EP1759201 - SYSTEM FOR MONITORING PHYSIOLOGICAL CHARACTERISTICS ACCORDING TO THE USER BIOLOGICAL STATE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.08.2011 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Medtronic MiniMed, Inc. 18000 Devonshire Street Northridge, CA 91325-1219 / US | [2007/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SAIDARA, Frank 2160 Century Park East, 1503 Los Angeles, CA 90067 / US | 02 /
MASTROTOTARO, John, Joseph 10642 Lindbrook Drive Los Angeles, CA 90024 / US | 03 /
TOLLE, Charles, Vallet 7001 Aldea Van Nuys, CA 91406 / US | 04 /
MUELLER, John, C., Jr. 419 Canyon Crest Drive Simi Valley, CA 93065 / US | 05 /
SANDERS, Jeff, B. 11920 Silver Crest Street Moorpark, CA 93021 / US | 06 /
NIELSEN, Edward, S. 28306 Bryce Drive Castaic, CA 91384 / US | [2007/17] |
Former [2007/10] | 01 /
SAIDARA, Frank 2170 Century Park East, 1407 Los Angeles, CA 90067 / US | ||
02 /
MASTROTOTARO, John, Joseph 10642 Lindbrook Drive Los Angeles, CA 90024 / US | |||
03 /
TOLLE, Charles, Vallet 7001 Aldea Van Nuys, CA 91406 / US | |||
04 /
MUELLER, John, C., Jr. 419 Canyon Crest Drive Simi Valley, CA 93065 / US | |||
05 /
SANDERS, Jeff, B. 11920 Silver Crest Street Moorpark, CA 93021 / US | |||
06 /
NIELSEN, Edward, S. 28306 Bryce Drive Castaic, CA 91384 / US | Representative(s) | Ruschke, Hans Edvard Ruschke Madgwick Seide & Kollegen Patentanwälte Patent Attorney (UK) PartG mbB Postfach 86 06 29 81633 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/36] | Ruschke, Hans Edvard RUSCHKE HARTMANN MADGWICK & SEIDE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Postfach 86 06 29 81633 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/10] | Ruschke, Hans Edvard RUSCHKE HARTMANN MADGWICK & SEIDE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Postfach 86 06 29 81633 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05755120.2 | 20.05.2005 | [2007/10] | WO2005US19106 | Priority number, date | US20040860114 | 03.06.2004 Original published format: US 860114 | [2007/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2005121785 | Date: | 22.12.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/51] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1759201 | Date: | 07.03.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.12.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1759201 | Date: | 13.10.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.04.2006 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/487 | [2007/10] | CPC: |
A61B5/14532 (EP);
A61B5/1495 (EP);
A61B5/7275 (EP);
G01N33/48792 (EP);
G16H40/63 (EP);
G16H50/20 (EP);
G16H50/30 (EP);
A61B2560/0252 (EP);
A61B2560/045 (EP);
A61B5/0002 (EP);
A61B5/14542 (EP);
A61B5/1468 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/10] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SYSTEM ZUR ÜBERWACHUNG PHYSIOLOGISCHER EIGENSCHAFTEN GEMÄSS DEM BIOLOGISCHEN ZUSTAND DES ANWENDERS | [2007/10] | English: | SYSTEM FOR MONITORING PHYSIOLOGICAL CHARACTERISTICS ACCORDING TO THE USER BIOLOGICAL STATE | [2007/10] | French: | SYSTEME DE SURVEILLANCE DE CARACTERISTIQUES PHYSIOLOGIQUES | [2007/10] | Entry into regional phase | 08.12.2006 | National basic fee paid | 08.12.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.12.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.12.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.12.2006 | Examination requested [2007/10] | 15.04.