EP1765928 - STABILIZATION OF POLYETHER POLYOL, POLYESTER POLYOL OR POLYURETHANE COMPOSITIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.07.2009 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.09.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, TR | published on 02.11.2011 [2011/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ciba Holding Inc. Klybeckstrasse 141 4057 Basel / CH | [2008/21] |
Former [2007/13] | For all designated states Ciba Specialty Chemicals Holding Inc. Klybeckstrasse 141 4057 Basel / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MÄDER, Dietmar Katharinenstrasse 3 79104 Freiburg / DE | 02 /
ROTA-GRAZIOSI, Pierre 10, rue Reichenstein F-68100 Mulhouse / FR | [2007/13] | Application number, filing date | 05756879.2 | 20.06.2005 | [2007/13] | WO2005EP52843 | Priority number, date | EP20040103062 | 30.06.2004 Original published format: EP 04103062 | EP20040104456 | 15.09.2004 Original published format: EP 04104456 | [2007/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006003092 | Date: | 12.01.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1765928 | Date: | 28.03.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.01.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1765928 | Date: | 24.09.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.01.2006 | Classification | IPC: | C08K5/13, C08L75/04, C08K5/34 | [2007/13] | CPC: |
C08L75/04 (EP,US);
C08G18/42 (KR);
C08K5/16 (KR);
C08K5/20 (EP,US);
C08K5/3435 (EP,US);
C08K5/005 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C08K5/20, C08L75/04 (EP,US);
C08K5/3435, C08L75/04 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/13] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | STABILISIERUNG VON POLYETHERPOLYOL-, POLYESTERPOLYOL- ODER POLYURETHANZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN | [2007/13] | English: | STABILIZATION OF POLYETHER POLYOL, POLYESTER POLYOL OR POLYURETHANE COMPOSITIONS | [2007/13] | French: | STABILISATION DE COMPOSITIONS DE POLYETHER POLYOL, DE POLYESTER POLYOL OU DE POLYURETHANE | [2007/13] | Entry into regional phase | 12.12.2006 | National basic fee paid | 12.12.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.12.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.12.2006 | Examination requested [2007/13] | 25.04.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.08.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.09.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.03.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.05.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.08.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 01.08.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.06.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.05.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 24.09.2008 | CY | 24.09.2008 | CZ | 24.09.2008 | DK | 24.09.2008 | EE | 24.09.2008 | FI | 24.09.2008 | LT | 24.09.2008 | NL | 24.09.2008 | PL | 24.09.2008 | RO | 24.09.2008 | SI | 24.09.2008 | SK | 24.09.2008 | TR | 24.09.2008 | BG | 24.12.2008 | SE | 24.12.2008 | GR | 25.12.2008 | IS | 24.01.2009 | PT | 24.02.2009 | HU | 25.03.2009 | IE | 20.06.2009 | LU | 20.06.2009 | [2011/43] |
