EP1766973 - MEDIA USAGE MONITORING AND MEASUREMENT SYSTEM AND METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 04.11.2022 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.11.2022 | Refusal of application | published on 07.12.2022 [2022/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Anonymous Media, LLC 72 East 3rd Street, Suite 1B New York, NY 10003-0206 / US | [2007/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
STEUER, Jonathan S. Suite 2B, 72 East 3rd Street New York, NY 10003-0206 / US | 02 /
OTTO, Christopher W. 68802 Lyra Street Fremont, CA 94539 / US | [2007/13] | Representative(s) | J A Kemp LLP 80 Turnmill Street London EC1M 5QU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2007/13] | Smith, Samuel Leonard J.A. Kemp & Co., 14 South Square, Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 05755114.5 | 27.05.2005 | [2007/13] | WO2005US18934 | Priority number, date | US20040574836P | 27.05.2004 Original published format: US 574836 P | US20050139330 | 26.05.2005 Original published format: US 139330 | [2007/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2005119651 | Date: | 15.12.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/50] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1766973 | Date: | 28.03.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.12.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 28.12.2006 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.10.2013 | Classification | IPC: | H04N7/16, H04N9/00, H04N7/173, H04H60/37, // H04H60/33 | [2013/45] | CPC: |
H04H60/37 (EP,US);
G06Q30/0246 (US);
H04L65/611 (US);
H04L65/765 (US);
H04L67/535 (US);
H04H60/33 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2007/13] | H04N7/16, H04N9/00, H04N7/173 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/13] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MEDIA-BENUTZUNGSÜBERWACHUNG UND MESSSYSTEM UND VERFAHREN | [2007/13] | English: | MEDIA USAGE MONITORING AND MEASUREMENT SYSTEM AND METHOD | [2007/13] | French: | SYSTEME ET PROCEDE POUR CONTROLE ET EVALUATION D'UTILISATION DE MEDIAS | [2007/13] | Entry into regional phase | 22.12.2006 | National basic fee paid | 22.12.2006 | Search fee paid | 22.12.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.12.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.12.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.12.2006 | Examination requested [2007/13] | 01.08.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.02.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.05.2017 | Date of oral proceedings | 11.07.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2022/49] | 11.07.2017 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 17.10.2022 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2022/49] | Appeal following examination | 01.09.2017 | Appeal received No. T2550/17 | 09.11.2017 | Statement of grounds filed | 17.10.2022 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the applicant withdrawn | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 01.08.2014 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.05.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 03.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.05.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 31.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 25.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 29.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 25.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 25.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 10.05.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 08.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 26.05.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 16 | 26.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 17 | 26.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 18 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2010 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   23.11.2010 | 31.05.2011 | 07   M06   Fee paid on   03.11.2011 | 31.05.2014 | 10   M06   Fee paid on   25.11.2014 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2003135623 (SCHREMPP JAMES B [US], et al) [X] 1,10,11 * paragraph [0020] - paragraph [0095] *[I] 2-9,12,13; | [XI]US2004034441 (EATON MALCOLM [US], et al) [X] 1,10,11 * paragraph [0006] - paragraph [0061] * [I] 2-9,12,13 | International search | [Y]US5945988 (WILLIAMS CHRISTOPHER D [US], et al); | [Y]US2002010919 (LU DAOZHENG [US], et al) | by applicant | US2009003441 |