] | WO2005US17749 | Priority number, date | US20040573219P | 21.05.2004 Original published format: US 573219 P | [2007/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2005114525 | Date: | 01.12.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/48] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1754190 | Date: | 21.02.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.12.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 28.09.2006 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.03.2009 | Classification | IPC: | G06Q30/00, G07G1/14 | [2007/08] | CPC: |
G06Q30/02 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/08] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM ZUR BEREITSTELLUNG VON NETZBASIERTER ZIELWERBUNG UND VERKAPSELUNG | [2007/08] | English: | METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR PROVIDING NETWORK BASED TARGET ADVERTISING AND ENCAPSULATION | [2007/08] | French: | METHODE ET SYSTEME POUR FOURNIR DES PUBLICITES ET UNE ENCAPSULATION CIBLES FONDEES SUR UN RESEAU | [2007/08] | Entry into regional phase | 26.10.2006 | National basic fee paid | 26.10.2006 | Search fee paid | 26.10.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.10.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.11.2005 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 26.10.2006 | Examination requested [2007/08] | 01.12.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/25] | 21.01.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2010/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2009 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5933811 (ANGLES PAUL D [US], et al) [X] 1-20 * column 6, line 59 - line 65 * * column 7, line 43 - column 8, line 67 * * column 21, line 33 - column 22, line 65 * * figures 1,9 *; | [X]WO9957660 (IWEB LTD [IL], et al) [X] 1-20 * abstract * * page 6, line 11 - page 12, line 18 * * figure 2 *; | [X]WO0029969 (SUN MICROSYSTEMS INC [US]) [X] 1-20 * page 8, line 11 - page 9, line 11 * * page 15, line 24 - page 24, line 2 ** figure 3 *; | [X]EP1271365 (GAVOA LTD [GB]) [X] 1-20 * abstract * * paragraph [0017] - paragraph [0035] * * paragraph [0041] - paragraph [0048] * | International search | [X]US5848396 ; | [X]US5948061 |