EP1774998 - GAME MACHINE AND GAME SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.10.2014 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.10.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.11.2014 [2014/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Konami Digital Entertainment Co., Ltd. 7-2, Akasaka 9-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 107-8324 / JP | [2008/16] |
Former [2007/16] | For all designated states Konami Digital Entertainment Co., Ltd. 10-1, Roppongi 6 chome Minato-ku Tokyo 106-6114 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TAKAHASHI, Kazuya c/o Konami Digital Ent. Co., Ltd. Tokyo 106-6114 / JP | [2014/04] |
Former [2008/15] | 01 /
TAKAHASHI, Kazuya, c/o Konami Digital Ent. Co, Ltd 7-2 Akasaka 9-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 107-8324 / JP | ||
Former [2007/27] | 01 /
TAKAHASHI, Kazuya, c/o Konami Digital Ent. Co, Ltd 10-1, Roppongi 6-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 106-6114 / JP | ||
Former [2007/16] | 01 /
TAKAHASHI, Kazuya, c/o Konami Digital Ent. Co, Ltd 10-1, Roppongi 6-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 100-6114 / JP | Representative(s) | Winter, Brandl - Partnerschaft mbB Alois-Steinecker-Straße 22 85354 Freising / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/16] | Winter, Brandl, Fürniss, Hübner Röss, Kaiser, Polte Partnerschaft Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Alois-Steinecker-Strasse 22 85354 Freising / DE | Application number, filing date | 05755730.8 | 30.06.2005 | [2007/16] | WO2005JP12053 | Priority number, date | JP20040227903 | 04.08.2004 Original published format: JP 2004227903 | [2007/41] |
Former [2007/27] | JP20040027903 | 04.08.2004 | |
Former [2007/16] | JP20040277903 | 04.08.2004 | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006013686 | Date: | 09.02.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1774998 | Date: | 18.04.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.02.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 09.02.2006 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.08.2008 | Classification | IPC: | A63F13/12, A63F13/10 | [2007/16] | CPC: |
A63F13/12 (EP);
A63F13/35 (KR,US);
A63F13/795 (KR,US);
A63F13/30 (EP);
A63F2300/408 (EP,KR,US);
A63F2300/5566 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/16] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SPIEL-MASCHINE UND SPIEL-SYSTEM | [2007/16] | English: | GAME MACHINE AND GAME SYSTEM | [2007/16] | French: | MACHINE DE JEU ET SYSTÈME DE JEU | [2007/16] | Entry into regional phase | 30.01.2007 | Translation filed | 30.01.2007 | National basic fee paid | 30.01.2007 | Search fee paid | 30.01.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.01.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.01.2007 | Examination requested [2007/16] | 14.08.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.12.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.10.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M01) | 21.11.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.01.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.05.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/48] | 02.07.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2014/48] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 14.08.2009 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 25.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2014 | 10   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO9530465 (CATAPULT ENTERTAINMENT INC [US]) [X] 1-10* page 7, line 1 - line 12 *; | [X]US6203433 (KUME HIROSHI [JP]) [X] 1-10 * column 9, line 21 - line 38 * * column 9, line 48 - line 53 * * figures 1,2,4 * | International search | [A]JP2000051518 (NAMCO LTD); | [A]JP2003000953 (TAITO CORP); | [A]JP2004154365 (KONAMI CO LTD) |