EP1753361 - DENTAL INSTRUMENTS COMPRISING TITANIUM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2007/08] | DENTAL AND MEDICAL INSTRUMENTS COMPRISING TITANIUM | ||
[2015/50] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.04.2017 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.08.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BG | published on 19.09.2018 [2018/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Gold Standard Instruments, LLC 18010 Continental Drive Brookfield WI 53045 / US | [2016/22] |
Former [2016/17] | For all designated states Gold Standards Instruments, LLC 18010 Continental Drive Brookfield WI 53045 / US | ||
Former [2007/08] | For all designated states Luebke, Neill Hamilton 18010 Continental Drive Brookfield WI 53045-1204 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LUEBKE, Neill Hamilton 18010 Continental Drive Brookfield, WI 53045-1204 / US | [2017/03] |
Former [2016/22] | 01 /
LUEBKE, Neill Hamilton 18010 Continental Drive Brookland, WI 53045-1204 / US | ||
Former [2016/17] | 01 /
Luebke, Neil Hamilton 18010 Continental Drive Brookland WI 53045-1204 / US | ||
Former [2007/08] | 01 /
see applicant ... | Representative(s) | Hartz, Nikolai Wächtershäuser & Hartz Patentanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Weinstrasse 8 80333 München / DE | [2014/42] |
Former [2007/08] | Jones, Ithel Rhys, et al Wynne-Jones, Lainé & James Essex Place 22 Rodney Road Cheltenham, Glos. GL50 1JJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 05756629.1 | 07.06.2005 | [2007/08] | WO2005US19947 | Priority number, date | US20040578091P | 08.06.2004 Original published format: US 578091 P | [2007/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005122942 | Date: | 29.12.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1753361 | Date: | 21.02.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.12.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1753361 | Date: | 01.06.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/22] | Type: | B8 Corrected title page of specification | No.: | EP1753361 | Date: | 29.03.2017 | [2017/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 29.12.2005 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.10.2012 | Classification | IPC: | A61C5/02 | [2007/08] | CPC: |
C22C14/00 (EP,US);
C23C8/24 (US);
A61C5/42 (EP,US);
B21F45/008 (US);
C22F1/004 (EP,US);
C22F1/183 (EP,US);
C23C16/00 (US);
C23C18/1637 (US);
C23C8/30 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2016/22] |
Former [2007/08] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | ZAHNMEDIZINISCHE INSTRUMENTE AUS TITAN | [2015/50] | English: | DENTAL INSTRUMENTS COMPRISING TITANIUM | [2015/50] | French: | INSTRUMENTS DENTAIRES COMPRENANT DU TITANE | [2015/50] |
Former [2007/08] | ZAHNMEDIZINISCHE UND MEDIZINISCHE INSTRUMENTE AUS TITAN | ||
Former [2007/08] | DENTAL AND MEDICAL INSTRUMENTS COMPRISING TITANIUM | ||
Former [2007/08] | INSTRUMENTS DENTAIRES ET MEDICAUX COMPRENANT DU TITANE | Entry into regional phase | 19.12.2006 | National basic fee paid | 19.12.2006 | Search fee paid | 19.12.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.12.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.12.2006 | Examination requested [2007/08] | 24.01.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.07.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.03.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.06.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.11.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.03.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 10.03.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 10.03.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP16164950.4 / EP3058891 | EP19197690.1 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 24.01.2013 | Opposition(s) | 02.03.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.06.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 25.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 30.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 07.06.2005 | AT | 01.06.2016 | BE | 01.06.2016 | BG | 01.06.2016 | CY | 01.06.2016 | CZ | 01.06.2016 | DK | 01.06.2016 | EE | 01.06.2016 | FI | 01.06.2016 | LT | 01.06.2016 | MC | 01.06.2016 | NL | 01.06.2016 | PL | 01.06.2016 | RO | 01.06.2016 | SI | 01.06.2016 | SK | 01.06.2016 | TR | 01.06.2016 | IE | 07.06.2016 | LU | 07.06.2016 | GR | 02.09.2016 | IS | 01.10.2016 | PT | 03.10.2016 | [2018/38] |
