EP1768558 - LIPOHILIC DERIVATIVES OF CHELATE MONOAMIDES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.06.2012 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.06.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.07.2012 [2012/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KEREOS, INC. 4041 Forest Park Avenue St. Louis MO 63108 / US | [2007/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RILEY, Dennis, Patrick 1722 Claymont Estates Drive Chesterfield, MO 63017 / US | 02 /
McGHEE, William, D. 300 Arlington Glen Court Fenton, MO 63026 / US | [2007/14] | Representative(s) | Jansen, Cornelis Marinus, et al V.O. Johan de Wittlaan 7 2517 JR Den Haag / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2012/17] | Jansen, Cornelis Marinus, et al Vereenigde Johan de Wittlaan 7 2517 JR Den Haag / NL | ||
Former [2008/34] | van Loon, C.J.J., et al Vereenigde Johan de Wittlaan 7 2517 JR Den Haag / NL | ||
Former [2007/14] | van Loon, C.J.J., et al c/o VEREENIGDE Johan de Wittlaan 7 2517 JR The Hague / NL | Application number, filing date | 05757440.2 | 07.06.2005 | [2007/14] | WO2005US19966 | Priority number, date | US20040578474P | 09.06.2004 Original published format: US 578474 P | US20040605180P | 27.08.2004 Original published format: US 605180 P | [2007/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005122891 | Date: | 29.12.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1768558 | Date: | 04.04.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.12.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 29.12.2005 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.10.2009 | Classification | IPC: | A61B5/055, C07D225/00 | [2007/14] | CPC: |
A61K49/10 (EP,US);
A61K49/085 (EP,US);
A61K49/1806 (EP,US);
C07F9/5537 (EP,US);
C07F9/6524 (EP,US);
C07F9/65583 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/14] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | LIPOPHILE DERIVATE VON CHELAT-MONOAMIDEN | [2007/14] | English: | LIPOHILIC DERIVATIVES OF CHELATE MONOAMIDES | [2007/14] | French: | DERIVES LIPOPHILES DE MONOAMIDES CHELATES | [2007/14] | Entry into regional phase | 02.01.2007 | National basic fee paid | 02.01.2007 | Search fee paid | 02.01.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.01.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.03.2006 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 02.01.2007 | Examination requested [2007/14] | 22.02.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.07.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.01.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/30] | 27.02.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2012/30] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 22.02.2010 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2011 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2003185760 (LANZA GREGORY [US], et al) [Y] 1-29 * par. [0021], [0022], [0027], [0043], [0045], [0073]-[0075] * * Example 1 * * claims 1-12, 14, 16 *; | [Y]US2004058951 (LANZA GREGORY M [US], et al) [Y] 1-29 * par. [0036], [0041], [0227]-[0229], [0271] * * page 14, scheme, compound 4 *; | [A] - FRANK R KEITH ET AL, "CHELANTS FOR DELIVERY OF METAL IONS", PMSE PREPRINTS, AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, NEW YORK, NY, US, (20030101), vol. 89, ISSN 1550-6703, page 148, XP008077566 [A] 1-29 * page 148, "Figure 4" * | International search | [Y]US6676929 (MCMURRY THOMAS J [US], et al) |