EP1900152 - SYSTEM COMPRISING A MASTER UNIT AND A PLURALITY OF SLAVE UNITS FOR OPERATING A PLURALITY OF DEVICES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.10.2009 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.09.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, TR | published on 02.11.2011 [2011/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states VKR Holding A/S Breeltevej 18 2970 Hørsholm / DK | [2008/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KJÆRSGAARD, Preben Thit Jensens Vej 52 DK-7430 Ikast / DK | 02 /
BYBERG, Henrik, Raun Kløvervej 18 DK-3450 Allerød / DK | 03 /
EBBE, Ulrik, Vagn Grevevej 25 DK-2670 Greve / DK | 04 /
LINDBY, Steen Ålholmparken 133 DK-3400 Hillerød / DK | [2008/12] | Representative(s) | Olesen, Kaj, et al Patentgruppen A/S Arosgaarden Aaboulevarden 31 8000 Aarhus C / DK | [N/P] |
Former [2008/12] | Olesen, Kaj, et al Patentgruppen, Arosgaarden, Aaboulevarden 31 8000 Aarhus C / DK | Application number, filing date | 05756453.6 | 04.07.2005 | [2008/12] | WO2005DK00464 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007003187 | Date: | 11.01.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1900152 | Date: | 19.03.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.01.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1900152 | Date: | 03.12.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.01.2007 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/28, G08C17/02, H04L12/24 | [2008/12] | CPC: |
H04L41/0893 (EP,KR,US);
H04W84/20 (KR);
G08C17/02 (EP,US);
H04L12/2803 (EP,US);
H04L12/282 (EP,US);
H04W8/26 (EP,KR,US);
G05B2219/2642 (EP,US);
G08C2201/10 (EP,US);
H04L2012/2841 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/12] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SYSTEM MIT EINER MASTER-EINHEIT UND MEHREREN SLAVE-EINHEITEN ZUM BETRIEB MEHRERER EINRICHTUNGEN | [2008/12] | English: | SYSTEM COMPRISING A MASTER UNIT AND A PLURALITY OF SLAVE UNITS FOR OPERATING A PLURALITY OF DEVICES | [2008/12] | French: | SYSTEME COMPRENANT UNE UNITE MAITRE ET UNE PLURALITE D UNITES ESCLAVES POUR ACTIONNER UNE PLURALITE DE DISPOSITIFS | [2008/12] | Entry into regional phase | 13.11.2007 | National basic fee paid | 13.11.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.11.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.05.2007 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 13.11.2007 | Examination requested [2008/12] | 24.06.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.10.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 22.10.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP08020882.0 / EP2075954 | Opposition(s) | 04.09.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 03.12.2008 | BE | 03.12.2008 | CY | 03.12.2008 | CZ | 03.12.2008 | EE | 03.12.2008 | FI | 03.12.2008 | LT | 03.12.2008 | LV | 03.12.2008 | RO | 03.12.2008 | SI | 03.12.2008 | SK | 03.12.2008 | TR | 03.12.2008 | BG | 03.03.2009 | SE | 03.03.2009 | GR | 04.03.2009 | ES | 14.03.2009 | IS | 03.04.2009 | PT | 04.05.2009 | HU | 04.06.2009 | IE | 04.07.2009 | LU | 04.07.2009 | CH | 31.07.2009 | LI | 31.07.2009 | MC | 31.07.2009 | [2011/43] |
Former [2011/32] | AT | 03.12.2008 | |
BE | 03.12.2008 | ||
CZ | 03.12.2008 | ||
EE | 03.12.2008 | ||
FI | 03.12.2008 | ||
LT | 03.12.2008 | ||
LV | 03.12.2008 | ||
RO | 03.12.2008 | ||
SI | 03.12.2008 | ||
SK | 03.12.2008 | ||
BG | 03.03.2009 | ||
SE | 03.03.2009 | ||
GR | 04.03.2009 | ||
ES | 14.03.2009 | ||
IS | 03.04.2009 | ||
PT | 04.05.2009 | ||
HU | 04.06.2009 | ||
IE | 04.07.2009 | ||
LU | 04.07.2009 | ||
CH | 31.07.2009 | ||
LI | 31.07.2009 | ||
MC | 31.07.2009 | ||
Former [2011/22] | AT | 03.12.2008 | |
BE | 03.12.2008 | ||
