EP1885735 - MOLECULAR TRANSPORTERS BASED ON SUGAR AND ITS ANALOGUES AND PROCESSES FOR THE PREPARATION THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.06.2016 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.06.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 13.07.2016 [2016/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Postech Foundation San 31, Hyoja-dong Nam-gu Pohang-shi, Kyungsangbuk-do 790-784 / KR | For all designated states Postech Academy-Industry- Foundation San 31 Hyoja-dong, Nam-ku Pohang-city, Kyungsangbuk-do 790-784 / KR | [2015/32] |
Former [2008/07] | For all designated states Postech Foundation San 31, Hyoja-dong Nam-gu Pohang-shi, Kyungsangbuk-do 790-784 / KR | ||
For all designated states Postech Academy-Industry Foundation San 31 Hyoja-dong, Nam-ku Pohang-city, Kyungsangbuk-do 790-784 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHUNG, Sung-Kee Gyosu Apt. 9-201 756 Jigok-dong Nam-gu Pohang-si, Kyungsangbuk-do 790-751 / KR | 02 /
MAITI, Kaustabh Kumar Nakwon Apt. 2-206 Jigok-dong Nam-gu Pohang-si, Kyungsangbuk-do 790-390 / KR | 03 /
LEE, Woo Sirl B02, 2-15, Seokchon-dong, Songpa-gu Seoul 138-842 / KR | 04 /
JEON, Ock-Youm Jangan Town 121-1502 Bundang-dong Bundang-gu Seongnam-si, Kyungki-do 463-907 / KR | 05 /
YU, Seok-Ho Green 2-cha Apt. 215-1303 Jigok-dong Nam-gu Pohang-si, Kyungsangbuk-do 790-752 / KR | [2015/32] |
Former [2008/07] | 01 /
CHUNG, Sung-Kee Gyosu Apt. 9-201, 756 Jigok-dong, Nam-gu Pohang-si, Kyungsangbuk-do 790-751 / KR | ||
02 /
MAITI, Kaustabh Kumar Nakwon Apt. 2-206, Jigok-dong, Nam-gu Pohang-si, Kyungsangbuk-do 790-390 / KR | |||
03 /
LEE, Woo Sirl B02, 2-15, Seokchon-dong, Songpa-gu Seoul 138-842 / KR | |||
04 /
JEON, Ock-Youm Jangan Town 121-1502, Bundang-dong, Bundang-gu Seongnam-si, Kyungki-do 463-907 / KR | |||
05 /
YU, Seok-Ho Green 2-cha Apt. 215-1303, Jigok-dong, Nam-gu Pohang-si, Kyungsangbuk-do 790-752 / KR | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [2015/32] |
Former [2008/07] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05756712.5 | 29.06.2005 | [2008/07] | WO2005KR02040 | Priority number, date | KR20050035410 | 28.04.2005 Original published format: KR 20050035410 | [2008/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006115312 | Date: | 02.11.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1885735 | Date: | 13.02.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.11.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1885735 | Date: | 05.08.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 02.11.2006 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.06.2012 | Classification | IPC: | C07H15/04 | [2008/07] | CPC: |
C07H15/04 (EP,KR,US);
C07H1/00 (KR);
C07H7/02 (KR);
Y02P20/55 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI [2015/32] |
Former [2008/32] | CH, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI | ||
Former [2008/07] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | AUF ZUCKER UND ANALOGA DAVON BASIERENDE MOLEKULARE TRANSPORTER UND VERFAHREN ZU DEREN HERSTELLUNG | [2008/07] | English: | MOLECULAR TRANSPORTERS BASED ON SUGAR AND ITS ANALOGUES AND PROCESSES FOR THE PREPARATION THEREOF | [2008/07] | French: | TRANSPORTEURS MOLECULAIRES A BASE DE SUCRE ET D'ANALOGUES DE CELUI-CI ET PROCEDES DE PREPARATION DE CEUX-CI | [2008/07] | Entry into regional phase | 27.11.2007 | National basic fee paid | 27.11.2007 | Search fee paid | 27.11.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.11.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.11.2007 | Examination requested [2008/07] | 19.09.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.01.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.02.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.06.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 02.06.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 02.06.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 19.09.2012 | Opposition(s) | 09.05.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 26.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GR | 06.11.2015 | [2016/09] | Documents cited: | Search | [A] - ROTHBARD J B ET AL, "ARGININE-RICH MOLECULAR TRANSPORTERS FOR DRUGS: THE ROLE OF BACKBONE AND SIDE CHAIN VARIATIONS ON CELLULAR UPTAKE", CELL-PENETRATING PEPTIDES, XX, XX, (20020101), pages 141 - 160,I, XP001159671 [A] 1-31 | International search | [A]US6495663 (ROTHBARD JONATHAN B [US], et al); | [A]WO7900515 (UNIV BOSTON [US]); | [A]WO9404686 (BIOGEN INC [US], et al); | [A] - PAUL A.W. ET AL., "The design, synthesis, and evaluation of molecules that enable or enhance cellular uptake: Peptoid molecular transporters", PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (2000), vol. 97, pages 13003 - 13008, XP002347555 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.97.24.13003 | [A] - PAWELL S. ET AL., "Tat-Mediated Delivery of Heterologous Proteins into Cells", PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1994), vol. 91, pages 664 - 668, XP002936154 | [A] - BRUGIDOU J. ET AL., "The Retro-inverso From of a Homeobox-Derived Short Peptide Is Rapidly Internalized by Cultured Neurons: A New Basis for an Efficient Intracelluler Delivery System", BIOCHEM. BIOPHYS. RES. COMM., (1995), vol. 214, pages 685 - 693, XP002087116 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1006/bbrc.1995.2340 |