EP1758890 - 7-PYRAZOLYLBENZAZEPINES HAVING AFFINITY FOR D3 RECEPTOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.05.2014 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.05.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.06.2014 [2014/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Glaxo Group Limited 980 Great West Road Brentford, Middlesex TW8 9GS / GB | [2013/18] |
Former [2007/10] | For all designated states GLAXO GROUP LIMITED Glaxo Wellcome House, Berkeley Avenue Greenford, Middlesex UB6 ONN / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HAMPRECHT, Dieter, GlaxoSmithKline SpA Via Alessandro Fleming 2 I-37135 Verona / IT | 02 /
MICHELI, Fabrizio, GlaxoSmithKline SpA Via Alessandro Fleming 2 I-37135 Verona / IT | 03 /
TARSI, Luca, GlaxoSmithKline SpA Via Alessandro Fleming 2 I-37135 Verona / IT | 04 /
TEDESCO, Giovanna, GlaxoSmithKline SpA Via Alessandro Fleming 2 I-37135 Verona / IT | [2007/10] | Representative(s) | Crawley, Karen Anne, et al GlaxoSmithKline Global Patents (CN925.1) 980 Great West Road Brentford, Middlesex TW8 9GS / GB | [2014/20] |
Former [2007/10] | Dolton, Peter Irving Ernest GlaxoSmithKline Corporate Intellectual Property (CN9.25.1) 980 Great West Road Brentford, Middlesex TW8 9GS / GB | Application number, filing date | 05755576.5 | 17.06.2005 | [2007/10] | WO2005EP06639 | Priority number, date | GB20040013879 | 21.06.2004 Original published format: GB 0413879 | [2007/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005123717 | Date: | 29.12.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1758890 | Date: | 07.03.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.12.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.12.2005 | Classification | IPC: | C07D401/14, C07D403/14, C07D413/14, A61K31/55, A61P25/00 | [2007/10] | CPC: |
C07D403/14 (EP,US);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P25/30 (EP);
A61P25/36 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
C07D401/14 (EP,US);
C07D413/14 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/10] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | 07.12.2006 | LV | 07.12.2006 | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | 7-PYRAZOLYLBENZAZEPINE MIT AFFINITÄT FÜR DEN D3-REZEPTOR | [2007/10] | English: | 7-PYRAZOLYLBENZAZEPINES HAVING AFFINITY FOR D3 RECEPTOR | [2007/10] | French: | 7-PYRAZOLYLBENZAZEPINES PRESENTANT UNE AFFINITE POUR LE RECEPTEUR D3 | [2007/10] | Entry into regional phase | 07.12.2006 | National basic fee paid | 07.12.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.12.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.12.2006 | Examination requested [2007/10] | 09.06.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.11.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.02.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.06.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.07.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.11.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/23] | 10.01.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2014/23] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 09.06.2008 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 07.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 31.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]WO0042036 (BASF AG [DE], et al) [Y] 1-17 * claims 1-11 *; | [DY]WO0240471 (SMITHKLINE BEECHAM PLC [GB], et al) [DY] 1-17 * claims 1-23 *; | [A] - N. E. AUSTIN ET AL., "Novel 2,3,4,5-Tetrahydro-1H-3-benzazepines with High Affinity and Selectivity for the Dopamine D3 Receptor", BIOORG. MED. CHEM. LETT., (20001120), vol. 10, no. 22, pages 2553 - 2555, XP004224262 [A] 1-17 * tables 1,2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0960-894X(00)00505-9 | by applicant | - SCHWARTZ ET AL., BRAIN RES. REVIEWS, (1998), vol. 26, pages 236 - 242 | - LEVANT, PHARMACOL. REV., (1997), vol. 49, pages 231 - 252 |