CZ | 03.12.2008 | ||
EE | 03.12.2008 | ||
FI | 03.12.2008 | ||
LT | 03.12.2008 | ||
LV | 03.12.2008 | ||
RO | 03.12.2008 | ||
SI | 03.12.2008 | ||
SK | 03.12.2008 | ||
BG | 03.03.2009 | ||
SE | 03.03.2009 | ||
GR | 04.03.2009 | ||
ES | 14.03.2009 | ||
IS | 03.04.2009 | ||
PT | 04.05.2009 | ||
IE | 04.07.2009 | ||
LU | 04.07.2009 | ||
CH | 31.07.2009 | ||
LI | 31.07.2009 | ||
MC | 31.07.2009 | ||
Former [2011/01] | AT | 03.12.2008 | |
BE | 03.12.2008 | ||
CZ | 03.12.2008 | ||
EE | 03.12.2008 | ||
FI | 03.12.2008 | ||
LT | 03.12.2008 | ||
LV | 03.12.2008 | ||
RO | 03.12.2008 | ||
SI | 03.12.2008 | ||
SK | 03.12.2008 | ||
BG | 03.03.2009 | ||
SE | 03.03.2009 | ||
GR | 04.03.2009 | ||
ES | 14.03.2009 | ||
IS | 03.04.2009 | ||
PT | 04.05.2009 | ||
IE | 04.07.2009 | ||
CH | 31.07.2009 | ||
LI | 31.07.2009 | ||
MC | 31.07.2009 | ||
Former [2010/39] | AT | 03.12.2008 | |
BE | 03.12.2008 | ||
CZ | 03.12.2008 | ||
EE | 03.12.2008 | ||
FI | 03.12.2008 | ||
LT | 03.12.2008 | ||
LV | 03.12.2008 | ||
RO | 03.12.2008 | ||
SI | 03.12.2008 | ||
SK | 03.12.2008 | ||
BG | 03.03.2009 | ||
SE | 03.03.2009 | ||
ES | 14.03.2009 | ||
IS | 03.04.2009 | ||
PT | 04.05.2009 | ||
IE | 04.07.2009 | ||
CH | 31.07.2009 | ||
LI | 31.07.2009 | ||
MC | 31.07.2009 | ||
Former [2010/24] | AT | 03.12.2008 | |
BE | 03.12.2008 | ||
CZ | 03.12.2008 | ||
EE | 03.12.2008 | ||
FI | 03.12.2008 | ||
LT | 03.12.2008 | ||
LV | 03.12.2008 | ||
RO | 03.12.2008 | ||
SI | 03.12.2008 | ||
SK | 03.12.2008 | ||
BG | 03.03.2009 | ||
SE | 03.03.2009 | ||
ES | 14.03.2009 | ||
IS | 03.04.2009 | ||
PT | 04.05.2009 | ||
CH | 31.07.2009 | ||
LI | 31.07.2009 | ||
MC | 31.07.2009 | ||
Former [2010/12] | AT | 03.12.2008 | |
BE | 03.12.2008 | ||
CZ | 03.12.2008 | ||
EE | 03.12.2008 | ||
FI | 03.12.2008 | ||
LT | 03.12.2008 | ||
LV | 03.12.2008 | ||
RO | 03.12.2008 | ||
SI | 03.12.2008 | ||
SK | 03.12.2008 | ||
BG | 03.03.2009 | ||
SE | 03.03.2009 | ||
ES | 14.03.2009 | ||
IS | 03.04.2009 | ||
PT | 04.05.2009 | ||
MC | 31.07.2009 | ||
Former [2009/52] | AT | 03.12.2008 | |
BE | 03.12.2008 | ||
CZ | 03.12.2008 | ||
EE | 03.12.2008 | ||
FI | 03.12.2008 | ||
LT | 03.12.2008 | ||
LV | 03.12.2008 | ||
RO | 03.12.2008 | ||
SI | 03.12.2008 | ||
SK | 03.12.2008 | ||
BG | 03.03.2009 | ||
SE | 03.03.2009 | ||
ES | 14.03.2009 | ||
IS | 03.04.2009 | ||
PT | 04.05.2009 | ||
Former [2009/32] | BE | 03.12.2008 | |
FI | 03.12.2008 | ||
LT | 03.12.2008 | ||
LV | 03.12.2008 | ||
SI | 03.12.2008 | ||
ES | 14.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/27] | FI | 03.12.2008 | |
LT | 03.12.2008 | ||
LV | 03.12.2008 | ||
SI | 03.12.2008 | ||
ES | 14.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/21] | LT | 03.12.2008 | |
ES | 14.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/20] | ES | 14.03.2009 | Cited in | International search | [Y]US5187472 (HART EDWARD F [US], et al) [Y] 1-4,11,1-4,11,1-4,11 * column 7, line 3 - column 8, line 54 * * column 7, line 3 - column 8, line 54 * * column 7, line 3 - column 8, line 54 *; | [YA]WO0247038 (VKR HOLDING AS [DK], et al) [Y] 1-4,11,1-4,11,1-4,11 * page 7, lines 4-18 * * page 8, line 26 - page 9, line 2 * * page 10, line 24 - page 11, line 20 * * page 7, lines 4-18 * * page 8, line 26 - page 9, line 2 * * page 10, line 24 - page 11, line 20 * * page 7, lines 4-18 * * page 8, line 26 - page 9, line 2 * * page 10, line 24 - page 11, line 20 * [A] 5,7-17,5,7-17,5,7-17; | [A]US6812852 (CESAR CHRISTIAN LENZ [US]) [A] 1,3,4,11,1,3,4,11,1,3,4,11 * paragraphs [0017] , [0018] * * paragraphs [0017] , [0018] * * paragraphs [0017] , [0018] *; | [A]WO2005041146 (INTELLIGENT ELECTRICS INTELLEC [GB], et al) [A] 6,6,6 * page 17; claim 17 * * page 17; claim 17 ** page 17; claim 17 * |