EP1754126 - ENHANCING TRUSTED PLATFORM MODULE PERFORMANCE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.03.2021 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 10.04.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 12.12.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 08.08.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.06.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, HU | published on 27.07.2022 [2022/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Oracle America, Inc. 500 Oracle Parkway Redwood City, CA 94065 / US | [2011/10] |
Former [2007/08] | For all designated states SUN MICROSYSTEMS, INC. 4150 Network Circle Santa Clara, California 95054 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KING, James, E. 75A Waterloo Road Workingham Berkshire RG40 2JE / GB | 02 /
JONES, Rhod, J. 41 Lupin Ride Crowthorne Berkshire RG45 6US / GB | [2007/08] | Representative(s) | D Young & Co LLP 3 Noble Street London EC2V 7BQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2020/20] | D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | ||
Former [2007/08] | Harris, Ian Richard D Young & Co 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | Application number, filing date | 05757377.6 | 06.06.2005 | [2007/08] | WO2005US19645 | Priority number, date | US20040865289 | 10.06.2004 Original published format: US 865289 | [2007/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005124505 | Date: | 29.12.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1754126 | Date: | 21.02.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.12.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1754126 | Date: | 13.05.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.12.2005 | Classification | IPC: | G06F1/00 | [2007/08] | CPC: |
G06F21/575 (EP,US);
G06F21/552 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2020/20] |
Former [2007/08] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | VERBESSERUNG DER LEISTUNGSFÄHIGKEIT EINES VERTRAUENS-PLATTFORM-MODULS | [2007/08] | English: | ENHANCING TRUSTED PLATFORM MODULE PERFORMANCE | [2007/08] | French: | AMÉLIORATION DES PERFORMANCES D'UN MODULE DE PLATE-FORME SÉCURISÉ | [2020/02] |
Former [2007/08] | AMELIORATION DES PERFORMANCES D'UN MODULE DE PLATE-FORME SECURISE | Entry into regional phase | 22.12.2006 | National basic fee paid | 22.12.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.12.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.12.2006 | Examination requested [2007/08] | 30.03.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.08.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.09.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.12.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.01.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.05.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.07.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.11.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.08.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.01.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.11.2019 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 27.11.2019 | 27.11.2019 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 13.12.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.04.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 03.04.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 03.04.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 30.03.2011 | Opposition(s) | 16.02.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.06.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 10.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 12.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 10.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 10.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 16.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 12.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 13.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 15 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 06.06.2005 | AT | 13.05.2020 | CY | 13.05.2020 | CZ | 13.05.2020 | DK | 13.05.2020 | EE | 13.05.2020 | ES | 13.05.2020 | FI | 13.05.2020 | IT | 13.05.2020 | LT | 13.05.2020 | MC | 13.05.2020 | NL | 13.05.2020 | PL | 13.05.2020 | RO | 13.05.2020 | SE | 13.05.2020 | SI | 13.05.2020 | SK | 13.05.2020 | TR | 13.05.2020 | IE | 06.06.2020 | LU | 06.06.2020 | BE | 30.06.2020 | CH | 30.06.2020 | LI | 30.06.2020 | FR | 13.07.2020 | BG | 13.08.2020 | GR | 14.08.2020 | IS | 13.09.2020 | PT | 14.09.2020 | [2022/27] |
Former [2022/26] | AT | 13.05.2020 | |
CZ | 13.05.2020 | ||
DK | 13.05.2020 | ||
EE | 13.05.2020 | ||
ES | 13.05.2020 | ||