Former [2018/29] | HU | 07.06.2005 | |
AT | 01.06.2016 | ||
BE | 01.06.2016 | ||
CY | 01.06.2016 | ||
CZ | 01.06.2016 | ||
DK | 01.06.2016 | ||
EE | 01.06.2016 | ||
FI | 01.06.2016 | ||
LT | 01.06.2016 | ||
MC | 01.06.2016 | ||
NL | 01.06.2016 | ||
PL | 01.06.2016 | ||
RO | 01.06.2016 | ||
SI | 01.06.2016 | ||
SK | 01.06.2016 | ||
TR | 01.06.2016 | ||
IE | 07.06.2016 | ||
LU | 07.06.2016 | ||
GR | 02.09.2016 | ||
IS | 01.10.2016 | ||
PT | 03.10.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 07.06.2005 | |
AT | 01.06.2016 | ||
BE | 01.06.2016 | ||
CY | 01.06.2016 | ||
CZ | 01.06.2016 | ||
DK | 01.06.2016 | ||
EE | 01.06.2016 | ||
FI | 01.06.2016 | ||
LT | 01.06.2016 | ||
MC | 01.06.2016 | ||
NL | 01.06.2016 | ||
PL | 01.06.2016 | ||
RO | 01.06.2016 | ||
SI | 01.06.2016 | ||
SK | 01.06.2016 | ||
IE | 07.06.2016 | ||
GR | 02.09.2016 | ||
IS | 01.10.2016 | ||
PT | 03.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/37] | AT | 01.06.2016 | |
BE | 01.06.2016 | ||
CZ | 01.06.2016 | ||
DK | 01.06.2016 | ||
EE | 01.06.2016 | ||
FI | 01.06.2016 | ||
LT | 01.06.2016 | ||
MC | 01.06.2016 | ||
NL | 01.06.2016 | ||
PL | 01.06.2016 | ||
RO | 01.06.2016 | ||
SI | 01.06.2016 | ||
SK | 01.06.2016 | ||
IE | 07.06.2016 | ||
GR | 02.09.2016 | ||
IS | 01.10.2016 | ||
PT | 03.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/17] | AT | 01.06.2016 | |
BE | 01.06.2016 | ||
CZ | 01.06.2016 | ||
EE | 01.06.2016 | ||
FI | 01.06.2016 | ||
LT | 01.06.2016 | ||
MC | 01.06.2016 | ||
NL | 01.06.2016 | ||
PL | 01.06.2016 | ||
RO | 01.06.2016 | ||
SK | 01.06.2016 | ||
GR | 02.09.2016 | ||
IS | 01.10.2016 | ||
PT | 03.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/11] | AT | 01.06.2016 | |
BE | 01.06.2016 | ||
CZ | 01.06.2016 | ||
EE | 01.06.2016 | ||
FI | 01.06.2016 | ||
LT | 01.06.2016 | ||
NL | 01.06.2016 | ||
PL | 01.06.2016 | ||
RO | 01.06.2016 | ||
SK | 01.06.2016 | ||
GR | 02.09.2016 | ||
IS | 01.10.2016 | ||
PT | 03.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | BE | 01.06.2016 | |
CZ | 01.06.2016 | ||
EE | 01.06.2016 | ||
FI | 01.06.2016 | ||
LT | 01.06.2016 | ||
NL | 01.06.2016 | ||
PL | 01.06.2016 | ||
RO | 01.06.2016 | ||
SK | 01.06.2016 | ||
GR | 02.09.2016 | ||
IS | 01.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/09] | CZ | 01.06.2016 | |
EE | 01.06.2016 | ||
FI | 01.06.2016 | ||
LT | 01.06.2016 | ||
NL | 01.06.2016 | ||
RO | 01.06.2016 | ||
BE | 30.06.2016 | ||
GR | 02.09.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | FI | 01.06.2016 | |
LT | 01.06.2016 | ||
NL | 01.06.2016 | ||
BE | 30.06.2016 | ||
GR | 02.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/52] | FI | 01.06.2016 | |
LT | 01.06.2016 | ||
NL | 01.06.2016 | ||
GR | 02.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | FI | 01.06.2016 | |
LT | 01.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/46] | LT | 01.06.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5380200 (HEATH DEREK E [US], et al) [A] 1,6,7,14 * column 3, lines 46-48 * * column 4, lines 8-24, 2-5; figures 1-3 *; | [A]US5464362 (HEATH DEREK E [US], et al) [A] 1,7-9,13 * column 4, lines 24-28 *; | [A]US5653590 (HEATH DEREK E [US], et al) [A] 1,7-9,13 * column 3, lines 55-59 *; | [XI]US5775902 (MATSUTANI KANJI [JP], et al) [X] 1-6,10-12 * column 5, lines 16-44 * * column 7, lines 32-37 * * figures 1-4 * [I] 7-9,13,14; | [XI]US6431863 (SACHDEVA ROHIT CHAMAN LAL [US], et al) [X] 1-6,10-12 * column 1, line 59 - column 2, line 4 * * column 3, lines 30-38 * * column 4, lines 23-25, 60-63 * [I] 7-9,13,14; | [XP]WO2004100818 (ULTRADENT PRODUCTS INC [US]) [XP] 1,2 * page 7, lines 15-28 ** page 8, line 21 - page 9, line 6 * | International search | [Y]US6422865 (FISCHER DAN E [US]); | [Y]US6428634 (BESSELINK PETRUS A [NL], et al); | [Y]US6431863 (SACHDEVA ROHIT CHAMAN LAL [US], et al) | by applicant | US4197643 | US4892479 | US4952236 | US5156807 | US5232361 | US5264055 | US5358586 | US5464362 | US5775902 | US5947723 | US6132209 | US6258182 | US6315558 | US6431863 |