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.10.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.04.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.08.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 27.08.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP10177011.3 / EP2256494 | EP10178251.4 / EP2259057 | EP10178254.8 / EP2256495 | Opposition(s) | 14.07.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/38] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 04.11.2009 | Request for further processing filed | 04.11.2009 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 13.10.2010 | BE | 13.10.2010 | CY | 13.10.2010 | CZ | 13.10.2010 | DK | 13.10.2010 | EE | 13.10.2010 | FI | 13.10.2010 | HU | 13.10.2010 | IT | 13.10.2010 | LT | 13.10.2010 | NL | 13.10.2010 | PL | 13.10.2010 | RO | 13.10.2010 | SE | 13.10.2010 | SI | 13.10.2010 | SK | 13.10.2010 | TR | 13.10.2010 | BG | 13.01.2011 | GR | 14.01.2011 | ES | 24.01.2011 | IS | 13.02.2011 | PT | 14.02.2011 | IE | 20.05.2011 | LU | 20.05.2011 | CH | 31.05.2011 | LI | 31.05.2011 | MC | 31.05.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | AT | 13.10.2010 | |
BE | 13.10.2010 | ||
CY | 13.10.2010 | ||
CZ | 13.10.2010 | ||
DK | 13.10.2010 | ||
EE | 13.10.2010 | ||
FI | 13.10.2010 | ||
IT | 13.10.2010 | ||
LT | 13.10.2010 | ||
NL | 13.10.2010 | ||
PL | 13.10.2010 | ||
RO | 13.10.2010 | ||
SE | 13.10.2010 | ||
SI | 13.10.2010 | ||
SK | 13.10.2010 | ||
TR | 13.10.2010 | ||
BG | 13.01.2011 | ||
GR | 14.01.2011 | ||
ES | 24.01.2011 | ||
IS | 13.02.2011 | ||
PT | 14.02.2011 | ||
IE | 20.05.2011 | ||
LU | 20.05.2011 | ||
CH | 31.05.2011 | ||
LI | 31.05.2011 | ||
MC | 31.05.2011 | ||
Former [2013/26] | AT | 13.10.2010 | |
BE | 13.10.2010 | ||
CY | 13.10.2010 | ||
CZ | 13.10.2010 | ||
DK | 13.10.2010 | ||
EE | 13.10.2010 | ||
FI | 13.10.2010 | ||
IT | 13.10.2010 | ||
LT | 13.10.2010 | ||
NL | 13.10.2010 | ||
PL | 13.10.2010 | ||
RO | 13.10.2010 | ||
SE | 13.10.2010 | ||
SI | 13.10.2010 | ||
SK | 13.10.2010 | ||
BG | 13.01.2011 | ||
GR | 14.01.2011 | ||
ES | 24.01.2011 | ||
IS | 13.02.2011 | ||
PT | 14.02.2011 | ||
IE | 20.05.2011 | ||
LU | 20.05.2011 | ||
CH | 31.05.2011 | ||
LI | 31.05.2011 | ||
MC | 31.05.2011 | ||
Former [2013/25] | AT | 13.10.2010 | |
BE | 13.10.2010 | ||
CZ | 13.10.2010 | ||
DK | 13.10.2010 | ||
EE | 13.10.2010 | ||
FI | 13.10.2010 | ||
IT | 13.10.2010 | ||
LT | 13.10.2010 | ||
NL | 13.10.2010 | ||
PL | 13.10.2010 | ||
RO | 13.10.2010 | ||
SE | 13.10.2010 | ||
SI | 13.10.2010 | ||
SK | 13.10.2010 | ||
BG | 13.01.2011 | ||
GR | 14.01.2011 | ||
ES | 24.01.2011 | ||
IS | 13.02.2011 | ||
PT | 14.02.2011 | ||
IE | 20.05.2011 | ||
LU | 20.05.2011 | ||
CH | 31.05.2011 | ||
LI | 31.05.2011 | ||
MC | 31.05.2011 | ||
Former [2012/20] | AT | 13.10.2010 | |
BE | 13.10.2010 | ||
CZ | 13.10.2010 | ||
DK | 13.10.2010 | ||
EE | 13.10.2010 | ||
FI | 13.10.2010 | ||
IT | 13.10.2010 | ||
LT | 13.10.2010 | ||
NL | 13.10.2010 | ||
PL | 13.10.2010 | ||
RO | 13.10.2010 | ||
SE | 13.10.2010 | ||
SI | 13.10.2010 | ||
SK | 13.10.2010 | ||
BG | 13.01.2011 | ||
GR | 14.01.2011 | ||
ES | 24.01.2011 | ||
IS | 13.02.2011 | ||
PT | 14.02.2011 | ||
IE | 20.05.2011 | ||
CH | 31.05.2011 | ||
LI | 31.05.2011 | ||
MC | 31.05.2011 | ||
Former [2012/07] | AT | 13.10.2010 | |
BE | 13.10.2010 | ||
CZ | 13.10.2010 | ||
DK | 13.10.2010 | ||