FI | 13.05.2020 | ||
IT | 13.05.2020 | ||
LT | 13.05.2020 | ||
MC | 13.05.2020 | ||
NL | 13.05.2020 | ||
PL | 13.05.2020 | ||
RO | 13.05.2020 | ||
SE | 13.05.2020 | ||
SI | 13.05.2020 | ||
SK | 13.05.2020 | ||
TR | 13.05.2020 | ||
IE | 06.06.2020 | ||
LU | 06.06.2020 | ||
BE | 30.06.2020 | ||
CH | 30.06.2020 | ||
LI | 30.06.2020 | ||
FR | 13.07.2020 | ||
BG | 13.08.2020 | ||
GR | 14.08.2020 | ||
IS | 13.09.2020 | ||
PT | 14.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/23] | AT | 13.05.2020 | |
CZ | 13.05.2020 | ||
DK | 13.05.2020 | ||
EE | 13.05.2020 | ||
ES | 13.05.2020 | ||
FI | 13.05.2020 | ||
IT | 13.05.2020 | ||
LT | 13.05.2020 | ||
MC | 13.05.2020 | ||
NL | 13.05.2020 | ||
PL | 13.05.2020 | ||
RO | 13.05.2020 | ||
SE | 13.05.2020 | ||
SI | 13.05.2020 | ||
SK | 13.05.2020 | ||
IE | 06.06.2020 | ||
LU | 06.06.2020 | ||
BE | 30.06.2020 | ||
CH | 30.06.2020 | ||
LI | 30.06.2020 | ||
FR | 13.07.2020 | ||
BG | 13.08.2020 | ||
GR | 14.08.2020 | ||
IS | 13.09.2020 | ||
PT | 14.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/20] | AT | 13.05.2020 | |
CZ | 13.05.2020 | ||
DK | 13.05.2020 | ||
EE | 13.05.2020 | ||
ES | 13.05.2020 | ||
FI | 13.05.2020 | ||
IT | 13.05.2020 | ||
LT | 13.05.2020 | ||
MC | 13.05.2020 | ||
NL | 13.05.2020 | ||
PL | 13.05.2020 | ||
RO | 13.05.2020 | ||
SE | 13.05.2020 | ||
SK | 13.05.2020 | ||
IE | 06.06.2020 | ||
LU | 06.06.2020 | ||
CH | 30.06.2020 | ||
LI | 30.06.2020 | ||
BG | 13.08.2020 | ||
GR | 14.08.2020 | ||
IS | 13.09.2020 | ||
PT | 14.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/15] | AT | 13.05.2020 | |
CZ | 13.05.2020 | ||
DK | 13.05.2020 | ||
EE | 13.05.2020 | ||
ES | 13.05.2020 | ||
FI | 13.05.2020 | ||
IT | 13.05.2020 | ||
LT | 13.05.2020 | ||
MC | 13.05.2020 | ||
NL | 13.05.2020 | ||
PL | 13.05.2020 | ||
RO | 13.05.2020 | ||
SE | 13.05.2020 | ||
SK | 13.05.2020 | ||
LU | 06.06.2020 | ||
BG | 13.08.2020 | ||
GR | 14.08.2020 | ||
IS | 13.09.2020 | ||
PT | 14.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/13] | AT | 13.05.2020 | |
CZ | 13.05.2020 | ||
DK | 13.05.2020 | ||
EE | 13.05.2020 | ||
ES | 13.05.2020 | ||
FI | 13.05.2020 | ||
IT | 13.05.2020 | ||
LT | 13.05.2020 | ||
MC | 13.05.2020 | ||
NL | 13.05.2020 | ||
PL | 13.05.2020 | ||
RO | 13.05.2020 | ||
SE | 13.05.2020 | ||
SK | 13.05.2020 | ||
BG | 13.08.2020 | ||
GR | 14.08.2020 | ||
IS | 13.09.2020 | ||
PT | 14.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AT | 13.05.2020 | |
CZ | 13.05.2020 | ||
DK | 13.05.2020 | ||
EE | 13.05.2020 | ||
ES | 13.05.2020 | ||
FI | 13.05.2020 | ||
IT | 13.05.2020 | ||
LT | 13.05.2020 | ||
NL | 13.05.2020 | ||
PL | 13.05.2020 | ||
RO | 13.05.2020 | ||
SE | 13.05.2020 | ||
SK | 13.05.2020 | ||
BG | 13.08.2020 | ||
GR | 14.08.2020 | ||
IS | 13.09.2020 | ||
PT | 14.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/09] | AT | 13.05.2020 | |
CZ | 13.05.2020 | ||
DK | 13.05.2020 | ||
EE | 13.05.2020 | ||
ES | 13.05.2020 | ||
FI | 13.05.2020 | ||
IT | 13.05.2020 | ||
LT | 13.05.2020 | ||
NL | 13.05.2020 | ||
RO | 13.05.2020 | ||
SE | 13.05.2020 | ||
BG | 13.08.2020 | ||
GR | 14.08.2020 | ||
IS | 13.09.2020 | ||
PT | 14.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | DK | 13.05.2020 | |
ES | 13.05.2020 | ||
FI | 13.05.2020 | ||
LT | 13.05.2020 | ||
NL | 13.05.2020 | ||
RO | 13.05.2020 | ||
SE | 13.05.2020 | ||
BG | 13.08.2020 | ||
GR | 14.08.2020 | ||
IS | 13.09.2020 | ||
PT | 14.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/04] | FI | 13.05.2020 | |
LT | 13.05.2020 | ||
NL | 13.05.2020 | ||
SE | 13.05.2020 | ||
BG | 13.08.2020 | ||
GR | 14.08.2020 | ||
IS | 13.09.2020 | ||
PT | 14.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/01] | FI | 13.05.2020 | |
LT | 13.05.2020 | ||
SE | 13.05.2020 | ||
BG | 13.08.2020 | ||
GR | 14.08.2020 | ||
IS | 13.09.2020 | ||
PT | 14.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | FI | 13.05.2020 | |
LT | 13.05.2020 | ||
SE | 13.05.2020 | ||
GR | 14.08.2020 | ||
IS | 13.09.2020 | ||
PT | 14.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | FI | 13.05.2020 | |
LT | 13.05.2020 | ||
SE | 13.05.2020 | ||
IS | 13.09.2020 | ||
PT | 14.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | LT | 13.05.2020 | |
IS | 13.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/46] | IS | 13.09.2020 | Cited in | International search | [X]US2004003288 (WISEMAN WILLARD M [US], et al) [X] 1-20 * paragraph [0013] - paragraph [0015] * * paragraph [0022] ** paragraph [0040] - paragraph [0043] *; | [X] - TRUSTED COMPUTING PLATFORM ALLIANCE, "TCG PC Specific Implementation Specification Version 1.0, September 09, 2001", INET, (20010909), XP002294898 [X] 1-20 * figure 1 * * page 13 * * page 15 - page 16 * | by applicant | US2004003288 |