Former [2011/32] | AT | 24.09.2008 | |
CZ | 24.09.2008 | ||
DK | 24.09.2008 | ||
EE | 24.09.2008 | ||
FI | 24.09.2008 | ||
LT | 24.09.2008 | ||
NL | 24.09.2008 | ||
PL | 24.09.2008 | ||
RO | 24.09.2008 | ||
SI | 24.09.2008 | ||
SK | 24.09.2008 | ||
BG | 24.12.2008 | ||
SE | 24.12.2008 | ||
GR | 25.12.2008 | ||
IS | 24.01.2009 | ||
PT | 24.02.2009 | ||
HU | 25.03.2009 | ||
IE | 20.06.2009 | ||
LU | 20.06.2009 | ||
Former [2011/22] | AT | 24.09.2008 | |
CZ | 24.09.2008 | ||
DK | 24.09.2008 | ||
EE | 24.09.2008 | ||
FI | 24.09.2008 | ||
LT | 24.09.2008 | ||
NL | 24.09.2008 | ||
PL | 24.09.2008 | ||
RO | 24.09.2008 | ||
SI | 24.09.2008 | ||
SK | 24.09.2008 | ||
BG | 24.12.2008 | ||
SE | 24.12.2008 | ||
GR | 25.12.2008 | ||
IS | 24.01.2009 | ||
PT | 24.02.2009 | ||
IE | 20.06.2009 | ||
LU | 20.06.2009 | ||
Former [2011/01] | AT | 24.09.2008 | |
CZ | 24.09.2008 | ||
DK | 24.09.2008 | ||
EE | 24.09.2008 | ||
FI | 24.09.2008 | ||
LT | 24.09.2008 | ||
NL | 24.09.2008 | ||
PL | 24.09.2008 | ||
RO | 24.09.2008 | ||
SI | 24.09.2008 | ||
SK | 24.09.2008 | ||
BG | 24.12.2008 | ||
SE | 24.12.2008 | ||
GR | 25.12.2008 | ||
IS | 24.01.2009 | ||
PT | 24.02.2009 | ||
IE | 20.06.2009 | ||
Former [2010/24] | AT | 24.09.2008 | |
CZ | 24.09.2008 | ||
DK | 24.09.2008 | ||
EE | 24.09.2008 | ||
FI | 24.09.2008 | ||
LT | 24.09.2008 | ||
NL | 24.09.2008 | ||
PL | 24.09.2008 | ||
RO | 24.09.2008 | ||
SI | 24.09.2008 | ||
SK | 24.09.2008 | ||
BG | 24.12.2008 | ||
SE | 24.12.2008 | ||
IS | 24.01.2009 | ||
PT | 24.02.2009 | ||
IE | 20.06.2009 | ||
Former [2010/21] | AT | 24.09.2008 | |
CZ | 24.09.2008 | ||
DK | 24.09.2008 | ||
EE | 24.09.2008 | ||
FI | 24.09.2008 | ||
LT | 24.09.2008 | ||
NL | 24.09.2008 | ||
RO | 24.09.2008 | ||
SI | 24.09.2008 | ||
SK | 24.09.2008 | ||
BG | 24.12.2008 | ||
SE | 24.12.2008 | ||
IS | 24.01.2009 | ||
PT | 24.02.2009 | ||
IE | 20.06.2009 | ||
Former [2010/12] | AT | 24.09.2008 | |
CZ | 24.09.2008 | ||
DK | 24.09.2008 | ||
EE | 24.09.2008 | ||
FI | 24.09.2008 | ||
LT | 24.09.2008 | ||
NL | 24.09.2008 | ||
RO | 24.09.2008 | ||
SI | 24.09.2008 | ||
SK | 24.09.2008 | ||
BG | 24.12.2008 | ||
SE | 24.12.2008 | ||
IS | 24.01.2009 | ||
PT | 24.02.2009 | ||
Former [2009/52] | AT | 24.09.2008 | |
CZ | 24.09.2008 | ||
DK | 24.09.2008 | ||
EE | 24.09.2008 | ||
FI | 24.09.2008 | ||
LT | 24.09.2008 | ||
NL | 24.09.2008 | ||
RO | 24.09.2008 | ||
SI | 24.09.2008 | ||
SK | 24.09.2008 | ||
BG | 24.12.2008 | ||
IS | 24.01.2009 | ||
PT | 24.02.2009 | ||
Former [2009/27] | AT | 24.09.2008 | |
CZ | 24.09.2008 | ||
FI | 24.09.2008 | ||
LT | 24.09.2008 | ||
NL | 24.09.2008 | ||
RO | 24.09.2008 | ||
SI | 24.09.2008 | ||
SK | 24.09.2008 | ||
BG | 24.12.2008 | ||
IS | 24.01.2009 | ||
PT | 24.02.2009 | ||
Former [2009/16] | AT | 24.09.2008 | |
FI | 24.09.2008 | ||
LT | 24.09.2008 | ||
SI | 24.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/10] | LT | 24.09.2008 | Cited in | International search | [X]US4935275 (USHIDA YOSHIO [JP], et al) [X] 1-7,11-19 * Table 2; Examples I.1-I.4 and Comparative Example I.10 *; | [A]DE10148702 (BASF AG [DE]) [A] 1-18* the whole document * |