EE | 13.10.2010 | ||
FI | 13.10.2010 | ||
IT | 13.10.2010 | ||
LT | 13.10.2010 | ||
NL | 13.10.2010 | ||
PL | 13.10.2010 | ||
RO | 13.10.2010 | ||
SE | 13.10.2010 | ||
SI | 13.10.2010 | ||
SK | 13.10.2010 | ||
BG | 13.01.2011 | ||
GR | 14.01.2011 | ||
ES | 24.01.2011 | ||
IS | 13.02.2011 | ||
PT | 14.02.2011 | ||
CH | 31.05.2011 | ||
LI | 31.05.2011 | ||
MC | 31.05.2011 | ||
Former [2012/05] | AT | 13.10.2010 | |
BE | 13.10.2010 | ||
CZ | 13.10.2010 | ||
DK | 13.10.2010 | ||
EE | 13.10.2010 | ||
FI | 13.10.2010 | ||
IT | 13.10.2010 | ||
LT | 13.10.2010 | ||
NL | 13.10.2010 | ||
PL | 13.10.2010 | ||
RO | 13.10.2010 | ||
SE | 13.10.2010 | ||
SI | 13.10.2010 | ||
SK | 13.10.2010 | ||
BG | 13.01.2011 | ||
GR | 14.01.2011 | ||
ES | 24.01.2011 | ||
IS | 13.02.2011 | ||
PT | 14.02.2011 | ||
MC | 31.05.2011 | ||
Former [2012/03] | AT | 13.10.2010 | |
BE | 13.10.2010 | ||
CZ | 13.10.2010 | ||
DK | 13.10.2010 | ||
EE | 13.10.2010 | ||
FI | 13.10.2010 | ||
IT | 13.10.2010 | ||
LT | 13.10.2010 | ||
NL | 13.10.2010 | ||
PL | 13.10.2010 | ||
RO | 13.10.2010 | ||
SE | 13.10.2010 | ||
SI | 13.10.2010 | ||
SK | 13.10.2010 | ||
BG | 13.01.2011 | ||
GR | 14.01.2011 | ||
ES | 24.01.2011 | ||
IS | 13.02.2011 | ||
PT | 14.02.2011 | ||
Former [2011/38] | AT | 13.10.2010 | |
BE | 13.10.2010 | ||
CZ | 13.10.2010 | ||
DK | 13.10.2010 | ||
EE | 13.10.2010 | ||
FI | 13.10.2010 | ||
LT | 13.10.2010 | ||
NL | 13.10.2010 | ||
PL | 13.10.2010 | ||
RO | 13.10.2010 | ||
SE | 13.10.2010 | ||
SI | 13.10.2010 | ||
SK | 13.10.2010 | ||
BG | 13.01.2011 | ||
GR | 14.01.2011 | ||
ES | 24.01.2011 | ||
IS | 13.02.2011 | ||
PT | 14.02.2011 | ||
Former [2011/35] | AT | 13.10.2010 | |
BE | 13.10.2010 | ||
CZ | 13.10.2010 | ||
EE | 13.10.2010 | ||
FI | 13.10.2010 | ||
LT | 13.10.2010 | ||
NL | 13.10.2010 | ||
SE | 13.10.2010 | ||
SI | 13.10.2010 | ||
BG | 13.01.2011 | ||
GR | 14.01.2011 | ||
ES | 24.01.2011 | ||
IS | 13.02.2011 | ||
PT | 14.02.2011 | ||
Former [2011/32] | AT | 13.10.2010 | |
BE | 13.10.2010 | ||
FI | 13.10.2010 | ||
LT | 13.10.2010 | ||
NL | 13.10.2010 | ||
SE | 13.10.2010 | ||
SI | 13.10.2010 | ||
BG | 13.01.2011 | ||
GR | 14.01.2011 | ||
ES | 24.01.2011 | ||
IS | 13.02.2011 | ||
PT | 14.02.2011 | ||
Former [2011/29] | AT | 13.10.2010 | |
BE | 13.10.2010 | ||
FI | 13.10.2010 | ||
LT | 13.10.2010 | ||
NL | 13.10.2010 | ||
SE | 13.10.2010 | ||
SI | 13.10.2010 | ||
BG | 13.01.2011 | ||
GR | 14.01.2011 | ||
IS | 13.02.2011 | ||
PT | 14.02.2011 | ||
Former [2011/23] | FI | 13.10.2010 | |
LT | 13.10.2010 | ||
IS | 13.02.2011 | ||
Former [2011/19] | LT | 13.10.2010 | Cited in | International search | [XY]US2003187336 (ODAGIRI HIROSHI [JP], et al) [X] 1,25-55 * paragraphs [0009] , [0024] - [0026] - [0032]; figures 3,4,10A,10B * [Y] 2-15; | [XY]US2003208113 (MAULT JAMES R [US], et al) [X] 25-55 * paragraphs [0069] , [0075] , [0093] , [0143]; figures 1,7B,15 * [Y] 1-15; | [YA]EP1127544 (POLAR ELECTRO OY [FI]) [Y] 1-15 * paragraphs [0004] , [0006] , [0026] , [0027] , [0033] , [0034]; figures 2,4c * [A] 16-62; | [XY]US2003125612 (FOX JAMES KELLY [US], et al) [X] 25-62 * paragraphs [0012] - [0014] - [0016] , [0043] - [0049] - [0069] - [0071] - [0086]; figures 1,2,4 * [Y] 2-15; | [A]WO0244865 (DIGITAL ANGEL CORP [US], et al) [A] 1-62 * paragraphs [0195] , [0196] , [0244] *; | [A]US2003100040 (BONNECAZE ROGER T [US], et al) [A] 1-62 * paragraph [0089]; figure 1 * |